Chickasaw Nation v. CVS Caremark, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Chickasaw Nation
Defendant: Aetna Health, Inc., Caremark RX, LLC, OptumRX, Inc., Caremark, LLC, Optum, Inc., CVS Caremark, LLC, Caremark PHC, LLC, Aetna, Inc., Caremark PCS Health, LLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, United HealthCare Services, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00488
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Referring Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 25:640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, per LCvR 7.1 (h), defendants OptumRX, Inc., Optum, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., and UnitedHealth Group, Inc. have until 3/5/2021 to file their answer or otherwise plead. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2021 Filing 46 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Peter J. Kocoras on behalf of Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna, Inc., CVS Caremark, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark PHC, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC (Kocoras, Peter)
February 24, 2021 Filing 45 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian K. Steinwascher on behalf of Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna, Inc., CVS Caremark, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark PHC, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC (Steinwascher, Brian)
February 23, 2021 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for United HealthCare Services, Inc.; Corporate Parent Optum, Inc., Corporate Parent OptumRX Holdings, LLC for OptumRX, Inc.; Corporate Parent United HealthCare Services, Inc. for Optum, Inc.) by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (Ottaway, Larry)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Patrick R. Wyrick granting #37 and #38 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (Spaulding, Kathy)
February 22, 2021 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: UnitedHealth Group, Inc. - Served on 2/4/2021 by The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
February 22, 2021 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Optum, Inc. - Served on 2/4/2021 by The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
February 22, 2021 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Aetna, Inc. - Served on 2/10/2021 by The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
February 22, 2021 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CVS Caremark, LLC - Served on 2/4/2021 by The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
February 19, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Attorney Peter John Kocoras to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1460598) by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna, Inc., CVS Caremark, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark PHC, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 3/5/2021(Janzen, Eric)
February 19, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Attorney Brian Keahi Steinwascher to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1460596) by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna, Inc., CVS Caremark, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark PHC, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 3/5/2021(Janzen, Eric)
February 19, 2021 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of District Judge John F. Heil, III and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to District Judge Patrick R. Wyrick of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-20-488-PRW. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Plead (Re: #2 Complaint) by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc. Responses due by 3/4/2021(Ottaway, Larry)
February 18, 2021 Filing 34 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy Sherry Fischer on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (Fischer, Amy)
February 18, 2021 Filing 33 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Larry D. Ottaway on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (Ottaway, Larry)
February 17, 2021 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 20-488-JFH. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Caremark RX, LLC - Served on 2/1/2021 by The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
February 12, 2021 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Aetna Health, Inc. answer due 3/5/2021; Aetna, Inc. answer due 3/5/2021; CVS Caremark, LLC answer due 3/5/2021; Caremark PCS Health, LLC answer due 3/5/2021; Caremark PHC, LLC answer due 3/5/2021; Caremark RX, LLC answer due 3/5/2021; Caremark, LLC answer due 3/5/2021. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Filing 29 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Clark W. Crapster on behalf of Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna, Inc., CVS Caremark, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark PHC, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC (Crapster, Clark)
February 12, 2021 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna, Inc.) by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna, Inc., CVS Caremark, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark PHC, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC (Janzen, Eric)
February 12, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna, Inc., CVS Caremark, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark PHC, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC Responses due by 2/26/2021(Janzen, Eric)
February 12, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eric D. Janzen on behalf of Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna, Inc., CVS Caremark, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark PHC, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC (Janzen, Eric)
February 12, 2021 Filing 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles D. Neal, Jr on behalf of Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna, Inc., CVS Caremark, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark PHC, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC (Neal, Charles)
February 9, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Caremark PCS Health, LLC - Served on 1/29/2021 by The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: OptumRX, Inc. - Served on 1/29/2021 by The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Caremark PHC, LLC - Served on 1/29/2021 by The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: United HealthCare Services, Inc. - Served on 2/1/2021 by The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Caremark, LLC - Served on 1/29/2021 by The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Aetna Health, Inc. - Served on 1/29/2021 by The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
February 3, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patricia A. Sawyer on behalf of The Chickasaw Nation (Sawyer, Patricia)
February 3, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Reggie N. Whitten on behalf of The Chickasaw Nation (Whitten, Reggie)
February 3, 2021 Filing 16 JURY DEMAND by The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
February 3, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
January 26, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Caremark PCS Health, LLC. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to OptumRX, Inc. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Optum, Inc. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Caremark PHC, LLC. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Caremark RX, LLC. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United HealthCare Services, Inc. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Caremark, LLC. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CVS Caremark, LLC. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Aetna, Inc. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Aetna Health, Inc. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/30/2020 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1441954 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by The Chickasaw Nation (Burrage, Michael)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 1/6/2021)(kdc, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/30/2020 (kdc, Deputy Clerk).
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna, Inc., CVS Caremark, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark PHC, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC, Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated by The Chickasaw Nation (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by The Chickasaw Nation (kdc, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chickasaw Nation v. CVS Caremark, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health, Inc.
Represented By: Brian K. Steinwascher
Represented By: Clark W. Crapster
Represented By: Charles D. Neal, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Kocoras
Represented By: Eric D. Janzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, LLC
Represented By: Brian K. Steinwascher
Represented By: Clark W. Crapster
Represented By: Charles D. Neal, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Kocoras
Represented By: Eric D. Janzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Ottaway
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, LLC
Represented By: Brian K. Steinwascher
Represented By: Clark W. Crapster
Represented By: Charles D. Neal, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Kocoras
Represented By: Eric D. Janzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Ottaway
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Caremark, LLC
Represented By: Brian K. Steinwascher
Represented By: Clark W. Crapster
Represented By: Charles D. Neal, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Kocoras
Represented By: Eric D. Janzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark PHC, LLC
Represented By: Brian K. Steinwascher
Represented By: Clark W. Crapster
Represented By: Charles D. Neal, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Kocoras
Represented By: Eric D. Janzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna, Inc.
Represented By: Brian K. Steinwascher
Represented By: Clark W. Crapster
Represented By: Charles D. Neal, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Kocoras
Represented By: Eric D. Janzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark PCS Health, LLC
Represented By: Brian K. Steinwascher
Represented By: Clark W. Crapster
Represented By: Charles D. Neal, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Kocoras
Represented By: Eric D. Janzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Ottaway
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Ottaway
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Chickasaw Nation
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Reggie N. Whitten
Represented By: Patricia A. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?