Ganjawala et al v. Jariwala
Plaintiff: Yogesh Ganjawala and Reshma Ganjawala
Defendant: Jitendra Jariwala
Case Number: 6:2023cv00290
Filed: September 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gerald L Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson: Plaintiffs have failed to show good cause for their failure to file Disclosure Statements in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). This matter will be addressed at the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/9/2023 at 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. (daw, Chambers)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 11/9/2023 at 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. Counsel should inform Paige Bruce at Paige_Bruce@oked.uscourts.gov by 11/7/2023 at 4:30 PM of a telephone number where they may reached, should it be different from the number of record in the case. Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 11/3/2023. (daw, Chambers)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson directing Plaintiffs to show cause within 7 days for their failure to file Disclosure Statements in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). (daw, Chambers) Modified on 10/13/2023 to correct text (pmb, Deputy Clerk).
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson: Plaintiffs Yogesh Ganjawala and Reshma Ganjawala are directed to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Tuesday, October 10, 2023, as previously directed by this Court's Order (Dkt. 5). (pmb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/2/2023 to correct text. (pmb, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jitendra Jariwala (Hullum, Patrick)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Reshma Ganjawala and Yogesh Ganjawala by Jitendra Jariwala ***Part 2 of 2 part document. See pleading #8 *** (dma, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court ***Part 1 of 2 part document. See pleading #9 *** (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Jitendra Jariwala (Hullum, Patrick) Modified on 9/11/2023 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second and Third Causes of Action by Jitendra Jariwala Responses due by 9/22/2023 (Hullum, Patrick)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrick L. Hullum on behalf of Jitendra Jariwala (Hullum, Patrick)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/5/2023 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1843319 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Jitendra Jariwala (Hullum, Patrick)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(jld, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at # https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days.(Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/22/2023)(jld, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/8/2023) (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) (jld, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Atoka County District Court, case number CJ-2023-38 by Jitendra Jariwala (With attachments).(jld, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jitendra Jariwala. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Jitendra Jariwala by Yogesh Ganjawala, Reshma Ganjawala. (jld, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ganjawala et al v. Jariwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yogesh Ganjawala
Represented By: David E. Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reshma Ganjawala
Represented By: David E. Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jitendra Jariwala
Represented By: Patrick L. Hullum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?