Wildman et al v. Integon National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: William Warren Wildman, Jr. and Mary Kelly Wildman
Defendant: Integon National Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2024cv00057
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Gerald L Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III setting Settlement Conference for 11/19/2024 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. Settlement Conference Statements must be submitted by 11/05/2024. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson setting Scheduling Order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 6/7/2024; Joinder of Parties due by 6/7/2024; Exhibit List due by 7/26/2024; Witness List due by 7/26/2024; Discovery due by 9/23/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 10/8/2024; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/18/2025; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 3/5/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2025 at 10:30 AM in Chambers, Room 327, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. (daw, Chambers)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson granting #19 Joint Motion for Entry of a Stipulated Protective Order. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2024 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Integon National Insurance Company Responses due by 4/11/2024(Narendran, Anamayan)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III, referring case to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-24-57-JFH-GLJ. (tlp, Chambers)
March 15, 2024 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of District Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-24-57-JFH (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson: The parties have expressly indicated in the #15 Joint Status Report signed by an authorized representative of each party in this case that they do not wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this case. Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b). As a result, this case is REASSIGNED to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-24-57-RAW. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2024 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Integon National Insurance Company (Narendran, Anamayan)
February 26, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Integon National Insurance Company (Narendran, Anamayan)
February 23, 2024 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by William Warren Wildman, Jr (Hamilton, Laura)
February 23, 2024 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mary Kelly Wildman (Hamilton, Laura)
February 23, 2024 Filing 11 JURY DEMAND by Mary Kelly Wildman, William Warren Wildman, Jr (Hamilton, Laura)
February 23, 2024 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura M. Hamilton on behalf of Mary Kelly Wildman, William Warren Wildman, Jr (Hamilton, Laura)
February 23, 2024 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lawrence R. Murphy, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Murphy, Lawrence)
February 22, 2024 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael J. Heron on behalf of Integon National Insurance Company (Heron, Michael)
February 22, 2024 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Anamayan Narendran on behalf of Integon National Insurance Company (Narendran, Anamayan)
February 22, 2024 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parents Integon National Insurance; National General Management Corporation; National General Holdings Corporation; Allstate Holdings, LLC and Allstate Corporation for Integon National Insurance Company) by Integon National Insurance Company (Narendran, Anamayan)
February 22, 2024 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/22/2024 in the amount of $405, receipt number AOKEDC-1909665 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Integon National Insurance Company (Narendran, Anamayan)
February 16, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2024 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at # https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days.(Miscellaneous Deadline set for 3/8/2024)(rak, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $405 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 2/23/2024) (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) (rak, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Murray County District Court, case number CJ-2024-7 by Integon National Insurance Company. (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Integon National Insurance Company. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2024 PETITION filed in State Court against Integon National Insurance Company by William Warren Wildman, Jr and Mary Kelly Wildman. (rak, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wildman et al v. Integon National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Warren Wildman, Jr.
Represented By: Laura M. Hamilton
Represented By: Lawrence R. Murphy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kelly Wildman
Represented By: Laura M. Hamilton
Represented By: Lawrence R. Murphy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integon National Insurance Company
Represented By: Anamayan Narendran
Represented By: Michael J. Heron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?