Southwest Aviation Specialties, L.L.C. et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Southwest Aviation Specialties, L.L.C., Jet Capital and Midwest Air Express, L.L.C.
Defendant: United States of America, Department of the Navy and United States Marine Corps, Cardinal Aviation, Inc., Carolina Construction Consultants, Thomas Dailey, HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. and U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2010cv00089
Filed: February 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Presiding Judge: T Lane Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; denying 61 Motion for New Trial (djh, Dpty Clk)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan that plaintiffs' claims against Cardinal Aviation, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment is entered herewith. The Court Clerk shall correct the docket sheet to show that Ca rolina Construction, a d/b/a of Thomas Dailey, and Thomas Dailey were terminated as parties on November 18, 2010., terminating party Thomas Dailey, Cardinal Aviation, Inc. and Carolina Construction Consultants (Re: 2 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan that pending scheduling order dates, including the 11/21/11 pretrial conference and the 12/19/11 jury trial, are hereby stricken ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ; directing the plaint iffs to show cause( Response to Order to Show Cause due by 11/2/2011); granting 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 45 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: 22 Amended Complaint, ) (RGG, Chambers)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwest Aviation Specialties, L.L.C. et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Aviation Specialties, L.L.C.
Represented By: Clifford Russell Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jet Capital
Represented By: Clifford Russell Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Air Express, L.L.C.
Represented By: Clifford Russell Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Navy and United States Marine Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Aviation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Construction Consultants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?