Amestein Tulsa, LLC et al v. Merrill et al
Plaintiff: Amestein Tulsa, LLC, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, AVW International, LLC and Andre Vant Westeinde
Defendant: Merrill, Schnell Well Service, LLC, SBM Operating LLC, Sunray Operating Company, Oklahoma Shelf Exploration, LLC, Charles Schreve, Donald F Schnell, Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC, Schnell Pipe and Supply, LLC and Stephen J Merrill
Case Number: 4:2016cv00619
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: T Lane Wilson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE Advice of the Court Regarding Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (Re: #44 Stipulation of Dismissal ) by Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC, Charles Schreve, Sunray Operating Company (Long, Laura)
December 12, 2016 ***Civil Case Terminated (Documents Terminated: #36 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, #23 MOTION to Dismiss AND OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT ) (see document number #44 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
December 12, 2016 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by AVW International, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Andre Vant Westeinde (Stidham, George)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Stephen J. Merrill's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 42) is granted. Plaintiffs' response to the Motion to Dismiss is due December 12, 2016 and the reply thereto is due December 27, 2016. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 12/12/2016, Replies due by 12/27/2016); granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
December 5, 2016 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) by AVW International, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Andre Vant Westeinde (Stidham, George)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell Plaintiffs' request for an extension of time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC, Charles Shreve, and Sunray Operating Company is granted. Plaintiffs' response shall be filed by December 12, 2016 and Defendants' reply shall be filed by January 3, 2017. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 12/12/2016, Replies due by 1/3/2017); granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss AND OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
November 29, 2016 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event (Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s)); Correction: corrected event (Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion) and created a link to #23 (Re: #40 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (srt, Dpty Clk)
November 28, 2016 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (re: #23 Motion to Dismiss) by AVW International, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Andre Vant Westeinde (McLemore, Evan) Modified on 11/29/2016 to correct event and create link to #23 (srt, Dpty Clk).
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell The parties' request to stay the filing of the Joint Status Report and the entry of a Scheduling Order is denied. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2). The parties are afforded until December 15, 2016 to file their Joint Status Report. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Report due by 12/15/2016); denying #38 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #18 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers) Modified on 11/22/2016 to correct statute citation (lml, Dpty Clk).
November 22, 2016 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Stipulation); Correction: changed event (Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearings/Deadlines) (Re: #38 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
November 21, 2016 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearings/Deadlines (Re: #18 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report, #23 MOTION to Dismiss AND OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT, 37 Minute Order,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,, Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion,, #36 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) by AVW International, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Andre Vant Westeinde (Henson, Trevor) Modified on 11/22/2016 to change event (sac, Dpty Clk).
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell Plaintiffs' request for an extension of time to respond to Defendant Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC's Motion to Dismiss is granted. Plaintiffs' response shall be filed by November 28, 2016 and Defendants' reply is due by December 12, 2016. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 11/28/2016, Replies due by 12/12/2016); granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss AND OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
November 14, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Stephen J Merrill, Oklahoma Shelf Exploration, LLC, SBM Operating LLC, Donald F Schnell, Schnell Pipe and Supply, LLC, Schnell Well Service, LLC (Burkhardt, John)
November 14, 2016 Filing 35 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Riane Taylor Fern on behalf of Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC, Charles Schreve, Sunray Operating Company [Note: Attorney Riane Taylor Fern added to party Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Riane Taylor Fern added to party Charles Schreve(pty:dft), Attorney Riane Taylor Fern added to party Sunray Operating Company(pty:dft).] (Fern, Riane)
November 11, 2016 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss AND OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT ) by Amestein Tulsa, LLC (Stidham, George)
November 2, 2016 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sunray Operating Company (Long, Laura)
November 2, 2016 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC (Long, Laura)
October 27, 2016 Filing 31 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David James Schaffer on behalf of Donald F Schnell, Schnell Pipe and Supply, LLC, Schnell Well Service, LLC [Note: Attorney David James Schaffer added to party Donald F Schnell(pty:dft), Attorney David James Schaffer added to party Schnell Pipe and Supply, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David James Schaffer added to party Schnell Well Service, LLC(pty:dft).] (Schaffer, David)
October 27, 2016 Filing 30 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David James Schaffer on behalf of Stephen J Merrill, Oklahoma Shelf Exploration, LLC, SBM Operating LLC [Note: Attorney David James Schaffer added to party Stephen J Merrill(pty:dft), Attorney David James Schaffer added to party Oklahoma Shelf Exploration, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David James Schaffer added to party SBM Operating LLC(pty:dft).] (Schaffer, David)
October 27, 2016 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Schnell Well Service, LLC (Burkhardt, John)
October 27, 2016 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Schnell Pipe and Supply, LLC (Burkhardt, John)
October 27, 2016 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Oklahoma Shelf Exploration, LLC (Burkhardt, John)
October 27, 2016 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent SBM Energy, LLC for SBM Operating LLC) by SBM Operating LLC (Burkhardt, John)
October 27, 2016 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC and Sunray Operating Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
October 25, 2016 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Franklin Smith on behalf of Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC, Charles Schreve, Sunray Operating Company [Note: Attorney Michael Franklin Smith added to party Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Franklin Smith added to party Charles Schreve(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Franklin Smith added to party Sunray Operating Company(pty:dft).] (Smith, Michael)
