Krueger et al v. Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Krueger and John Krueger
Defendant: Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners, Wagoner Emergency Services, Inc., Wagoner County, Oklahoma, Wagoner EMS, Alan Smith, Wagoner County Sheriff's Department, Jeff Patterson, Nicholas Orr, Kaleb Phillips, Tyler McFarland and Drew Craig
Case Number: 6:2021cv00044
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Court Clerk denying #49 Motion for Entry of Default as to Wagoner Emergency Services, Inc. a/k/a Wagoner EMS (dma, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Wagoner County Sheriff's Department (With attachments) Responses due by 4/16/2021(Riley, Taylor)
April 2, 2021 Filing 55 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Amended Complaint (Re: #46 Amended Complaint) by Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners (Riley, Taylor)
April 2, 2021 Filing 54 JURY DEMAND by Drew Craig, Tyler McFarland, Jeff Patterson, Alan Smith (Berkhouse, Jordan)
April 2, 2021 Filing 53 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #46 Amended Complaint) by Tyler McFarland (Berkhouse, Jordan)
April 2, 2021 Filing 52 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #46 Amended Complaint) by Drew Craig (Berkhouse, Jordan)
April 2, 2021 Filing 51 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #46 Amended Complaint) by Alan Smith (Berkhouse, Jordan)
April 2, 2021 Filing 50 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #46 Amended Complaint) by Jeff Patterson (Berkhouse, Jordan)
March 29, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Wagoner Emergency Services, Inc. by All Plaintiffs; Responses due by 4/12/2021(Lyons, Mark) Modified on 3/30/2021 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: In light of the Second Amended Complaint filed on 3/19/2021, Defendants Phillips and Orr's #33 Partial Motion to Dismiss is hereby deemed MOOT. (tls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/25/2021 to edit text; NEF regenerated (tls, Deputy Clerk).
March 23, 2021 Filing 47 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #46 Amended Complaint) by Nicholas Orr, Kaleb Phillips (Wood, Randall)
March 19, 2021 Filing 46 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint, #19 Amended Complaint) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) (Lyons, Mark)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendant Tyler McFarland's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due 4/8/2021. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendant Drew Craig's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due 4/9/2021. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Re: #19 Amended Complaint) by Drew Craig Responses due by 3/31/2021(Berkhouse, Jordan)
March 16, 2021 Filing 42 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey C. Hendrickson on behalf of Nicholas Orr, Kaleb Phillips (Hendrickson, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White inviting Plaintiff, if he so desires, to file an amended complaint by 3/19/2021, providing additional legal or factual averments which may vitiate the Defendants claims of insufficiency. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, defendants Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners and Wagoner County Sheriff's Department Answers or other responsive pleadings due 3/29/2021. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #19 Amended Complaint, ) by Tyler McFarland Responses due by 3/30/2021(Berkhouse, Jordan)
March 15, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or File Other Responsive Pleadings (Re: #2 Complaint) by Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners, Wagoner County Sheriff's Department Responses due by 3/29/2021(Riley, Taylor)
March 15, 2021 Filing 37 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Taylor M. Riley on behalf of Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners, Wagoner County Sheriff's Department (Riley, Taylor)
March 15, 2021 Filing 36 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephen L. Geries on behalf of Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners, Wagoner County Sheriff's Department (Geries, Stephen)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Alan Smith's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint due 3/29/2021. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Jeff Patterson's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint due 3/29/2021. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2021 Filing 33 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Nicholas Orr, Kaleb Phillips Responses due by 3/26/2021(Wood, Randall)
March 12, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #19 Amended Complaint) by Nicholas Orr, Kaleb Phillips (Wood, Randall)
March 12, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint) by Alan Smith Responses due by 3/26/2021(Berkhouse, Jordan)
March 12, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint) by Jeff Patterson Responses due by 3/26/2021(Berkhouse, Jordan)
March 12, 2021 Filing 29 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jordan L. Berkhouse on behalf of Drew Craig, Tyler McFarland, Jeff Patterson, Alan Smith (Berkhouse, Jordan)
March 12, 2021 Filing 28 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas A. LeBlanc on behalf of Drew Craig, Tyler McFarland, Jeff Patterson, Alan Smith (LeBlanc, Thomas)
March 11, 2021 Filing 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert S. Lafferrandre on behalf of Nicholas Orr, Kaleb Phillips (Lafferrandre, Robert)
March 11, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall J. Wood on behalf of Nicholas Orr, Kaleb Phillips (Wood, Randall)
March 8, 2021 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Tyler McFarland - Served on 3/3/2021 by All Plaintiffs (Lyons, Mark) Modified on 3/10/2021 to edit service date (dma, Deputy Clerk).
