Hodge v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Darlene Hodge
Defendant: Billingsley Ford, LLC, Billingsley Ford, Inc., Ford Motor Company and Billingsley Ford of Ardmore
Case Number: 6:2021cv00041
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Filing 32 LETTER from Court Clerk's Office of Murray County District Court reflecting receipt of Order remanding this case to the District Court of Murray County. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2022 Filing 31 LETTER to Murray County Court Clerk with certified copy of #29 Order and #30 Judgment remanding case (dma, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2022 Filing 30 JUDGMENT by Court Clerk (terminates case) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by District Judge Eric F. Melgren granting #16 Motion to Remand to State Court and denying as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss, #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2022 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of United States District Judge John F. Heil, III, and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren, of the District of Kansas, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sec. 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-21-41-EFM. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Docket Entry No. (26) Minute Order by District Judge John F. Heil, III referring motions, is hereby STRICKEN AS ENTERED IN ERROR. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ***STRICKEN***MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III referring motions #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim for disposition to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren, of the District of Kansas, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 292(b). (adw, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/13/2022 to strike document per docket entry no. (27) (ndd, Deputy Clerk).
July 30, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Subpoenas for Production of Documents by Billingsley Ford of Ardmore, Billingsley Ford, Inc., Billingsley Ford, LLC, Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
April 2, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Patricia Darlene Hodge ;(Rupert, Anton)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III finding good cause to delay the entry of Rule 16 Scheduling Order, due to the pending Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Remand filed in this case on 2/15/2021 and 3/5/2021 respectively (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss), (Re: #16 MOTION to Remand). (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Billingsley Ford, LLC ;(Prosser, Dru)
March 19, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Billingsley Ford of Ardmore, Billingsley Ford, Inc., Billingsley Ford, LLC, Ford Motor Company ; (With attachments)(Richardson, Andrew)
March 18, 2021 Filing 20 Joint JOINT STATUS REPORT by Patricia Darlene Hodge (Rupert, Anton)
March 8, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Patricia Darlene Hodge ;(Rupert, Anton)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion. Responses due by 3/8/2021 (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim) by Patricia Darlene Hodge Responses due by 3/19/2021(Rupert, Anton)
March 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Patricia Darlene Hodge Responses due by 3/19/2021(Rupert, Anton)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III directing parties to file Joint Status Report by 3/18/2021. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of District Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-21-41-JFH. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Billingsley Ford, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 3/1/2021(Richardson, Andrew)
February 15, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
February 15, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Billingsley Holding Company, LLC for Billingsley Ford, LLC) by Billingsley Ford, LLC (Richardson, Andrew)
February 15, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
February 10, 2021 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/10/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1457787 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Billingsley Ford, LLC, Ford Motor Company (Cooper, Mary)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mary Quinn Cooper on behalf of Billingsley Ford, LLC, Ford Motor Company (Cooper, Mary)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew L. Richardson on behalf of Billingsley Ford, LLC, Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dru A. Prosser on behalf of Billingsley Ford, LLC, Ford Motor Company (Prosser, Dru)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. At the direction of the Court, this case is hereby randomly reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-21-41-RAW (dma, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 RECUSAL ORDER recusing District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman. The Clerk of the Court is directed to place this case number in the random draw for reassignment to another Judge of the Court. (Vasquez, Nyssa) Modified on 2/9/2021 to add PDF and regenerate (dma, Deputy Clerk).
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is hereby reassigned to United States District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman, of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-21-041-JWD. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 2/16/2021)(kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Murray County District Court, case number CJ-20-59 by Billingsley Ford of Ardmore, Billingsley Ford, Inc., Billingsley Ford, LLC, Ford Motor Company (With attachments)(kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Billingsley Ford of Ardmore, Billingsley Ford, Inc., Billingsley Ford, LLC, Ford Motor Company (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Billingsley Ford of Ardmore, Billingsley Ford, Inc., Billingsley Ford, LLC, Ford Motor Company by Patricia Darlene Hodge (kdc, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodge v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billingsley Ford, LLC
Represented By: Andrew L. Richardson
Represented By: Mary Quinn Cooper
Represented By: Dru A. Prosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billingsley Ford, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L. Richardson
Represented By: Dru A. Prosser
Represented By: Mary Quinn Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Andrew L. Richardson
Represented By: Mary Quinn Cooper
Represented By: Dru A. Prosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billingsley Ford of Ardmore
Represented By: Andrew L. Richardson
Represented By: Dru A. Prosser
Represented By: Mary Quinn Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Darlene Hodge
Represented By: Fob F. Jones
Represented By: Anton J. Rupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?