Janczak v. Tulsa Winch Group et al

Plaintiff: Paul Janczak
Defendant: Tulsa Winch Group and Dover Corporation
Case Number: 4:2013cv00154
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617 Family & Medical Leave Act of 1993
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2016 218 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan re procedural issue of bifurcation of the jury trial (Re: 217 Minutes of Miscellaneous Hearing ) (RGG, Chambers)
March 1, 2016 198 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting 175 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 176 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 177 Motion in Limine; denying 197 Motion to Strike (Re: 2 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
February 23, 2016 196 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; denying 160 Motion for Summary Judgment (Re: 136 Mandate from Circuit Court ) (RGG, Chambers)
November 17, 2015 157 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that defendant may file a motion for summary judgment limited to the issue of damages only no later than 12/1/15 ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 12/1/2015); denying 148 Motion to Dismiss (RGG, Chambers)
May 27, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; finding as moot 96 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 97 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 120 Motion for Leave to File Document(s) (Re: 2 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janczak v. Tulsa Winch Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Janczak
Represented By: Michael J Modl
Represented By: Mark Stevan Thetford
Represented By: Michael J Westcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa Winch Group
Represented By: Kimberly Lambert Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly Lambert Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?