Gammon v. C.R. Bard, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Lynn Gammon
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00064
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Filing 21 MAIL to Todd C. Comeaux Returned - marked Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Foward. (Re: #16 Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s), Ruling on Motion to Substitute Attorney ) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2021 Filing 20 MAIL to Todd C. Comeaux Returned - marked Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. (Re: 11 Ruling on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #18 Joint Motion for Temporary Stay and temporarily staying case until 7/30/2021. Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2021. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2021 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Temporary Stay by All Defendants; Responses due by 4/6/2021(Griffith, Joseph)
March 22, 2021 Filing 17 MAIL to Todd C. Comeaux Returned - marked Return to Sender - Vacant - Unable to Forward. (Re: 7 Minute Order, Reassigning Case, 6 Minute Order ) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #15 Motion to Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. Accordingly, attorney Richard B. North, Jr. is deemed withdrawn and attorney Joseph P. Griffith is substituted in as counsel for Defendants. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Richard North, Jr. and MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph P. Griffith by All Defendants Responses due by 4/1/2021(Griffith, Joseph)
March 17, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Griffith, Joseph)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson & Co. for C. R. Bard, Incorporated) by C. R. Bard, Incorporated (Griffith, Joseph)
March 12, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joseph P. Griffith on behalf of All Defendants (Griffith, Joseph)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Joseph P. Griffith for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C. R. Bard, Incorporated, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Joseph P. Griffith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1468342) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (With attachments) Responses due by 3/24/2021(Buchan, J.)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Micah John Petersen on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (Petersen, Micah)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Craig Buchan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (Buchan, J.)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: This case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White, Judge Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number 21-cv-0064-RAW. (kch, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Assigning this case to United States District Judge Scott L. Palk of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 292(b). (kch, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Arizona
February 25, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Oklahoma via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/18/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
January 27, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-267-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
January 27, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13856672 filed by Tammy Lynn Gammon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gammon v. C.R. Bard, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph P. Griffith
Represented By: J. Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph P. Griffith
Represented By: J. Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Lynn Gammon
Represented By: Peyton P Murphy
Represented By: Todd C Comeaux
Represented By: Peyton P. Murphy
Represented By: Todd C. Comeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?