Hoeppner v. Head et al
Plaintiff: Karl Hoeppner
Defendant: Elizabeth Rains, Carrus Healthcare, LLC, Charles Sanders, Tushka, City of and Tony Head
Case Number: 6:2020cv00299
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Tony Head (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Charles Sanders (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Elizabeth Rains (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to City of Tushka (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Carrus Healthcare, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bryon D. Helm on behalf of Karl Hoeppner (Helm, Bryon)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel E. Smolen on behalf of Karl Hoeppner (Smolen, Daniel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert M. Blakemore on behalf of Karl Hoeppner (Blakemore, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/3/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Carrus Healthcare, LLC, Tony Head, Elizabeth Rains, Charles Sanders, City of Tushka by Karl Hoeppner (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Karl Hoeppner (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/27/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1396175 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Karl Hoeppner (Smolen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoeppner v. Head et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Rains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrus Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tushka, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Hoeppner
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Bryon D. Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?