Osburn v. Ardmore Suzuki, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Osburn
Defendant: Ardmore Suzuki, Inc. a Domestic for Profit Business Corporation doing business as Jones Power Sports and Polaris Industries, Inc,
Case Number: 6:2021cv00234
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District ) by Polaris Industries, Inc, ;(Thomas, William)
September 24, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION to Remand ) by Polaris Industries, Inc, ;(Thomas, William)
September 22, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District ) by David Osburn ; (With attachments)(Manning, Ashley)
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Steven P. Shreder and at the direction of the Court this case is hereby reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-21-234-JFH. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas by Polaris Industries, Inc, (With attachments) Responses due by 9/24/2021(Woodson, Michael)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by David Osburn (With attachments) Responses due by 9/24/2021(Manning, Ashley)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William B. Thomas on behalf of Polaris Industries, Inc, (Thomas, William)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David T. McDowell on behalf of Polaris Industries, Inc, (McDowell, David)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Polaris Industries, Inc, (Woodson, Michael)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley S. Manning on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Manning, Ashley)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David T. McDowell on behalf of Defendant Polaris Industries, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William B. Thomas on behalf of Defendant Polaris Industries, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney David T. McDowell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1551106) by Polaris Industries, Inc, (With attachments) Responses due by 9/16/2021(Woodson, Michael)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney William B. Thomas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number COKEDC-1551081) by Polaris Industries, Inc, (With attachments) Responses due by 9/16/2021(Woodson, Michael)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Polaris Industries, Inc. (Polaris, Inc. added as corporate parent for Polaris Industries, Inc.) (Woodson, Michael) Modified on 8/18/2021 to add corporate parent (dma, Deputy Clerk).
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 8/18/2021) (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Bryan County District Court, case number 21-CJ-103 by Polaris Industries, Inc. (With attachments) (tjm, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/17/2021 to delete filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Polaris Industries, Inc. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2021 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/11/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1541175 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by Polaris Industries, Inc. (Woodson, Michael)
August 9, 2021 PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Ardmore Suzuki, Inc., Polaris Industries, Inc. by David Osburn (tjm, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osburn v. Ardmore Suzuki, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Osburn
Represented By: Ashley S. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardmore Suzuki, Inc. a Domestic for Profit Business Corporation doing business as Jones Power Sports
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc,
Represented By: Michael Woodson
Represented By: William B. Thomas
Represented By: David T. McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?