Colton et al v. Continental Resources, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gregg B. Colton
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc., Enable Gathering & Processing, LLC and DewBlaine Energy, LLC
Case Number: 6:2022cv00208
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jason A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Filing 30 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Enable Gathering & Processing, LLC. (jls, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2022 Filing 29 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to DewBlaine Energy, LLC. (jls, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2022 Filing 28 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of himself), Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of a class of similarly situated persons) (Barton, George)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Joint Motion to Modify Date for Scheduling Conference (Docket Entry #23 ) is hereby GRANTED. The in person Scheduling Conference currently set for September 19, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby CONTINUED to OCTOBER 13, 2022 AT 1:30 P.M. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than OCTOBER 10, 2022. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney Stacy A. Burrows to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1703067) by Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of himself), Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of a class of similarly situated persons) Responses due by 9/28/2022(Hicks, James)
September 13, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay ) by Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of himself), Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of a class of similarly situated persons) ;(Barton, George)
September 13, 2022 Filing 24 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of himself), Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of a class of similarly situated persons) (Barton, George)
September 13, 2022 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing(s) by All Defendants Responses due by 9/27/2022(Hampton, Joe)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson setting Scheduling Conference for 9/19/2022 at 10:30 AM in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. Parties are directed to file Joint Status Report by 9/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(rak, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2022 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth L. Tiblets on behalf of Continental Resources, Inc. (Tiblets, Elizabeth)
August 31, 2022 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey C. King on behalf of Continental Resources, Inc. (King, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Continental Resources, Inc. (King, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2022 Filing 18 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION to Stay) by Continental Resources, Inc. (With attachments)(King, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION to Stay by Continental Resources, Inc. (With attachments) [NOTE: Attorney Jeffrey C. King added to party Continental Resources, Inc.(pty:dft)]. Responses due by 9/14/2022(King, Jeffrey). Added MOTION to Stay on 9/2/2022 (dma, Deputy Clerk).
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Docket Entry #15 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by SEPTEMBER 2, 2022. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2022 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Continental Resources, Inc. Responses due by 8/17/2022(Hampton, Joe)
August 3, 2022 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Continental Resources, Inc. (Hampton, Joe)
August 3, 2022 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joe M. Hampton on behalf of Continental Resources, Inc. (Hampton, Joe)
July 27, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Seth K. Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jones, Seth)
July 27, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by George A. Barton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Barton, George)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson:the #6 Motion for Admission of George A. Barton, Pro Hac Vice and #7 Motion for Admission of Seth K. Jones, Pro Hac Vice, both filed by James R. Hicks are hereby GRANTED. Messrs. Barton and Jones are hereby ADMITTED to this District for the sole and exclusive purpose of representing Plaintiff in this action provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Continental Resources, Inc. - Served on 7/22/2022. by Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of himself); Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of a class of similarly situated persons) (Henson, Trevor)
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Continental Resources, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 20, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Seth K. Jones to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number BOKEDC-1682778) by Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of himself), Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of all others similarly situated) Responses due by 8/3/2022(Hicks, James)
July 20, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney George A. Barton to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1682775) by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/3/2022(Hicks, James)
July 20, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Trevor R. Henson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Henson, Trevor)
July 20, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James R. Hicks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hicks, James)
July 20, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/27/2022)(jls, Deputy Clerk)
July 20, 2022 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/20/2022 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1682752 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of himself), Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Henson, Trevor)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Continental Resources, Inc. by Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of himself), Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (jls, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Gregg B. Colton (on behalf of himself), Gregg B. Colton(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (jls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colton et al v. Continental Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg B. Colton
Represented By: James R. Hicks
Represented By: Trevor R. Henson
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Seth K. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Tiblets
Represented By: Jeffrey C. King
Represented By: Joe M. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enable Gathering & Processing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DewBlaine Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?