Garner v. C R Bard,Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Carrie Garner
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C. R. Bard, Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2021cv00138
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (Griffith, Joseph)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III GRANTING #14 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney and MOTION to Substitute Attorney Following Remand. Accordingly, attorney Richard B. North, Jr. is deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for defendants C. R. Bard, Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. It is further ordered that attorneys Joseph P. Griffith, Jonathan B. Bass, J. Craig Buchan, and Micah J. Petersen and hereby substituted as counsel of record for above named defendants. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Attorney and MOTION to Substitute Attorney Following Remand by All Defendants Responses due by 6/28/2021(Griffith, Joseph)
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan B. Bass on behalf of All Defendants (Bass, Jonathan)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joseph P. Griffith on behalf of All Defendants (Griffith, Joseph)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Jonathan B. Bass as counsel for defendants, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (dma, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Joseph P. Griffith as counsel for defendants, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (dma, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Jonathan Bass to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1505908) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (With attachments) Responses due by 6/3/2021(Buchan, J.)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Joseph P. Griffith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1505905) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (With attachments) Responses due by 6/3/2021(Buchan, J.)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Micah John Petersen on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (Petersen, Micah)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Craig Buchan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (Buchan, J.)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Arizona
May 7, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Oklahoma via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/7/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/7/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED by Doc. #4 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from azd on 5/7/2021.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-3085-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/7/2021.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16021136 filed by Carrie Garner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner v. C R Bard,Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Garner
Represented By: Russell W Budd
Represented By: Sindhu Daniel
Represented By: Laura J Baughman
Represented By: Laura J. Baughman
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: J. Craig Buchan
Represented By: Jonathan B. Bass
Represented By: Joseph P. Griffith
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: J. Craig Buchan
Represented By: Jonathan B. Bass
Represented By: Joseph P. Griffith
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?