Youngberg et al v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Waldrop, Sean Connell, Tiffany Waldrop, William Overshiner, Lauren Padgett, Kevin Coffman, Misty Youngberg, Christie Connell and Heidi Coffman
Defendant: General Motors Company, General Motors, LLC, General Motors Holdings LLC and General Motors Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00339
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AGREED ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting Agreed Tolling Agreement and Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice of General Motors Holdings LLC and General Motors Company ( #20 Motion to Dismiss Party ) and dismissing defendants General Motors Company and General Motors Holdings, LLC (lal, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2020 Filing 20 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Party General Motors Holdings LLC and General Motors Company by General Motors, LLC Responses due by 11/30/2020(Kaufmann, Linda)
November 5, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by General Motors, LLC (Kaufmann, Linda)
November 5, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Linda G. Kaufmann on behalf of General Motors, LLC (Kaufmann, Linda)
November 5, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Derrick Teague on behalf of General Motors, LLC (Teague, J.)
October 29, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: General Motors LLC - Served on 10/15/20 by All Plaintiffs (Fulda, Ryan) Modified on 11/2/2020 to edit event and text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: General Motors Holdings LLC - Served on 10/16/20 by All Plaintiffs (Fulda, Ryan) Modified on 11/2/2020 to edit event and text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: General Motors Company - Served on 10/16/20 by All Plaintiffs (Fulda, Ryan) Modified on 11/2/2020 to edit event and text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to General Motors Company (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to General Motors Holdings, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to General Motors, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Courtney L. Cagle on behalf of Christopher Waldrop, Tiffany Waldrop(as guardian of Christopher Waldrop), Tiffany Waldrop(individually) (Cagle, Courtney)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew C. Jayne on behalf of Christopher Waldrop, Tiffany Waldrop(as guardian of Christopher Waldrop), Tiffany Waldrop(individually) (Jayne, Andrew)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Trevor L. Hughes on behalf of William Overshiner, Lauren Padgett (Hughes, Trevor)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lee Brown on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brown, Lee)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Daren Brown on behalf of Christie Connell, Sean Connell (Brown, John)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Chris D. Parker on behalf of Misty Youngberg(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kristopher Youngberg, deceased), Misty Youngberg(individually) (Parker, Chris)
October 2, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/2/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1410238 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Heidi Coffman, Kevin Coffman (Fulda, Ryan)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan J. Fulda on behalf of Heidi Coffman, Kevin Coffman (Fulda, Ryan)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 10/8/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors, LLC by Misty Youngberg(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kristopher Youngberg, deceased), William Overshiner, Kevin Coffman, Lauren Padgett, Tiffany Waldrop(as guardian of Christopher Waldrop), Christopher Waldrop, Misty Youngberg(individually), Tiffany Waldrop(individually), Christie Connell, Sean Connell, Heidi Coffman (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Heidi Coffman, Kevin Coffman, Christie Connell, Sean Connell, William Overshiner, Lauren Padgett, Christopher Waldrop, Tiffany Waldrop(as guardian of Christopher Waldrop), Tiffany Waldrop(individually), Misty Youngberg(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kristopher Youngberg, deceased), Misty Youngberg(individually) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Youngberg et al v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: J. Derrick Teague
Represented By: Linda G. Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Waldrop
Represented By: Andrew C. Jayne
Represented By: Molly A. Aspan
Represented By: Lee Brown
Represented By: Courtney L. Cagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Connell
Represented By: Molly A. Aspan
Represented By: John Daren Brown
Represented By: Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Waldrop
Represented By: Andrew C. Jayne
Represented By: Molly A. Aspan
Represented By: Lee Brown
Represented By: Courtney L. Cagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Overshiner
Represented By: Molly A. Aspan
Represented By: Trevor L. Hughes
Represented By: Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Padgett
Represented By: Molly A. Aspan
Represented By: Trevor L. Hughes
Represented By: Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Coffman
Represented By: Molly A. Aspan
Represented By: Ryan J. Fulda
Represented By: Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Youngberg
Represented By: Molly A. Aspan
Represented By: Lee Brown
Represented By: Chris D. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Connell
Represented By: Molly A. Aspan
Represented By: John Daren Brown
Represented By: Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Coffman
Represented By: Molly A. Aspan
Represented By: Ryan J. Fulda
Represented By: Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?