Morrow et al v. McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11 et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Morrow
Defendant: McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11, Valliant Public Schools, Scott Pratt, Rachael Smith and Craig Wall
Case Number: 6:2020cv00250
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry #18 ) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs' shall respond to the Motion by OCTOBER 1, 2020.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Party Craig Wall, Rachel Smith, Scott Pratt ) by Kimberly Morrow(Individually), Kimberly Morrow(as Guardian of the person and estate of A.B.) Responses due by 10/1/2020(White, Joe)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11, Scott Pratt(Individually), Rachael Smith(Individually), Craig Wall(Individually) (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Kimberly Morrow(Individually), Kimberly Morrow(as Guardian of the person and estate of A.B.) (White, Joe)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 10/29/2020 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11, Scott Pratt(Individually), Scott Pratt(in his official capacity), Rachael Smith(in her official capacity), Rachael Smith(Individually), Craig Wall(in his official capacity), Craig Wall(Individually) (Cyran, Matthew)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Party Craig Wall, Rachel Smith, Scott Pratt by Scott Pratt(Individually), Scott Pratt(in his official capacity), Rachael Smith(in her official capacity), Rachael Smith(Individually), Craig Wall(in his official capacity), Craig Wall(Individually) Responses due by 9/17/2020(Cyran, Matthew) (Main Document 14 replaced - PDF was bad - on 9/14/2020) (jcb, Deputy Clerk).
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew P. Cyran on behalf of All Defendants (Cyran, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Scott Pratt (in his individual and official capacity) - Served on 8/13/2020 by Plaintiff (White, Joe)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Rachael Smith (in her individual and official capacity) - Served on 8/13/2020 by Plaintiff (White, Joe)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Craig Wall (in his individual and official capacity) - Served on 8/13/2020 by Plaintiff (White, Joe)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11 - Served on 8/13/2020 by Plaintiff (White, Joe)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kate C. Thompson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thompson, Kate)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Rachael Smith(in her official capacity and Individually) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Scott Pratt(Individually and in his official capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Craig Wall(in his official capacity and Individually) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11 (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/24/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1385170 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Kimberly Morrow(Individually), Kimberly Morrow(as Guardian of the person and estate of A.B.) (White, Joe)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/31/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11, Scott Pratt (Individually and in his official capacity), Rachael Smith (in her official capacity and Individually), Craig Wall (in his official capacity and Individually) by Kimberly Morrow (Individually and as Guardian of the person and estate of A.B.) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kimberly Morrow(Individually and as Guardian of the person and estate of A.B.) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow et al v. McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCurtain County Independent School District No. 11
Represented By: Matthew P. Cyran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valliant Public Schools
Represented By: Matthew P. Cyran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Pratt
Represented By: Matthew P. Cyran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachael Smith
Represented By: Matthew P. Cyran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Wall
Represented By: Matthew P. Cyran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Morrow
Represented By: Joe E. White, Jr.
Represented By: Kate C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?