D'Arcy v. Doe Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brandon D'Arcy
Defendant: Doe Corporation doing business as Turnpoint Services, Hunter Super Techs Services Corporation, Doe Corporation 1-25, John Doe 1-25 and Turnpoint Services
Case Number: 6:2022cv00144
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) by Brandon D'Arcy(on behalf of himself ) ; (With attachments)(Hubbard, Emily)
June 24, 2022 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hunter Super Techs Services Corporation, Turnpoint Services [NOTE: Attorney Jonathan G. Rector added to party Turnpoint Services(pty:dft)]. (Rector, Jonathan)
June 17, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Turnpoint Services Responses due by 7/1/2022(Rector, Jonathan)
June 17, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Hunter Super Techs Services Corporation (Rector, Jonathan)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Motion by Essential Services Intermediate Holding Corporation d/b/a Turnpoint Services and Hunter Super Techs Service Corporation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Docket Entry #15 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than JUNE 17, 2022. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint) by Doe Corporation, Hunter Super Techs Services Corporation (With attachments) [NOTE: Attorney Jonathan G. Rector added to parties Doe Corporation (pty:dft) and Hunter Super Techs Services Corporation (pty:dft)]. Responses due by 6/14/2022(Rector, Jonathan)
May 18, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Doe Corporation - Served on 5/16/22 by Brandon D'Arcy (on behalf of himself) (Hubbard, Emily) Modified on 5/20/2022 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk).
May 18, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Hunter Super Techs Services Corporation - Served on 5/13/22 by Brandon D'Arcy (on behalf of himself) (Hubbard, Emily) Modified on 5/20/2022 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk).
May 17, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Biller on behalf of Brandon D'Arcy (Biller, Andrew) Modified on 5/19/2022 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk).
May 17, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Kimble on behalf of Brandon D'Arcy (Kimble, Andrew) Modified on 5/19/2022 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk).
May 17, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Emily A. Hubbard on behalf of Brandon D'Arcy (Hubbard, Emily) Modified on 5/19/2022 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk).
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Jeffrey Taylor on behalf of Andrew P. Kimble (Docket Entry #6 ), Andrew R. Biller (Docket Entry #7 ), and Emily A. Hubbard (Docket Entry #8 ) are hereby GRANTED. Mr. Kimble, Mr. Biller, and Ms. Hubbard are admitted to practice in this District for the limited purpose of representing Plaintiff in this action. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
May 12, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Emily Hubbard to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1656618) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 5/26/2022(Taylor, Jeff)
May 12, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Robert Biller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1656616) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 5/26/2022(Taylor, Jeff)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Andrew Kimble to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1656604) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 5/26/2022(Taylor, Jeff)
May 11, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Hunter Super Techs Services Corporation (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Doe Corporation (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2022 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 5/11/2022 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1656209 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Brandon D'Arcy (Taylor, Jeff)
May 10, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 5/17/2022)(tjm, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Doe Corporation, Doe Corporation 1-25, Hunter Super Techs Services Corporation, John Doe 1-25 by Brandon D'Arcy (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Brandon D'Arcy (tjm, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Arcy v. Doe Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon D'Arcy
Represented By: Jeff A. Taylor
Represented By: Andrew R. Biller
Represented By: Andrew P. Kimble
Represented By: Emily A. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation doing business as Turnpoint Services
Represented By: Jonathan G. Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Super Techs Services Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan G. Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turnpoint Services
Represented By: Jonathan G. Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?