Capital Development Affiliates LLC v. Thigpen

Plaintiff: Capital Development Affiliates LLC
Defendant: Zealand Benjamin Thigpen, III
Case Number: 4:2017cv00426
Filed: July 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Presiding Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/15/2018, Responses due by 10/29/2018, Replies due by 11/5/2018) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; striking/withdrawing document(s); granting 83 Motion to Withdraw Documents(s) (Re: 72 Garnishment Summons Issued ) (Documents Terminated: 72 Garnishment Summons Issued ) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that plaintiff Capital Development Affiliates, LLC's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 16) is granted. Plaintiff shall submit to the CM/ECF Intake Box by close of business on March 29, 2018 , a proposed judgment. All deadlines, including the March 28, 2018 motion hearing before Magistrate Judge McCarthy, the April 19, 2018 settlement conference with Adjunct Settlement Judge DeMuro, the June 1, 2018 pretrial conference, and the June 18, 2018 jury trial, are stricken. Any bill of costs or motion for attorney fees will be due after entry of judgment. ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 3/29/2018); granting 16 Motion for Summary Judgment (Re: 1 Complaint, 44 Minute Order,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, 24 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s), 46 Minute Order,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference,, ) (RGG, Chambers)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital Development Affiliates LLC v. Thigpen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Development Affiliates LLC
Represented By: Mark Edward Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zealand Benjamin Thigpen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?