March 8, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Drew Craig - Served on 3/4/2021 by All Plaintiffs (Lyons, Mark) Modified on 3/10/2021 to edit service date (dma, Deputy Clerk).
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AGREED ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: Re: #22 Application for Motion for Writ of Assistance(tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 3, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Writ of Assistance by John Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger), John Krueger(individually), Pamela Krueger(individually), Pamela Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger) Responses due by 3/17/2021(Lyons, Mark)
March 1, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Tyler McFarland (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Drew Craig (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Nicholas Orr, Jeff Patterson, Kaleb Phillips, Alan Smith, Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners, Wagoner County Sheriff's Department, Wagoner Emergency Services, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Pamela Krueger(individually), John Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger), John Krueger(individually), Pamela Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger) (Lyons, Mark)
February 24, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Wagoner Emergency Services, Inc. - Served on 2/19/2021 by All Plaintiffs (Lyons, Mark)
February 24, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners - Served on 2/22/2021 by All Plaintiffs (Lyons, Mark)
February 24, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Wagoner County Sheriff's Department - Served on 2/22/2021. by Pamela Krueger(individually); John Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger); John Krueger(individually); Pamela Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger) (Lyons, Mark)
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Nicholas Orr - Served on 2/20/2021 by All Plaintiffs (Lyons, Mark)
February 23, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kaleb Phillips - Served on 2/20/2021 by All Plaintiffs (Lyons, Mark)
February 23, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jeff Patterson - Served on 2/20/2021 by All Plaintiffs (Lyons, Mark)
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Alan Smith - Served on 2/22/2021 by All Plaintiffs (Lyons, Mark)
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Wagoner County Sheriff's Department. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Wagoner Emergency Services, Inc. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Nicholas Orr. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kaleb Phillips. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jeff Patterson. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Alan Smith. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark D. Lyons on behalf of John Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger), John Krueger(individually), Pamela Krueger(individually), Pamela Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger) (Lyons, Mark)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 2/23/2021)(kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Nicholas Orr, Jeff Patterson, Kaleb Phillips, Alan Smith, Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners, Wagoner County Sheriff's Department, Wagoner Emergency Services, Inc. by Pamela Krueger(individually), John Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger), John Krueger(individually), Pamela Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger). (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by John Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger), John Krueger(individually), Pamela Krueger(individually), Pamela Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger). (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/16/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1459006 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by John Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger), John Krueger(individually), Pamela Krueger(individually), Pamela Krueger(as Co-Administrator of the Estate of Jeffery Krueger) (Lyons, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krueger et al v. Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Stephen L. Geries
Represented By: Taylor M. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagoner Emergency Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagoner County, Oklahoma
Represented By: Stephen L. Geries
Represented By: Taylor M. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagoner EMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Smith
Represented By: Thomas A. LeBlanc
Represented By: Jordan L. Berkhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagoner County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Stephen L. Geries
Represented By: Taylor M. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Patterson
Represented By: Thomas A. LeBlanc
Represented By: Jordan L. Berkhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Orr
Represented By: Randall J. Wood
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaleb Phillips
Represented By: Randall J. Wood
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler McFarland
Represented By: Thomas A. LeBlanc
Represented By: Jordan L. Berkhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Craig
Represented By: Thomas A. LeBlanc
Represented By: Jordan L. Berkhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Krueger
Represented By: Mark D. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Krueger
Represented By: Mark D. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?