Childers v. Watts et al
Plaintiff: Dallas Faith Childers
Defendant: Michelle Birchfield, Jeffrey Paul Watts, Pushmataha School District No. 001 and Neil Birchfield
Case Number: 6:2020cv00487
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #15 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Clai ) by Dallas Faith Childers ;(Gordon, Breanne)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: deeming MOOT Defendant's #10 Partial Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim due to the filing of Plaintiff's #13 Amended Complaint. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Amended Complaint (Re: #13 Amended Complaint) by Jeffrey Paul Watts (Long, Randall)
February 12, 2021 Filing 15 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim and Combined Brief in Support by Michelle Birchfield, Neil Birchfield, Pushmataha School District No. 001 Responses due by 2/26/2021(Hegenbart, Frederick)
February 12, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Amended Complaint (Re: #13 Amended Complaint) by Pushmataha School District No. 001 (Hegenbart, Frederick)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Michelle Birchfield, Neil Birchfield, Pushmataha School District No. 001, Jeffrey Paul Watts (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Dallas Faith Childers (With attachments)(Gordon, Breanne)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White inviting Plaintiff, if she so desires, to file an amended complaint by 2/03/2021, providing additional legal or factual averments which may vitiate the Defendants claims of insufficiency. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Michelle Birchfield, Neil Birchfield, Pushmataha School District No. 001 (Hegenbart, Frederick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim and Combined Brief in Support by Michelle Birchfield, Neil Birchfield, Pushmataha School District No. 001 Responses due by 2/2/2021(Hegenbart, Frederick)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Breanne M. Gordon on behalf of Dallas Faith Childers (Gordon, Breanne)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Jeffrey Paul Watts (Long, Randall)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #6 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Michelle Birchfield, Neil Birchfield and Pushmataha School District No. 001's Answer or otherwise responsive pleading due no later than 1/20/2021. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Michelle Birchfield, Neil Birchfield, Pushmataha School District No. 001 Responses due by 1/14/2021(Breipohl, Adam)
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Adam S. Breipohl on behalf of Michelle Birchfield, Neil Birchfield, Pushmataha School District No. 001 (Breipohl, Adam)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Frederick J. Hegenbart on behalf of Michelle Birchfield, Neil Birchfield, Pushmataha School District No. 001 (Hegenbart, Frederick)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 1/6/2021)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/30/2020 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1441898 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Michelle Birchfield, Neil Birchfield, Pushmataha School District No. 001 (Hegenbart, Frederick)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Pushmataha County District Court, case number CJ-2020-035 by Michelle Birchfield, Neil Birchfield, Pushmataha School District No. 001 (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michelle Birchfield, Neil Birchfield, Pushmataha School District No. 001 (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Michelle Birchfield, Neil Birchfield, Pushmataha School District No. 001, Jeffrey Paul Watts by Dallas Faith Childers (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childers v. Watts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Birchfield
Represented By: Adam S. Breipohl
Represented By: Frederick J. Hegenbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Paul Watts
Represented By: L. Hollis Nix
Represented By: Randall E. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pushmataha School District No. 001
Represented By: Adam S. Breipohl
Represented By: Frederick J. Hegenbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Birchfield
Represented By: Adam S. Breipohl
Represented By: Frederick J. Hegenbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Faith Childers
Represented By: Breanne M. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?