Cherokee Nation, The vs. Nash, et al
Plaintiff: Cherokee Nation, The
Defendant: Raymond Nash, Larry Wasson, Robert Allen, Kathy Washington and Lisa Duke
Counter_claimant: Raymond Nash, Larry Wasson, Robert Allen, Kathy Washington and Lisa Duke
Counter_defendant: Cherokee Nation, The
Cross_claimant: Raymond Nash, Larry Wasson, Robert Allen, Kathy Washington and Lisa Duke
Case Number: 4:2011cv00648
Filed: October 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Presiding Judge: T Lane Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; transferring case (terminates case) ; vacating/setting aside order(s); finding as moot 190 Motion to Certify; granting 190 Motion to Reconsider (Re: 189 Opinion and Order, Ruling on Motion to Transfer Case to Other District, Ruling on Motion to Stay ) (vah, Chambers)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; denying 203 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 204 Motion for Hearing (vah, Chambers)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; denying 178 Motion to Transfer Case to Other District; denying 178 Motion to Stay (vah, Chambers)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; denying 96 Motion to Stay (vah, Chambers)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherokee Nation, The vs. Nash, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherokee Nation, The
Represented By: Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr
Represented By: A Diane Hammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Nash
Represented By: Jonathan Thompson Velie
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Thomas G. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Wasson
Represented By: Jonathan Thompson Velie
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Thomas G. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Allen
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Thomas G. Allen
Represented By: Jonathan Thompson Velie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Washington
Represented By: Thomas G. Allen
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Represented By: Jonathan Thompson Velie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Duke
Represented By: Thomas G. Allen
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Represented By: Jonathan Thompson Velie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Raymond Nash
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Larry Wasson
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Robert Allen
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Kathy Washington
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Lisa Duke
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Cherokee Nation, The
Represented By: A Diane Hammons
Represented By: Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Raymond Nash
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Larry Wasson
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Robert Allen
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Kathy Washington
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Lisa Duke
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Represented By: Jack McKay
Represented By: Cynthia C. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?