Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma v. Enable Midstream Partners, LP et al
Plaintiff: Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma
Defendant: Zenergy, Inc., Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enogex, LLC, Enable GP, LLC, Zinke and Trumbo, Inc., ABC Companies, Highland Partners Holdings, LLC and Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv00190
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #28 Second MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC ;(Scaperlanda, Christopher)
August 27, 2021 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC ;(Welsh, Bradley)
August 18, 2021 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of District Judge John F. Heil, III and at the direction of the Court, this case is hereby reassigned to United States Judge Scott L. Palk of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number 21-CV-190-SLP. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2021 Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of United States District Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge John F. Heil, III. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-21-190-JFH. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #29 Motion to Dismiss Party and dismissing Defendant Zenergy, Inc. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #28 Second MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma ;(Burrage, Michael)
August 13, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma ; (With attachments)(Burrage, Michael)
August 13, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma ; (With attachments)(Burrage, Michael)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: In light of the Amended Complaint filed on 7/23/2021 (Re: #23 Amended Complaint) Defendants' #16 #18 and #19 Motions to Dismiss Case are hereby deemed MOOT. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Zenergy, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 8/13/2021(Ferguson, Tom) Modified on 8/16/2021 to edit text and event (tls, Deputy Clerk).
July 30, 2021 Filing 28 Second MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC Responses due by 8/13/2021(Scaperlanda, Christopher)
July 30, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, With Brief in Support by Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC Responses due by 8/13/2021(Welsh, Bradley) Modified on 8/6/2021 to edit filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
July 23, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Renley Dennis on behalf of Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma (Dennis, J.)
July 23, 2021 Filing 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Austin Vance on behalf of Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma (Vance, Austin)
July 23, 2021 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma (Burrage, Michael)
July 23, 2021 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma [NOTE: Attorney Michael Burrage added to party Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma(pty:pla)]. (Burrage, Michael)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White inviting Plaintiff, if it so desires, to file an amended complaint by 7/23/2021, providing additional legal or factual averments which may vitiate Defendants claims of insufficiency. (Re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: inviting Plaintiff, if it so desires, to file an amended complaint by 7/23/2021, providing additional legal or factual averments which may vitiate Defendants claims of insufficiency. (Re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim with Brief In Support) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White inviting Plaintiff, if it so desires, to file an amended complaint by 7/23/2021, providing additional legal or factual averments which may vitiate Defendants claims of insufficiency. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 7, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Zenergy, Inc. Responses due by 7/21/2021(Ferguson, Tom)
July 7, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim with Brief In Support by Highland Partners Holdings, LLC Responses due by 7/21/2021(Welsh, Bradley)
July 7, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Kinder Morgan, Inc. for Highland Partners Holdings, LLC) by Highland Partners Holdings, LLC (Welsh, Bradley)
July 6, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC Responses due by 7/20/2021(Scaperlanda, Christopher)
July 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Consent to Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by Highland Partners Holdings, LLC (Welsh, Bradley)
July 2, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bradley W. Welsh on behalf of Highland Partners Holdings, LLC (Welsh, Bradley)
July 2, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tammy D. Barrett on behalf of Highland Partners Holdings, LLC (Barrett, Tammy)
July 2, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Terry D. Ragsdale on behalf of Highland Partners Holdings, LLC (Ragsdale, Terry)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Corporate Parent Enable GP, LLC for Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC) by Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC (Scaperlanda, Christopher)
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Enable GP, LLC for Enable Midstream Partners, LP) by Enable Midstream Partners, LP (Scaperlanda, Christopher)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent OGE Enogex Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent CenterPointe Energy Midstream INC for Enable GP, LLC) by Enable GP, LLC (Scaperlanda, Christopher)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D. McClintock on behalf of Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC (McClintock, Michael)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher M. Scaperlanda on behalf of Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC (Scaperlanda, Christopher)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zenergy, Inc. (Ferguson, Tom)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tom Q. Ferguson on behalf of Zenergy, Inc. (Ferguson, Tom)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent to Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Zenergy, Inc. (Ferguson, Tom)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 7/7/2021)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 30, 2021 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 6/30/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1523228 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC (Scaperlanda, Christopher)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Bryan County District Court, case number CJ-2021-075 by Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2021 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against ABC Companies, Enable GP, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC, Highland Partners Holdings, LLC, Zenergy, Inc. by Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma v. Enable Midstream Partners, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenergy, Inc.
Represented By: Tom Q. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Scaperlanda
Represented By: Michael D. McClintock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enable Midstream Partners, LP
Represented By: Christopher M. Scaperlanda
Represented By: Michael D. McClintock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enogex, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Scaperlanda
Represented By: Michael D. McClintock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enable GP, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Scaperlanda
Represented By: Michael D. McClintock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zinke and Trumbo, Inc.
Represented By: Tom Q. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Partners Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bradley W. Welsh
Represented By: Tammy D. Barrett
Represented By: Terry D. Ragsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiland Partners Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bradley W. Welsh
Represented By: Tammy D. Barrett
Represented By: Terry D. Ragsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma
Represented By: Austin Vance
Represented By: J. Renley Dennis
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?