Kelley et al v. Wagoner, City of et al
Plaintiff: Elisha Edward Kelley and Helen Raye Kelley
Defendant: Buddy Rose, Wagoner, City of and Wagoner Police Department
Case Number: 6:2020cv00248
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting hearing(s): Settlement Conference set for 5/5/2021 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Settlement Conference Statements due 4/21/2021. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting scheduling order dates: Joinder of Parties due by 9/25/2020; Exhibit List due by 3/26/2021; Witness List due by 3/26/2021; Discovery due by 4/26/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 5/10/2021; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 5/28/2021; Pretrial Order due by 5/28/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2021 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments). (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Elisha Edward Kelley, Helen Raye Kelley (Camp, Christopher)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 9/11/2020 at 10:15 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 9/4/2020. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Buddy Rose(in his official capacity), Buddy Rose(individually) (Wood, Scott)
August 2, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Wagoner Police Department, Wagoner, City of (Wood, Scott)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Mitchell Garrett, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Garrett, D.)
July 23, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/23/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1384580 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Buddy Rose(in his official capacity), Buddy Rose(individually), Wagoner Police Department, Wagoner, City of (Wood, Scott)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/30/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Wagoner County District Court, case number CJ-2020-169 by Buddy Rose(in his official capacity and individually), Wagoner Police Department, City of Wagoner (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Buddy Rose(in his official capacity and individually), Wagoner Police Department, City of Wagoner (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 13, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Buddy Rose(in his official capacity and individually), Wagoner Police Department, City of Wagoner by Elisha Edward Kelley, Helen Raye Kelley (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley et al v. Wagoner, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisha Edward Kelley
Represented By: Christopher L. Camp
Represented By: D. Mitchell Garrett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Raye Kelley
Represented By: Christopher L. Camp
Represented By: D. Mitchell Garrett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buddy Rose
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagoner, City of
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagoner Police Department
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?