Harris v. Sharp
Petitioner: Donnie L. Harris, Jr. and Donnie Lee Harris
Respondent: Tommy Sharp
Case Number: 6:2020cv00282
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas D. Hird on behalf of Donnie L. Harris, Jr (Hird, Thomas)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Meghan J. LeFrancois on behalf of Donnie L. Harris, Jr (LeFrancois, Meghan)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: Petitioner's motion for appointment of the Death Penalty Federal Habeas Corpus Division of the Federal Public Defender's Office of the Western District of Oklahoma #2 is GRANTED. Petitioner's request to stay the applicable statute of limitations #2 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Federal Public Defender's Office shall designate an attorney to file an entry of appearance within seven (7) days of receipt of this Opinion and Order. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/18/2020 in the amount of $5, receipt number AOKEDC-1392345 (Re: #2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel ) by Donnie L. Harris, Jr (LeFrancois, Meghan)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White : Denying #1 petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Initial Filing Fee due by 9/8/2020 in the amount of $5.00. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-20-282-RAW-KEW. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and request to stay the statute of limitations by Donnie L. Harris, Jr (With attachments) Responses due by 8/28/2020(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Donnie L. Harris, Jr Responses due by 8/28/2020(jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donnie L. Harris, Jr.
Represented By: Meghan J. LeFrancois
Represented By: Thomas D. Hird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donnie Lee Harris
Represented By: Meghan J. LeFrancois
Represented By: Thomas D. Hird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tommy Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?