Phillips v. James et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Phillips
Defendant: Jesse James, Jessica Brown, David Dobson and Jesse Petty
Case Number: 6:2021cv00256
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support of Civil Complaint (Re: #3 Amended Complaint) by Melissa Phillips. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Plaintiff's Motion to Request to File Pleadings by E-Mail (Docket Entry #4 ) is hereby DENIED.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Injunctive Order, Declarative Order, Preliminary Order and Emergency Order by Melissa Phillips. Responses due by 9/23/2021. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File by Email by Melissa Phillips. Responses due by 9/23/2021. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jessica Brown, David Dobson, Jesse James, Jesse Petty (Re: #2 Complaint) by Melissa Phillips. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jessica Brown, David Dobson, Jesse James by Melissa Phillips (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Melissa Phillips (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2021 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/26/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number 19430 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Melissa Phillips (tjm, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?