Stanke et al v. Penloyd, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Glenn C Willis, James D Miller, Paul H Holladay, Cody A Stanke, Robert A Zellers, Gary D Goad, Robert L Keller, John G Popesczi, Brenda G Hall, Clinton W Geneva, Charles A Williams, Johnny Allen, Robert Miller, Stanley E Pearey, All Plaintiffs, Raymond C Pollard, Michael J Baker, John Tackett, Phillip R Thompson, Daniel Black, Lyle H Mitchell, Sam F McClain, Jeffrey L Dunham, Gregory S Eidschun, Crystal J Fleming, Paul M Stoddard, Lyndle W Billings, Billy J Porter, Terry L Krajicek, Alex D Palmer, Douglas Fankhouser, Daris E Lenard, Alfred Ruffin, William H Matthew, Dennis D Millspaugh, Thomas C Allen, Garland L Allen, Mark D Hailey, George M Eilers, Gregory G Thompson, Timothy L Ridenhour, William D McClendon, Dexter L Edwards, Spencer M Williams, Joseph A Feitus, Jeffrey L Marquette, Sandra K Martin, William E Beattie, Ron L Whalen, Louis W Ruffin, Jr, Stephen L Penrod, Larry G Carlile, Billy W Krouse, Jimmie Taylor, Betty J Bernard, Jeff D Johnson, Donald W Jarvis, Dennis R Spicer, Tony L Mortimer, Ryan M Haslett, Matthew W Lenard, Donald R Little, Jerry L White, Tamantha H Christopher, Bobby R Green, Vincent E Purcell, Edward T Robinson, Glenda A Robinson, Don E Turner, Kent D Daugherty, Curtis A Crosby, Dean W Vester, Thomas E Whiten, Angelan D Hettinger, Johnny C Gilliam, John D Rubottom, Johnny L Krouse, Arturo Gonzalez, Michael Lee Geeter, Willie B Gaines, Steve C Deal, Randall W Phillips and James Matthew Creekmore
Defendant: Penloyd Holding, Inc., Paul Buttsburger, Paul Loyd, Penloyd, LLC, Geordie Cruickshank and John McNicholas
Trustee: Trustee Patrick J. Malloy, III
Case Number: 4:2009cv00140
Filed: March 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Tulsa
Presiding Judge: Paul J Cleary
Referring Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2011 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #61 ) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell, administratively closing the case (terminates case) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
December 22, 2010 Filing 60 STIPULATION of Dismissal, dismissing Penloyd Holding, Inc., Paul B. Loyd, Jr., Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Buttsburger, dismissing All of Plaintiffs' Claims, except those against Penloyd, LLC, (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint,,,,, ) by All Plaintiffs, Paul Buttsburger, Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Loyd, Penloyd Holding, Inc. (Doyle, Kevin)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 12/30/2010); granting 58 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (crp, Dpty Clk)
December 10, 2010 ***Motion(s) Referred to Magistrate Judge Wilson (Re: 58 Oral MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to file dismissal papers ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
December 10, 2010 Filing 58 Oral MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to file dismissal papers by Paul Buttsburger, Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Loyd, Penloyd Holding, Inc. (crp, Dpty Clk)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson per advice from counsel, Steven Hickman and Kevin Doyle that this matter has settled, the Settlement Conference scheduled for 11/4/10 is stricken, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 12/3/2010) (crp, Dpty Clk)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson a telephone conference is scheduled for 10/19/10 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss the Settlement Conference scheduled for 11/4/10, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): (Court will initiate conference call) ( Miscellaneous Hearing set for 10/19/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson) (crp, Dpty Clk)
May 7, 2010 Filing 55 ANSWER (Re: #36 Amended Complaint ) by Penloyd Holding, Inc., Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Loyd, Paul Buttsburger (Vaughan, Randall)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): (Magistrate Courtroom No. 2, Third Floor), ( Settlement Conference set for 11/4/2010 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson) (crp, Dpty Clk)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Correction to Schedule Order #52 correcting the year of the Motion/Miscellaneous Hearing), setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Hearing set for 2/14/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (Re: #52 Scheduling Order,,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s), Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s), Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s), Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) ) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell, setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 11/1/2010, Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2010, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/28/2011, Pretrial Conference set for 3/7/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 3/21/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell), setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Hearing set for 2/14/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating party Tamantha H Christopher; James Matthew Creekmore; Willie B Gaines; Michael Lee Geeter; Arturo Gonzalez; Brenda G Hall; Paul H Holladay; Donald W Jarvis; Jeff D Johnson; Jeffrey L Marquette; Sandra K Martin; Sam F McClain; Louis W Ruffin, Jr; Phillip R Thompson; Thomas E Whiten; Charles A Williams; Garland L Allen and Larry G Carlile ; granting in part and denying in part #40 Motion to Dismiss (hbo, Dpty Clk)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Plaintiff's Motion to Recognize Automatic Reference is accepted, and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 157(d) the reference is withdrawn on the court's own motion for good cause shown in paragraph 4 of the motion, and because resolution of this proceeding against defendants not in bankruptcy require consideration of laws of the United States regulating organizations or activities affecting interstate commerce ; accepting #45 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (GKFJ, Judge)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell The Bankruptcy Trustee's Notice of Bankruptcy as to Penloyd, LLC properly references the automatic stay provisions of 11 U.S.C. Section 362, which are self-actuating and do not require a motion, therefore the "Motion to Stay" construed in the Notice by docketing is moot ; finding as moot 47 Motion to Stay (GKFJ, Judge)
