International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America et al v. Spirit Aerosystems Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Local 1558 and International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Defendant: Spirit Aerosystems, Inc. and Spirit Aerosystems Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00054
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT by Spirit Aerosystems Holdings, Inc., Spirit Aerosystems, Inc. (Love, Kimberly)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AGREED ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White allowing the withdrawal of #6 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and staying case until 5/27/2021 (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2021 Filing 24 MINUTES of Proceedings SAID CAUSE came on for Motion Hearing before District Judge Ronald A. White. (Court Reporter: Shelley Ottwell) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2021 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joseph E. Santucci, Jr on behalf of Spirit Aerosystems Holdings, Inc., Spirit Aerosystems, Inc. (Santucci, Joseph)
March 11, 2021 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicole L. Faulkner on behalf of Spirit Aerosystems Holdings, Inc., Spirit Aerosystems, Inc. (Faulkner, Nicole)
March 10, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) by Spirit Aerosystems Holdings, Inc., Spirit Aerosystems, Inc. ; (With attachments)(Love, Kimberly)
March 9, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joel E. Abrahamson on behalf of All Defendants (Abrahamson, Joel)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Joseph E. Santucci, Jr, Matthew C. Tews, Joel E. Abrahamson, and Nicole L. Faulkner for Defendants Spirit Aerosystems Holdings, Inc., and Spirit Aerosystems, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney Joseph E. Santucci, Matthew C. Tews, Joel E. Abrahamson, Nicole L. Faulkner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1465892) by Spirit Aerosystems Holdings, Inc., Spirit Aerosystems, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 3/18/2021(Love, Kimberly)
March 3, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Plaintiffs' Designation of Lead Attorney by International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local 1558 (Tanner, Rod)
March 3, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rod Tanner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tanner, Rod)
March 3, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Aarika Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Johnson, Aarika)
March 2, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jamie Harrison on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harrison, Jamie)
March 2, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kimberly Lambert Love on behalf of Spirit Aerosystems Holdings, Inc., Spirit Aerosystems, Inc. (Love, Kimberly)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Ronald A. White. (Re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Rod Tanner, Jamie King Harrison and Aarika Johnson for Plaintiffs International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, and Local 1558, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Spirit Aerosystems, Inc. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Spirit Aerosystems Holdings, Inc. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to General Order 20-13, Category 1: Actions arising under U.S.C. Sections 2241 and 2254, social security appeals, pro se prisoner cases, appeals from Bankruptcy Court, and any action requesting preliminary injunction relief, this case is hereby reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-21-054-RAW. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) by International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local 1558 ;(Bonner, L.)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/10/2021(Bonner, L.) ***WITHDRAWN on 3/19/2021 per Order #25 *** Modified on 3/19/2021 to reflect withdrawn (tls, Deputy Clerk).
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Rod Tanner, Jamie Harrison, and Aarika Johnson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1461956) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 3/10/2021(Bonner, L.)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by L. Mark Bonner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bonner, L.)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 3/3/2021)(kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2021 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/24/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1461958 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America [NOTE: Attorney Emmanuel E. Edem NOT added to party International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America (pty:pla)]. (Edem, Emmanuel) Modified on 2/24/2021 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Spirit Aerosystems Holdings, Inc., Spirit Aerosystems, Inc. by International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local 1558 (With attachments). (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Local 1558. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America et al v. Spirit Aerosystems Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirit Aerosystems, Inc.
Represented By: Joel E. Abrahamson
Represented By: Matthew C. Tews
Represented By: Joseph E. Santucci, Jr.
Represented By: Nicole L. Faulkner
Represented By: Kimberly Lambert Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirit Aerosystems Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Joel E. Abrahamson
Represented By: Matthew C. Tews
Represented By: Joseph E. Santucci, Jr.
Represented By: Nicole L. Faulkner
Represented By: Kimberly Lambert Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 1558
Represented By: L. Mark Bonner
Represented By: Rod Tanner
Represented By: Jamie Harrison
Represented By: Aarika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Represented By: L. Mark Bonner
Represented By: Rod Tanner
Represented By: Jamie Harrison
Represented By: Aarika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?