Johnson et al v. City of Lone Grove, Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Johnson, K. M. P., Wesley Todd Edwards, Reagan Alyssa Littleton, Sarah Filtz, C. J., B. F., Tina Gayle Stewart, B. S. B. S., I. S. T. S., Z. F. and Drew Filtz
Defendant: Josh Berryhill, Cody Conway, City of Lone Grove, Oklahoma, John Does 1-3 and Lone Grove, City of
Case Number: 6:2021cv00030
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi Warmbrod Dishman
Referring Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Wesley Todd Edwards, B. F., Z. F., Drew Filtz, Sarah Filtz, C. J., Kyle Johnson, Reagan Alyssa Littleton, K. M. P., B. S. B. S., I. S. T. S., Tina Gayle Stewart ;(Williams, Justin)
March 30, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand) by Wesley Todd Edwards, B. F., Z. F., Drew Filtz, Sarah Filtz, C. J., Kyle Johnson, Reagan Alyssa Littleton, K. M. P., B. S. B. S., I. S. T. S. and Tina Gayle Stewart (Williams, Justin) Modified on 3/31/2021 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
March 17, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand ) by Josh Berryhill ;(Geries, Stephen)
March 17, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Amended Complaint (Re: #13 Amended Complaint) by Josh Berryhill (Geries, Stephen)
March 17, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #13 Amended Complaint) by Lone Grove, City of (Janzen, Eric)
March 17, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Lone Grove, City of Responses due by 3/31/2021(Janzen, Eric)
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand ) by Lone Grove, City of ;(Janzen, Eric)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman denying the #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant City of Lone Grove as moot. See Order for all details.(Vasquez, Nyssa)
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause (Re: #10 Order Directing Party to Show Cause) by All Plaintiffs (Williams, Justin) Modified on 3/9/2021 to add filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Kyle Johnson (Williams, Justin) Modified on 3/9/2021 to add filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/17/2021(Williams, Justin)
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Justin R. Williams on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Williams, Justin)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman. On February 8, 2021, Defendant City of Lone Grove filed a Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' deadline for responding to the Motion was February 22, 2021. To date, Plaintiffs have not responded to the Motion, and the deadline to respond has expired. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to show cause by Wednesday, March 3, 2021, why no response has been filed. See Order for all details.(Vasquez, Nyssa)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman, of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 21-30-JWD. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Lone Grove, City of Responses due by 2/22/2021(Janzen, Eric)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Lone Grove, City of (Janzen, Eric)
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Josh Berryhill (Geries, Stephen)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephen L. Geries on behalf of Josh Berryhill (Geries, Stephen)
February 1, 2021 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/1/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1453965 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by City of Lone Grove (sms, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eric D. Janzen on behalf of City of Lone Grove, Oklahoma (Janzen, Eric)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk,. Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 2/8/2021)(kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Carter County District Court, case number CJ-20-266 by City of Lone Grove, Oklahoma (With attachments)(kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by City of Lone Grove, Oklahoma (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Josh Berryhill, City of Lone Grove, Oklahoma, Cody Conway, John Does 1-3 by Tina Gayle Stewart, Reagan Alyssa Littleton, C. J., B. F., Z. F., K. M. P., B. S. B. S., Kyle Johnson, I. S. T. S., Wesley Todd Edwards, Sarah Filtz (kdc, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. City of Lone Grove, Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Berryhill
Represented By: Stephen L. Geries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lone Grove, Oklahoma
Represented By: Eric D. Janzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Grove, City of
Represented By: Eric D. Janzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Johnson
Represented By: Justin Mai
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. M. P.
Represented By: Justin Mai
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Todd Edwards
Represented By: Justin Mai
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reagan Alyssa Littleton
Represented By: Justin Mai
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Filtz
Represented By: Justin Mai
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. J.
Represented By: Justin Mai
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. F.
Represented By: Justin Mai
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Gayle Stewart
Represented By: Justin Mai
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. S. B. S.
Represented By: Justin Mai
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I. S. T. S.
Represented By: Justin Mai
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. F.
Represented By: Justin Mai
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Filtz
Represented By: Justin Mai
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?