April 21, 2010 Filing 48 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Buttsburger, All Plaintiffs (Hickman, Steven)
March 31, 2010 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: This is a multi-event document, which is not allowed in CM/ECF; Correction: Filed the second event as Document # 47 (Re: #46 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy ) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
March 30, 2010 Filing 47 MOTION to Stay (submitted as part of Doc #46 ) by Patrick J. Malloy, III (tjc, Dpty Clk)
March 30, 2010 Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy by Patrick J. Malloy, III (Malloy, Patrick) Modified on 3/31/2010; This is a multi-event document, see Doc # 47 for second event (tjc, Dpty Clk).
March 25, 2010 Filing 45 MOTION to Recognize Automatic Reference by All Plaintiffs (Hickman, Steven)
March 24, 2010 Filing 44 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy by Penloyd, LLC (James, William)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell, directing parties to file joint status report( Status Report due by 4/21/2010) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
October 23, 2009 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) by Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Buttsburger ; (Vaughan, Randall)
October 9, 2009 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) by All Plaintiffs ; (Hickman, Steven)
September 21, 2009 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Buttsburger (Vaughan, Randall)
September 11, 2009 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: "with jury demand" was selected but not contained within pleading; Correction: deleted "with jury demand" text (Re: #39 Amended Answer ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
September 10, 2009 Filing 39 AMENDED ANSWER (Re: #36 Amended Complaint ) by Penloyd, LLC (Polan, James) Modified on 9/11/2009 to delete "with jury demand" text (sac, Dpty Clk).
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint,,,,, ) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
September 3, 2009 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #36 Amended Complaint ) by Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Buttsburger (Doyle, Kevin)
August 31, 2009 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all defendants (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint,,,,, ) by All Plaintiffs (Hickman, Steven)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 8/31/2009); granting #8 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting #23 Motion to Dismiss Party (hbo, Dpty Clk)
August 6, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE of Matter Under Advisement (Re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss Party Paul Butzberger, #26 Response in Opposition to Motion, #8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Geordie Cruickshank, #24 Reply to Response to Motion, #27 Reply to Response to Motion, #20 Response in Opposition to Motion ) by Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Buttsburger (Vaughan, Randall)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary Regarding Electronically Stored Information (Re: #31 Minutes of Discovery Hearing, Striking/Terminating Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), Ruling on Motion for Hearing ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
June 29, 2009 Filing 32 RESPONSE (Re: #28 MOTION for Hearing on Penloyd's Application for Expedited Status Conference re Electronic Discovery ) by All Plaintiffs (Hickman, Steven)
June 22, 2009 Filing 31 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary: Discovery Hearing held on 6/22/2009 ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #28 Motion for Hearing (Court Reporter: C2) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary setting hearing re Electronic Discovery, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): to be held in Courtroom 2, Third Floor ( Discovery Hearing set for 6/22/2009 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary) (Re: #28 MOTION for Hearing on Penloyd's Application for Expedited Status Conference re Electronic Discovery ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell, referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Cleary (Re: #28 MOTION for Hearing on Penloyd's Application for Expedited Status Conference re Electronic Discovery ) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
June 3, 2009 Filing 28 MOTION for Hearing on Penloyd's Application for Expedited Status Conference re Electronic Discovery by Penloyd, LLC (Askew, Thomas)
May 4, 2009 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss Party Paul Butzberger ) by Paul Buttsburger ; (Vaughan, Randall)
May 1, 2009 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss Party Paul Butzberger ) by All Plaintiffs ; (Hickman, Steven)
April 30, 2009 Filing 25 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing John McNicholas, dismissing Defendant, (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint,,,,, ) by Stanley E Pearey, Stephen L Penrod, Randall W Phillips, Raymond C Pollard, William E Beattie, John G Popesczi, Billy J Porter, Vincent E Purcell, Edward T Robinson, Glenda A Robinson, John D Rubottom, Alfred Ruffin, Paul M Stoddard, John Tackett, Jimmie Taylor, Betty J Bernard, Gregory G Thompson, Don E Turner, Ron L Whalen, Jerry L White, Spencer M Williams, Glenn C Willis, Robert D Zellers, Steve C Deal, Jeffrey L Dunham, Michael J Baker, Lyndle W Billings, Tony L Mortimer, Dennis R Spicer, William H Matthew, Gary D Goad, Timothy L Ridenhour, Dennis D Millspaugh, Penloyd, LLC, Penloyd Holding, Inc., John McNicholas, Daniel Black, Cody A Stanke, Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Loyd, Paul Buttsburger, Curtis A Crosby, All Plaintiffs, Kent D Daugherty, Dexter L Edwards, Gregory S Eidschun, Douglas Fankhouser, Crystal J Fleming, Joseph A Feitus, Clinton W Geneva, Johnny C Gilliam, Bobby R Green, Johnny Allen, Mark D Hailey, Ryan M Haslett, Angelan D Hettinger, Dean W Vester, Robert L Keller, Terry L Krajicek, Billy W Krouse, Johnny L Krouse, Daris E Lenard, Matthew W Lenard, Thomas C Allen, Donald R Little, William D McClendon, James D Miller, Robert Miller, Lyle H Mitchell, Alex D Palmer (Hickman, Steven)
