Bumgarner v. Williams Companies, Inc., The et al

Plaintiff: John Bumgarner
Defendant: Williams Companies, Inc., The and Energy Transfer Equity, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00026
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order 110 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER) granting in part and denying in part Dkt. ##68-69 (Re: 69 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 82 Opinion and Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, 68 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order 82 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 5/27/2016); granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order 58 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting 21 Motion to Dismiss (hbo, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bumgarner v. Williams Companies, Inc., The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bumgarner
Represented By: Laurence Lindsay Pinkerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Companies, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Transfer Equity, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?