Rethman et al v. C.R. Bard, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Patricia A Rethman and Michael Ben Rethman
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C. R. Bard, Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2021cv00066
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi Warmbrod Dishman
Referring Judge: John F Heil
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III GRANTING #17 Joint Motion for Temporary Stay. Accordingly, the case is stayed for a period of 120 days. Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report in 60 days, or by 5/28/2021. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Temporary Stay by All Defendants; Responses due by 4/6/2021(Griffith, Joseph)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III GRANTING #15 Motion to Withdraw Attorney and Substitution of Counsel. Accordingly, attorney Richard B. North, Jr. is deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc; substitution counsel Joseph P. Griffith, J. Craig Buchan, and Micah J. Petersen have entered an appearance on behalf of above said defendants. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Richard North, Jr. and MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph P. Griffith by All Defendants; Responses due by 4/5/2021 (Griffith, Joseph)
March 19, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Griffith, Joseph)
March 19, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson & Co. for C. R. Bard, Incorporated) by C. R. Bard, Incorporated (Griffith, Joseph)
March 19, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joseph P. Griffith on behalf of All Defendants (Griffith, Joseph)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III GRANTING #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Joseph P. Griffith for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C. R. Bard, Incorporated, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Joseph P. Griffith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1468332) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (With attachments) Responses due by 3/24/2021(Buchan, J.)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Micah John Petersen on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (Petersen, Micah)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Craig Buchan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (Buchan, J.)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning this case to United State District Judge John F. Heil, III. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-21-66-JFH (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Assigning this case to United States District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 292(b). (kch, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Arizona
February 25, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Oklahoma via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/18/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-00220-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16402170 filed by Patricia A Rethman, Michael Ben Rethman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 2/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rethman et al v. C.R. Bard, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Rethman
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Arati C. Furness
Represented By: Matthew R. McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ben Rethman
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Arati C. Furness
Represented By: Matthew R. McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph P. Griffith
Represented By: J. Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph P. Griffith
Represented By: J. Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?