April 14, 2009 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Geordie Cruickshank ) by Geordie Cruickshank ; (Vaughan, Randall)
April 13, 2009 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Party Paul Butzberger by Paul Buttsburger (Doyle, Kevin)
April 13, 2009 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kevin Pierce Doyle on behalf of Penloyd Holding, Inc., John McNicholas, Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Loyd, Paul Buttsburger (Doyle, Kevin)
April 13, 2009 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Party John McNicholas ) by All Plaintiffs ; (Hickman, Steven)
March 31, 2009 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Geordie Cruickshank ) by All Plaintiffs ; (Hickman, Steven)
March 24, 2009 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Party John McNicholas by John McNicholas (Vaughan, Randall)
March 23, 2009 Filing 18 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint,,,,, ) by Penloyd, LLC (Polan, James)
March 19, 2009 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Penloyd Holding, Inc. (Vaughan, Randall)
March 19, 2009 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Penloyd Holding, Inc., John McNicholas, Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Loyd, Paul Buttsburger (Vaughan, Randall)
March 19, 2009 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Penloyd, LLC, Penloyd Holding, Inc. (Polan, James)
March 19, 2009 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Heather Louise O'Banion on behalf of Penloyd Holding, Inc., John McNicholas, Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Loyd, Paul Buttsburger (O'Banion, Heather)
March 18, 2009 Filing 13 JURY DEMAND by All Plaintiffs (Hickman, Steven)
March 16, 2009 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Ronald Polan on behalf of Penloyd, LLC (Polan, James)
March 16, 2009 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Martin Askew on behalf of Penloyd, LLC (Askew, Thomas)
March 16, 2009 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Gregory James on behalf of Penloyd, LLC (James, William)
March 16, 2009 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ira Leonard Edwards, Jr on behalf of Penloyd, LLC (Edwards, Ira)
March 13, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Geordie Cruickshank by Geordie Cruickshank (Vaughan, Randall)
March 13, 2009 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Penloyd, LLC, Penloyd Holding, Inc., John McNicholas, Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Loyd, Paul Buttsburger (Vaughan, Randall)
March 13, 2009 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall Gene Vaughan on behalf of Penloyd Holding, Inc., John McNicholas, Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Loyd, Paul Buttsburger (Vaughan, Randall)
March 12, 2009 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Penloyd, LLC; Penloyd Holding, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within five (5) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (sjm, Dpty Clk)
March 12, 2009 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (sjm, Dpty Clk)
March 12, 2009 Filing 3 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Penloyd, LLC, Penloyd Holding, Inc., John McNicholas, Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Loyd, Paul Buttsburger (sjm, Dpty Clk)
March 12, 2009 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa Cty Dist Ct, case number CJ-2009-01150 by Penloyd, LLC, Penloyd Holding, Inc., John McNicholas, Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Loyd, Paul Buttsburger (With attachments) (sjm, Dpty Clk)
March 12, 2009 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Penloyd Holding, Inc., John McNicholas, Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Loyd, Paul Buttsburger (sjm, Dpty Clk)
March 10, 2009 AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Penloyd, LLC, Penloyd Holding, Inc., John McNicholas, Geordie Cruickshank, Paul Loyd, Paul Buttsburger by Stanley E Pearey, Stephen L Penrod, Randall W Phillips, Raymond C Pollard, William E Beattie, John G Popesczi, Billy J Porter, Vincent E Purcell, Edward T Robinson, Glenda A Robinson, John D Rubottom, Alfred Ruffin, Paul M Stoddard, John Tackett, Jimmie Taylor, Betty J Bernard, Gregory G Thompson, Don E Turner, Ron L Whalen, Jerry L White, Spencer M Williams, Glenn C Willis, Robert D Zellers, Steve C Deal, Jeffrey L Dunham, Michael J Baker, Lyndle W Billings, Tony L Mortimer, Dennis R Spicer, William H Matthew, Gary D Goad, Timothy L Ridenhour, Dennis D Millspaugh, Daniel Black, Cody A Stanke, Curtis A Crosby, Kent D Daugherty, Dexter L Edwards, Gregory S Eidschun, Douglas Fankhouser, Crystal J Fleming, Joseph A Feitus, Clinton W Geneva, Johnny C Gilliam, Bobby R Green, Johnny Allen, Mark D Hailey, Ryan M Haslett, Angelan D Hettinger, Dean W Vester, Robert L Keller, Terry L Krajicek, Billy W Krouse, Johnny L Krouse, Daris E Lenard, Matthew W Lenard, Thomas C Allen, Donald R Little, William D McClendon, James D Miller, Robert Miller, Lyle H Mitchell, Alex D Palmer (sjm, Dpty Clk) Modified on 3/13/2009 (sjm, Dpty Clk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanke et al v. Penloyd, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn C Willis
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Miller
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul H Holladay
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody A Stanke
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Zellers
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary D Goad
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L Keller
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John G Popesczi
