Blanton v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Autumn Blanton
Defendant: Martin Wilson, Michael Knutson, WW Tank & Vessel, Inc., WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC and W&W Fiberglass Tank Company
Case Number: 6:2023cv00401
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Gerald L Jackson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III, directing Defendant WW Tank of Oklahoma, LLC to file a supplemental corporate disclosure statement, identifying its members and sub-members, down to the level of the individual or corporation, no later than January 26, 2024. (tlp, Chambers)
January 16, 2024 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent WZW Holdings, LLC for WW Tank & Vessel, Inc.) by WW Tank & Vessel, Inc. (Preston, Montrel)
January 16, 2024 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent WZW Holdings, LLC for W&W Fiberglass Tank Company ) by W&W Fiberglass Tank Company (Preston, Montrel)
January 16, 2024 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent WZW Holdings, LLC for WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC) by WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC (Preston, Montrel)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III, directing Defendants WW Tank & Vessel, Inc., WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC, and W&W Fiberglass Tank Company each to file a corporate disclosure statement, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, within seven (7) days of this Order. Each partnership shall identify its partners and sub-partners and each limited liability company shall identify its members and sub-members, down to the level of the individual or corporation. (tlp, Chambers)
January 8, 2024 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-23-401-JFH. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference previously set for 1/10/2024 at 11:15 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson is hereby STRICKEN. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2024 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael Knutson, W&W Fiberglass Tank Company, WW Tank & Vessel, Inc., WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC, Martin Wilson (Preston, Montrel)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 1/10/2024 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. Counsel should inform Paige Bruce at Paige_Bruce@oked.uscourts.gov by 1/8/2024 at 4:30 PM of a telephone number where they may be reached, should it be different from the number of record in the case. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 1/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form, #2 Proposed Scheduling Order) (daw, Chambers)
December 12, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) by Autumn Blanton ;(Polchinski, Andrew)
December 5, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Montrel D. Preston on behalf of W&W Fiberglass Tank Company (Preston, Montrel)
December 5, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by W&W Fiberglass Tank Company (Bragalone, Robert)
December 5, 2023 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert A. Bragalone on behalf of W&W Fiberglass Tank Company (Bragalone, Robert)
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by WW Tank & Vessel, Inc. Responses due by 12/13/2023(Bragalone, Robert)
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC (Bragalone, Robert)
November 29, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Martin Wilson (Bragalone, Robert)
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Michael Knutson (Bragalone, Robert)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert A. Bragalone on behalf of Michael Knutson, WW Tank & Vessel, Inc., WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC, Martin Wilson (Bragalone, Robert)
November 22, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Montrel D. Preston on behalf of Michael Knutson, WW Tank & Vessel, Inc., WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC, Martin Wilson (Preston, Montrel)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert A. Bragalone on behalf of Michael Knutson, WW Tank & Vessel, Inc., WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC, Martin Wilson (Bragalone, Robert)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(jld, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at # https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days.(Miscellaneous Deadline set for 12/13/2023)(jld, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 11/29/2023) (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) (jld, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Seminole County District Court, case number CJ-2023-116 by Michael Knutson, WW Tank & Vessel, Inc., WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC, Martin Wilson. (With attachments)(jld, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/22/2023 to delete filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michael Knutson, WW Tank & Vessel, Inc., WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC, Martin Wilson. (jld, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/22/2023 to delete filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 22, 2023 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/22/2023 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1875101 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Michael Knutson, WW Tank & Vessel, Inc., WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC, Martin Wilson (Bragalone, Robert)
October 16, 2023 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Michael Knutson, W&W Fiberglass Tank Company, WW Tank & Vessel, Inc., WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC, Martin Wilson by Autumn Blanton. (jld, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanton v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autumn Blanton
Represented By: Andrew Polchinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Wilson
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Represented By: Montrel D. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Knutson
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Represented By: Montrel D. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WW Tank & Vessel, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Represented By: Montrel D. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WW Tank Oklahoma, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Represented By: Montrel D. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W&W Fiberglass Tank Company
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Represented By: Montrel D. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?