Cherokee Nation, The v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cherokee Nation, The
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc. doing business as Pax Labs, Inc. also known as Ploom, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., Kum & Go, Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Casey's General Stores, Inc., Pete's of Erie, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Murphy USA, Inc., Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Eliquitech, Inc., GPM Investments, Inc., Circle K Stores, Inc., Walmart, Quiktrip Corporation, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc., Pilot Travel Centers LLC doing business as Pilot Flying J, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Ploom, Inc. and JUUL Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as PAX Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as PLOOM, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00345
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting defendant Casey's General Stores' Application to Withdraw as Counsel filed 11/5/2020 ( #29 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) ) and deeming Attorney Jessica L. Craft withdrawn as counsel of record for defendant Casey's General Stores. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting Defendants' Joint Motion Pursuant to LCvR 7.1(i) to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading ( #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer). (lal, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Cherokee Nation, The ;(Molo, Steven)
November 5, 2020 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pete's of Erie, Inc. (Starr, Jon)
November 5, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Jessica L. Craft by Casey's General Stores, Inc. Responses due by 11/19/2020(Craft, Jessica)
November 5, 2020 Filing 28 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jennifer L. Struble on behalf of Casey's General Stores, Inc. (Struble, Jennifer)
November 5, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James K. Secrest, II on behalf of Casey's General Stores, Inc. (Secrest, James)
November 4, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jon D. Starr on behalf of Pete's of Erie, Inc. (Starr, Jon)
November 4, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by JUUL Labs, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 11/18/2020(Neal, Charles)
October 28, 2020 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sarah Jane T.C. Truong on behalf of Casey's General Stores, Inc. (Truong, Sarah Jane)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White denying plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for a Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay filed 10/27/2020 ( #22 Motion for Hearing ). (lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 27, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay by Cherokee Nation, The Responses due by 11/10/2020(Molo, Steven)
October 26, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Stay ) by JUUL Labs, Inc. ;(Neal, Charles)
October 22, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by JUUL Labs, Inc. ;(Neal, Charles)
October 16, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leonid Grinberg on behalf of Cherokee Nation, The (Grinberg, Leonid)
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven F. Molo on behalf of Cherokee Nation, The (Molo, Steven)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Admission of Leonid Grinberg to Practice Before the Court Pro Hac Vice filed 10/13/2020 ( #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice ) and deeming attorney Leonid Grinberg as counsel of record for The Cherokee Nation. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Admission of Steven F. Molo to Practice Before the Court Pro Hac Vice filed 10/13/2020 ( #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice ) and deeming attorney Steven F. Molo as counsel of record for plaintiff The Cherokee Nation. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Leonid Grinberg to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1413884) by Cherokee Nation, The (With attachments) Responses due by 10/27/2020(Sullivan, Frank)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Steven F. Molo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1413882) by Cherokee Nation, The (With attachments) Responses due by 10/27/2020(Sullivan, Frank)
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Stay ) by Cherokee Nation, The ; (With attachments)(Sullivan, Frank)
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JUUL Labs, Inc. (Neal, Charles)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Allison J. Maynard on behalf of GPM Investments, Inc. (Maynard, Allison)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay by JUUL Labs, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 10/23/2020(Neal, Charles)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting Defendants' Joint Motion Pursuant to LCvR 7.1(h) to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed 10/8/2020 ( #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ). Defendants have until 11/9/2020 within which to file their answers or otherwise plead. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief by All Plaintiffs [NOTE: Attorney Frank Sullivan, III added to party Cherokee Nation, The(pty:pla)]. Responses due by 10/22/2020(Sullivan, Frank)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint,, ) by JUUL Labs, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 10/22/2020(Crapster, Clark)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Clark W. Crapster on behalf of JUUL Labs, Inc. (Crapster, Clark)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Richard W. Wassall on behalf of JUUL Labs, Inc. (Wassall, Richard)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles D. Neal, Jr on behalf of JUUL Labs, Inc. (Neal, Charles)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 10/13/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Sequoyah County District Court, case number CJ-20-114 by JUUL Labs, Inc. (With attachments) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by JUUL Labs, Inc. (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/5/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1411148 (Re: #2 Notice of Rwmoval) by JUUL Labs, Inc. (Neal, Charles)
September 3, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Casey's General Stores, Inc., Circle K Stores, Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Eliquitech, Inc., GPM Investments, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc., Kum & Go, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., Murphy USA, Inc., Pete's of Erie, Inc., Pilot Travel Centers LLC, Quiktrip Corporation, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart by Cherokee Nation, The (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherokee Nation, The v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc. doing business as Pax Labs, Inc. also known as Ploom, Inc.
Represented By: Richard W. Wassall
Represented By: Clark W. Crapster
Represented By: Charles D. Neal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLane Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kum & Go, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey's General Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica L. Craft
Represented By: Jennifer L. Struble
Represented By: James K. Secrest, II
Represented By: Sarah Jane T.C. Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete's of Erie, Inc.
Represented By: Garry M. Gaskins, II
Represented By: Jon D. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eby-Brown Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy USA, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternative Ingredients, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliquitech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPM Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Allison J. Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Represented By: Alexandra E. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quiktrip Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers LLC doing business as Pilot Flying J
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobacco Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ploom, Inc.
Represented By: Richard W. Wassall
Represented By: Clark W. Crapster
Represented By: Charles D. Neal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as PAX Labs, Inc. formerly doing business as PLOOM, Inc.
Represented By: Richard W. Wassall
Represented By: Clark W. Crapster
Represented By: Charles D. Neal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherokee Nation, The
Represented By: Sara E. Hill
Represented By: Steven F. Molo
Represented By: Leonid Grinberg
Represented By: Frank Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?