Newsome et al v. Gallacher et al
Plaintiff: |
P David Newsome, Jr and Liquidating Trustee of Mahalo Energy (USA), Inc. |
Defendant: |
Kevin Wolfe, David E Butler, Burnet, Duckworth and Palmer, LLP, William Gallacher, Duncan Chisholm, Gary H Dundas, Jeff G Lawson and James Burns |
Case Number: |
4:2011cv00140 |
Filed: |
March 8, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma |
Office: |
Tulsa Office |
County: |
Tulsa |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul J Cleary |
Presiding Judge: |
Gregory K Frizzell |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 24, 2014 |
Filing
146
OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Report due by 10/8/2014); denying 135 Motion to Change Venue; granting 136 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (hbo, Dpty Clk)
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing
145
OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; denying 93 Motion for Sanctions (pll, Dpty Clk)
|
June 5, 2014 |
Filing
131
OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 6/26/2014, Replies due by 7/10/2014); granting 81 Motion to Dismiss (Re: 93 MOTION for Sanctions and Brief in Support ) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing
130
OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell as to individual capacity ; granting 86 Motion to Dismiss (hbo, Dpty Clk)
|
March 19, 2012 |
Filing
55
OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting 18 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (hbo, Dpty Clk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Newsome et al v. Gallacher et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Kevin Wolfe |
Represented By: |
Craig Alan Fitzgerald |
Represented By: |
John Henry Rule, II |
Represented By: |
Sidney K Swinson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: David E Butler |
Represented By: |
Craig Alan Fitzgerald |
Represented By: |
John Henry Rule, II |
Represented By: |
Sidney K Swinson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Burnet, Duckworth and Palmer, LLP |
Represented By: |
G David Bryant |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: William Gallacher |
Represented By: |
Sidney K Swinson |
Represented By: |
John Henry Rule, II |
Represented By: |
Craig Alan Fitzgerald |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Duncan Chisholm |
Represented By: |
Sidney K Swinson |
Represented By: |
John Henry Rule, II |
Represented By: |
Craig Alan Fitzgerald |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Gary H Dundas |
Represented By: |
Craig Alan Fitzgerald |
Represented By: |
John Henry Rule, II |
Represented By: |
Sidney K Swinson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jeff G Lawson |
Represented By: |
Craig Alan Fitzgerald |
Represented By: |
John Henry Rule, II |
Represented By: |
Sidney K Swinson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: James Burns |
Represented By: |
Craig Alan Fitzgerald |
Represented By: |
John Henry Rule, II |
Represented By: |
Sidney K Swinson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: P David Newsome, Jr |
Represented By: |
William Bernard Federman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Liquidating Trustee of Mahalo Energy (USA), Inc. |
Represented By: |
William Bernard Federman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?