Wright et al v. Wallace et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Christopher Wright and Mary B. Jones
Defendant: Patrick L. Wallace and Pamela K. Wallace
Not Yet Classified: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2022cv00166
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion entitled: " Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Order; and Plaintiff's Opposition to Claims of Adverse Possession" (Re: #14 MOTION for Order) by Stephen Christopher Wright ; (With attachments)(tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION for Order ) by Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace ;(Whaley, Phillip)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Poe on behalf of United States of America (Poe, Jason)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE to the Court and Disclaimer of Interest by United States of America (Brandon, Susan)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan S. Brandon on behalf of United States of America (Brandon, Susan)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Pendency of Suit to Eddie Streater, Regional Director, Eastern Oklahoma Region, Bureau of Indian Affairs served on 06/27/2022 by Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace (Whaley, Phillip)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White, District Judge John F. Heil, III no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-22-166-RAW. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace ;(Whaley, Phillip)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace ; (With attachments)(Whaley, Phillip)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PLAINTIFFF'S MOTION for Order by Stephen Christopher Wright. Responses due by 7/7/2022. (adw, Deputy Clerk) Modified to correct scrivener's error on 6/23/2022 (adw, Deputy Clerk).
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Pendency of Suit by Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace (Whaley, Phillip)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Stephen Christopher Wright ;(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - At the direction of the Court and pursuant to General Order No. 22-7 regarding Category 1 cases, this case is reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 22-166-JFH. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Pursuant to General Order No. 22-7 regarding Category 1 cases, the Court Clerk is directed to randomly reassign this case to a United States District Judge. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Stephen Christopher Wright (With attachments). Responses due by 6/24/2022. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace (With attachments) Responses due by 6/21/2022(Whaley, Phillip)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace (Whaley, Phillip)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joshua K. Hefner on behalf of Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace (Hefner, Joshua)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew C. Kane on behalf of Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace (Kane, Matthew)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Phillip G. Whaley on behalf of Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace (Whaley, Phillip)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 6/7/2022)(tjm, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Carter County District Court, case number 21-cv-156 by Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace (With attachments)(tjm, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order FILING FEES Paid in Full on 5/31/2022 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1664403 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace (Whaley, Phillip)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order AMENDED COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Pamela K. Wallace, Patrick L. Wallace by Stephen Christopher Wright, Mary B. Jones (tjm, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. Wallace et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick L. Wallace
Represented By: Phillip G. Whaley
Represented By: Joshua K. Hefner
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela K. Wallace
Represented By: Phillip G. Whaley
Represented By: Joshua K. Hefner
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: United States of America
Represented By: Susan S. Brandon
Represented By: Jason Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?