Criger v. Indemnity Insurance Co. of North America
Plaintiff: Clayton Criger
Defendant: Indemnity Insurance Co. of North America
Case Number: 6:2020cv00476
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Clayton Criger (With attachments)(McGrew, Michael)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robin D. McGrew on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGrew, Robin)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew M. McGrew on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGrew, Matthew)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D. McGrew on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGrew, Michael)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: inviting Plaintiff, if he so desires, to file an Amended Complaint by 2/10/2021, providing additional legal or factual averments which may vitiate the Defendant's claims of insufficiency. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim or MOTION to Stay) by Indemnity Insurance Co. of North America (With attachments)(Henry, Brian) Modified on 1/29/2021 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative MOTION to Stay by Indemnity Insurance Co. of North America Responses due by 2/9/2021(Henry, Brian). Added MOTION to Stay on 1/29/2021 (dma, Deputy Clerk).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's Answer,or otherwise responsive pleading due 1/26/2021. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Indemnity Insurance Co. of North America Responses due by 2/2/2021(kdc, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian P. Henry on behalf of Indemnity Insurance Co. of North America (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Indemnity Insurance Co. of North America (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/18/2020 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1439141 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Clayton Criger (McGrew, Michael)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 12/28/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Indemnity Insurance Co. of North America by Clayton Criger (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Clayton Criger (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Criger v. Indemnity Insurance Co. of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Criger
Represented By: Michael D. McGrew
Represented By: Robin D. McGrew
Represented By: Matthew M. McGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indemnity Insurance Co. of North America
Represented By: Brian P. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?