Kester v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Angela Renee Kester
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00283
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care - Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White, directing the Clerk of Court to issue Civil Summons for the named defendant(s) and to forward the issued Summons to the U.S. Marshal for service. The plaintiff has been granted In Forma Pauperis status.(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER to Plaintiff with 285 form. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis & Supporting Affidavit ( #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) (lal, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Angela Renee Kester Responses due by 8/31/2020(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Angela Renee Kester (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Attachment 6 replaced on 8/18/2020) (jcb, Deputy Clerk). (Attachment 7 replaced on 8/18/2020) (jcb, Deputy Clerk).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Angela Renee Kester (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kester v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Renee Kester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?