Sanford v. Benzon
Petitioner: Joseph Wayne Sanford
Respondent: Larry Benzon
Interested Party: Correction Section (FYI) and Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 6:2020cv00376
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 MAIL to Joseph Sanford Returned - marked not here. (Re: 8 Minute Order, Striking/Withdrawing Document(s) ) (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/16/2020) (acg, Deputy Clerk).
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West, Striking document (Re: 5 Minute Order) filing fee was paid 6/24/19.(acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 MAIL to Joseph Sanford Returned - marked Not here. (Re: 6 Minute Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, 5 Minute Order) (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-20-376-RAW-KEW. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: Upon review of the file in this case, the Court finds that the petitioner has not submitted a proper motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or paid the $5.00 filing fee. The petitioner is directed to submit a properly executed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with original signature and have the Trust Fund Officer at his/her facility complete (with an original signature) the Required Certification of Statement of Institutional Accounts and provide a current 6-month financial accounting statement and return the completed motion to the Office of the Clerk or pay the filing fee of $5.00 within 20 days or by 11/11/20. The Clerk is directed to provide the petitioner with a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis form and an instruction sheet.(acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the District of Utah
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER - On June 18, 2020, the court ordered Petitioner to show cause within 30 days why this petition should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. See Dkt. No. 2. That deadline has long passed and Petitioner has failed to respond in any way. In light of Petitioners failure to respond, and for the reasons stated in the show cause order, see Dkt. No. 2 at 12, this petition is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr., on 10/16/2020. (dz) [Transferred from utd on 10/20/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: It is hereby ordered that within thirty days Plaintiff must SHOW CAUSE why this petition should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 06/18/2020. (kpf) [Transferred from utd on 10/20/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4681086789). (Originally received on 6/24/2019) filed by Joseph Wayne Sanford. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (nl) [Transferred from utd on 10/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanford v. Benzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Wayne Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Benzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?