Dean v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Cordero Dean
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Jane Doe
Case Number: 6:2020cv00287
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/20/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1393334 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Pratt, Alexandra)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 JURY DEMAND by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Pratt, Alexandra)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Inc for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Pratt, Alexandra)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Pratt, Alexandra)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexandra E. Pratt on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Pratt, Alexandra)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark T. Steele on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Steele, Mark)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 8/27/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) Clerk).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Okmulgee County District Court, case number CJ-2020-086 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Jane Doe, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP by Cordero Dean (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Mark T. Steele
Represented By: Alexandra E. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cordero Dean
Represented By: Ashley H. Leavitt
Represented By: Daniel Aizenman
Represented By: Daniel N. Aizenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?