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda G Hall
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton W Geneva
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A Williams
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Allen
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Miller
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley E Pearey
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond C Pollard
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Baker
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tackett
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip R Thompson
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Black
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle H Mitchell
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam F McClain
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L Dunham
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory S Eidschun
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal J Fleming
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul M Stoddard
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndle W Billings
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy J Porter
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry L Krajicek
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex D Palmer
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Fankhouser
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daris E Lenard
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Ruffin
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H Matthew
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis D Millspaugh
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas C Allen
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garland L Allen
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark D Hailey
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George M Eilers
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory G Thompson
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy L Ridenhour
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D McClendon
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter L Edwards
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer M Williams
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A Feitus
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L Marquette
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra K Martin
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E Beattie
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron L Whalen
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis W Ruffin, Jr
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen L Penrod
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G Carlile
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy W Krouse
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Taylor
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty J Bernard
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff D Johnson
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald W Jarvis
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis R Spicer
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony L Mortimer
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan M Haslett
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew W Lenard
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R Little
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L White
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamantha H Christopher
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby R Green
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent E Purcell
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward T Robinson
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda A Robinson
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don E Turner
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent D Daugherty
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis A Crosby
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean W Vester
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Whiten
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelan D Hettinger
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny C Gilliam
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Rubottom
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny L Krouse
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Gonzalez
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Geeter
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie B Gaines
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve C Deal
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall W Phillips
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Matthew Creekmore
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penloyd Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Louise O'Banion
Represented By: Randall Gene Vaughan
Represented By: Kevin Pierce Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Buttsburger
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: Heather Louise O'Banion
Represented By: Randall Gene Vaughan
Represented By: Kevin Pierce Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Loyd
Represented By: Heather Louise O'Banion
Represented By: Randall Gene Vaughan
Represented By: Kevin Pierce Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penloyd, LLC
Represented By: William Gregory James
Represented By: Ira Leonard Edwards, Jr
Represented By: James Ronald Polan
Represented By: Randall Gene Vaughan
Represented By: Thomas Martin Askew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geordie Cruickshank
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Represented By: Heather Louise O'Banion
Represented By: Randall Gene Vaughan
Represented By: Kevin Pierce Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McNicholas
Represented By: Heather Louise O'Banion
Represented By: Randall Gene Vaughan
Represented By: Kevin Pierce Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Trustee Patrick J. Malloy, III
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Malloy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?