Gregory v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Myra Gregory
Defendant: Jason Hill, John Does 1-30, Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America and William Hayes
Case Number: 6:2020cv00308
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Renley Dennis on behalf of John Does 1-30, William Hayes, Jason Hill (Dennis, J.)
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of John Does 1-30, William Hayes, Jason Hill (Burrage, Michael) (Main Document 14 replaced on 11/4/2020) (lal, Deputy Clerk). Modified to replace PDF due to scrivener's error and NEF regenerated on 11/4/2020 (lal, Deputy Clerk).
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by E. Anthony Mareshie on behalf of Myra Gregory (Mareshie, E.)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by William Hayes, Jason Hill Responses due by 11/16/2020(Sawyer, Patricia)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patricia A. Sawyer on behalf of John Does 1-30, William Hayes, Jason Hill (Sawyer, Patricia)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patricia A. Sawyer on behalf of John Does 1-30, William Hayes, Jason Hill (Sawyer, Patricia)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #8 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Accordingly, defendants William Hayes, Jason Hill, and Does 1-30 have until November 2, 2020, to Answer or otherwise plead. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 Special Appearance and Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint) by William Hayes, Jason Hill and John Does 1-30 [NOTE: Attorney Patricia A. Sawyer added to parties William Hayes (pty:dft), Jason Hill (pty:dft) and John Does 1-30 (pty:dft)]. Responses due by 10/15/2020(Sawyer, Patricia) Modified on 10/5/2020 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to William Hayes (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jason Hill (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Department of Health and Human Services (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States of America (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/8/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1400287 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Myra Gregory (Koller, A.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/15/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Department of Health and Human Services, John Does 1-30, William Hayes, Jason Hill, United States of America by Myra Gregory (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Myra Gregory (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hill
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Patricia A. Sawyer
Represented By: J. Renley Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-30
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: J. Renley Dennis
Represented By: Patricia A. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hayes
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Patricia A. Sawyer
Represented By: J. Renley Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra Gregory
Represented By: A. Laurie Koller
Represented By: E. Anthony Mareshie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?