Henderson v. Officer Tharp et al
Plaintiff: Damon Henderson
Defendant: Officer Tharp, Larry Crossland and Spiro, Town of
Case Number: 6:2024cv00053
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jason A Robertson
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA TO TOWN OF SPIRO by Damon Henderson (Jones, Ronald)
March 28, 2024 Filing 31 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Larry Crossland(Chief, in his official capacity), Larry Crossland(Chief, in his individual capacity), Officer Tharp, Spiro, Town of (Wood, Scott)
March 28, 2024 Filing 30 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Damon Henderson (Jones, Ronald)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: In accordance with the discussions with counsel at the Scheduling Conference conducted on this date, the parties shall (1) each file their Fed. R. Civ. P 26(a)(1) disclosures by the close of business today, MARCH 28, 2024; (2) exchange all exhibits identified in the Rule 26 disclosures by the close of business today, MARCH 28, 2024; and (3) Defendants shall file their answers to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint no later than APRIL 11, 2024. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2024 Filing 28 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Scheduling Conference held on 3/28/2024. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson setting Scheduling Order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 4/5/2024; Joinder of Parties due by 4/5/2024; Exhibit List due by 5/31/2024; Witness List due by 5/31/2024; Discovery due by 6/28/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2024; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 10/18/2024; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/18/2024; Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2024 at 10:30 AM in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Ronald A. White. Jury Trial set for 12/3/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Ronald A. White. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2024 Filing 26 AMENDED JOINT STATUS REPORT by Damon Henderson. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: The IN-PERSON Scheduling Conference is RESET for 3/28/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: The parties are advised that this case has been referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson for all pretrial and discovery matters, including dispositive motions, in accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-24-053-RAW-JAR. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2024 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and hearings set before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson are hereby stricken. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-24-53-RAW. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: The parties have indicated in the Joint Status Report (Docket No. #21 ) that one or both of the parties DO NOT consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to FRCP 73. The Clerk is directed to reassign this matter to a District Judge. The Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson is STRICKEN. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2024 Filing 21 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Damon Henderson (Jones, Ronald)
March 21, 2024 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Damon Henderson (Jones, Ronald)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Eric D. Cotton (Docket Entry #17 ) is hereby GRANTED. Mr. Cotton is deemed WITHDRAWN from further representation of Plaintiff in this action. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline(s) (Docket No. #15 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff has until or before 03/21/24 to file an Amended Complaint; Defendant's Answer is due on or before 04/04/24. The Joint Status Report is due on or before 03/22/24. The Scheduling Conference remains as previously set for 3/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Eric D. Cotton by Damon Henderson Responses due by 3/22/2024 (Cotton, Eric)
March 7, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena to OSBI by Damon Henderson (Jones, Ronald)
March 6, 2024 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline(s) by Damon Henderson Responses due by 3/20/2024(Jones, Ronald)
March 4, 2024 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ronald C. Jones, II on behalf of Damon Henderson (Jones, Ronald)
February 26, 2024 Filing 13 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Zoom Rule 73 Status Hearing held on 2/26/2024. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson RESETTING Zoom Rule 73 Status Conference for 2/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2024 Filing 11 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Docket Call for Zoom Rule 73 Status Conference held on 2/22/2024. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Larry Crossland(Chief, in his official capacity), Larry Crossland(Chief, in his individual capacity) (Wood, Scott)
February 20, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Officer Tharp (Wood, Scott)
February 19, 2024 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Damon Henderson (Cotton, Eric)
February 15, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Spiro, Town of (Wood, Scott)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson setting Rule 73 Conference for 2/22/2024 at 3:00 PM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. Parties are directed to file Joint Status Report by 3/14/2024. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at # https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/ forms/all-forms/civil in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days.(Miscellaneous Deadline set for 3/4/2024) (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $405 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 2/20/2024) (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from LeFlore County District Court, case number CJ-2023-228 by Larry Crossland (Chief, in his official capacity), Larry Crossland (Chief, in his individual capacity), Officer Tharp, Spiro, Town of (With attachments) (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Larry Crossland (Chief, in his official capacity), Larry Crossland (Chief, in his individual capacity), Officer Tharp, Spiro, Town of (eaw, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/12/2024 in the amount of $405, receipt number AOKEDC-1905031 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, ) by Larry Crossland(Chief, in his official capacity ), Larry Crossland(Chief, in his individual capacity ), Officer Tharp, Spiro, Town of (Wood, Scott)
November 21, 2023 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Larry Crossland (Chief, in his official capacity), Larry Crossland (Chief, in his individual capacity), Officer Tharp, Spiro, Town of by Damon Henderson (eaw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Officer Tharp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Henderson
Represented By: Eric D. Cotton
Represented By: Ronald C. Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tharp
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Crossland
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spiro, Town of
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?