October 25, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss AND OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC, Charles Schreve, Sunray Operating Company (Long, Laura)
October 25, 2016 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura J Long on behalf of Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC, Charles Schreve, Sunray Operating Company [Note: Attorney Laura J Long added to party Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Laura J Long added to party Charles Schreve(pty:dft), Attorney Laura J Long added to party Sunray Operating Company(pty:dft).] (Long, Laura)
October 25, 2016 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Donald F Schnell (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Andre Vant Westeinde, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, AVW International, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
October 25, 2016 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Sunray Operating Company (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Andre Vant Westeinde, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, AVW International, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
October 20, 2016 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Oklahoma Shelf Exploration, LLC, SBM Operating LLC, Schnell Pipe and Supply, LLC, Schnell Well Service, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/21/2016) (SAS, Chambers)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell The Unopposed Motion by Defendants Stephen J. Merrill, Donald F. Schnell, et al. for Extension of Time (Doc. 16) is granted. Defendants' answers or other responsive pleadings are due November 14, 2016. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 11/14/2016); granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
October 18, 2016 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Stephen J Merrill, Oklahoma Shelf Exploration, LLC, SBM Operating LLC, Donald F Schnell, Schnell Pipe and Supply, LLC, Schnell Well Service, LLC (Burkhardt, John)
October 18, 2016 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr on behalf of Donald F Schnell, Schnell Pipe and Supply, LLC, Schnell Well Service, LLC [Note: Attorney John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr added to party Donald F Schnell(pty:dft), Attorney John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr added to party Schnell Pipe and Supply, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr added to party Schnell Well Service, LLC(pty:dft).] (Burkhardt, John)
October 18, 2016 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr on behalf of Stephen J Merrill, Oklahoma Shelf Exploration, LLC, SBM Operating LLC [Note: Attorney John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr added to party Stephen J Merrill(pty:dft), Attorney John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr added to party Oklahoma Shelf Exploration, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr added to party SBM Operating LLC(pty:dft).] (Burkhardt, John)
October 11, 2016 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scan Oil and Gas, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
October 11, 2016 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amestein Tulsa, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
October 11, 2016 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AVW International, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
October 11, 2016 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Charles Schreve (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Andre Vant Westeinde, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, AVW International, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
October 11, 2016 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Schnell Well Service, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Andre Vant Westeinde, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, AVW International, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
October 11, 2016 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Schnell Pipe and Supply, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Andre Vant Westeinde, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, AVW International, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
October 11, 2016 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: SBM Operating LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Andre Vant Westeinde, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, AVW International, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
October 11, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Andre Vant Westeinde, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, AVW International, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
October 11, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Stephen J Merrill (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Andre Vant Westeinde, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, AVW International, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 30, 2016 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Amestein Tulsa, LLC, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC and AVW International, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
September 30, 2016 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1656621) by Andre Vant Westeinde, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, AVW International, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
September 30, 2016 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by AVW International, LLC, Amestein Tulsa, LLC, Scan Oil and Gas, LLC, Andre Vant Westeinde [Note: Attorney Trevor Ray Henson added to party AVW International, LLC(pty:pla).] (Henson, Trevor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amestein Tulsa, LLC et al v. Merrill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amestein Tulsa, LLC
Represented By: George Steven Stidham
Represented By: Evan Mcguire McLemore
Represented By: Trevor Ray Henson
Represented By: Lee Ira Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scan Oil and Gas, LLC
Represented By: George Steven Stidham
Represented By: Evan Mcguire McLemore
Represented By: Trevor Ray Henson
Represented By: Lee Ira Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVW International, LLC
Represented By: George Steven Stidham
Represented By: Evan Mcguire McLemore
Represented By: Trevor Ray Henson
Represented By: Lee Ira Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Vant Westeinde
Represented By: George Steven Stidham
Represented By: Evan Mcguire McLemore
Represented By: Trevor Ray Henson
Represented By: Lee Ira Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schnell Well Service, LLC
Represented By: David James Schaffer
Represented By: John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBM Operating LLC
Represented By: David James Schaffer
Represented By: John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunray Operating Company
Represented By: Michael Franklin Smith
Represented By: Laura J Long
Represented By: Riane Taylor Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Shelf Exploration, LLC
Represented By: David James Schaffer
Represented By: John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schreve
Represented By: Michael Franklin Smith
Represented By: Laura J Long
Represented By: Riane Taylor Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald F Schnell
Represented By: David James Schaffer
Represented By: John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Shelf Exploration and Development, LLC
Represented By: Michael Franklin Smith
Represented By: Laura J Long
Represented By: Riane Taylor Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schnell Pipe and Supply, LLC
Represented By: David James Schaffer
Represented By: John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J Merrill
Represented By: David James Schaffer
Represented By: John Alfred Burkhardt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?