Hurst v. Crow
Petitioner: Shaun Lovell Franklin Hurst
Respondent: Scott Crow, Mark Bowen and John O'Connor
Case Number: 6:2021cv00308
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion. Responses due by 12/14/2021 (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss ) (acg, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Shaun Lovell Franklin Hurst Responses due by 12/10/2021(Gelety, Michael)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Corpus Petition for Failure to Exhaust Necessary State Remedies) by Scott Crow (With attachments)(Hunt, Caroline)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Corpus Petition for Failure to Exhaust Necessary State Remedies by Scott Crow Responses due by 11/29/2021(Hunt, Caroline)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Caroline E.J. Hunt on behalf of Scott Crow (Hunt, Caroline)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West, directing Respondent to show cause why the writ should not issue and file a response to the petition. Responses due by 11/15/2021 #2 (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Terminating as respondents Mark Bowen and John O'Connor. Petitioner is incarcerated at Lawton Correctional Facility, a private prison in Lawton, Oklahoma. Therefore, the Director of the Oklahoma Department Corrections is his sole custodian for purposes of this habeas corpus action. See Rule 2(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases; Braden v. 30th Judicial Circuit Court of Ky., 410 U.S. 484, 494-95 (1973). (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Volume IV) EXHIBITS in Support of #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Shaun Lovell Franklin Hurst (Gelety, Michael)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Volume III) EXHIBITS in Support of #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Shaun Lovell Franklin Hurst (Gelety, Michael)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Volume II) EXHIBITS in Support of #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Shaun Lovell Franklin Hurst (Gelety, Michael)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Volume I) EXHIBITS in Support of #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Shaun Lovell Franklin Hurst (Gelety, Michael)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-21-308-RAW-KEW. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D. Gelety on behalf of Shaun Lovell Franklin Hurst (Gelety, Michael)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $5.00 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 10/20/2021)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Shaun Lovell Franklin Hurst (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Shaun Lovell Franklin Hurst (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/13/2021 in the amount of $5, receipt number AOKEDC-1568689 (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) by Shaun Lovell Franklin Hurst (Gelety, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurst v. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shaun Lovell Franklin Hurst
Represented By: Michael D. Gelety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Crow
Represented By: Caroline E.J. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?