State of Oklahoma v. Hobia et al

Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Defendant: Tiger Hobia, Thomas Givens, Lynelle Shatswell, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 3, John Doe No. 4, John Doe No. 5, John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 7, Florence Development Partners, LLC and Kialegee Tribal Town
Case Number: 4:2012cv00054
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Presiding Judge: T Lane Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 25:640
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Re: 150 Opinion and Order, Ruling on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; denying 133 Motion to Reconsider (hbo, Dpty Clk)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (pll, Dpty Clk)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; denying 62 Motion to Dismiss Party; denying 64 Motion to Dismiss Party; denying 70 Motion to Dismiss Party (hbo, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Oklahoma v. Hobia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: M Daniel Weitman
Represented By: Lynn Heyer Slade
Represented By: William Clayton Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Hobia
Represented By: Paula J Quillin
Represented By: Joseph R Farris
Represented By: Dennis J Whittlesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynelle Shatswell
Represented By: Joseph R Farris
Represented By: Paula J Quillin
Represented By: Dennis J Whittlesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence Development Partners, LLC
Represented By: Joseph R Farris
Represented By: Paula J Quillin
Represented By: Dennis J Whittlesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kialegee Tribal Town
Represented By: Joseph R Farris
Represented By: Paula J Quillin
Represented By: Dennis J Whittlesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?