Huddleston v. John Christner Trucking, LLC
Plaintiff: Thomas Huddleston, Ryan Cooper, James Murphy, Anthony Tennant, Robert A Wilkowski, Robert Lewis, Randolph Scott, Eugene Barnett, Adam Zimmerman, John D Graves, Jr, Charles Goldman, Norman Vann, Thomas Caffrey, Jeff Ford, Jeremiah T Ferguson, Christopher Rush, Shelton Murray, Eric Nation, Charles Curry Whisenhunt, Ellen Cannon, John Pettigrew, Aaron Covington, Arash Tehranchi, Sergio M Cuevas Soto, Stephen Messing, Bradely Boardman, John Baker, Raymond Alcala, All Plaintiffs, Jacob Nielger, James Franklin, Corrye Andrews, Arman Ghevondyan, Victor Francois, Louis Gentry, John Bennett, Christopher Johnson, Deniss Veyette, Randy Clark, Harry Aldridge, Duane McConnell, Matthew Beck, Branden Green, Dale Johnson, Ron Cooper, William E Williams, Timothy Schaefer, Donald R Law, Jr, Samuel Thorton, Joseph Sherman, Jeremy Musser, Marcus Johnson, Willie Bell, Jonathan R Jenkins, Jerry Thomas, Marcus Gillespie, Anthony Matuzak, Stefen Oakes, Robert Moore, James D Ellis, William V Morris, Richard Budin, Ira Smith, David Strange, June Shastid, Lloyd A Walker, Fred Maxwell, Adam Baker, Ronald Catoe, Robert Becker, Daniel De La Garza, Jason Cree, Richard A Cox, Cleaven Hunter, Morris F Culp, Jr, Marnell Guevara Santiago, Todd Harroun, Yuri Di Biaggio, Jorge Ortiz, George Brannon, Robert J Alexander, Gary Garrett, Dylan McKinstry, Stacy Lee Shepherd, Curtis Wiggins, Craig R Trotter, Aaron Collier, John Vanaken, Patrick Ceiga, Vanetta Johnson, Leroy Rushing, Christopher Pelletier, Jason W MacDonald, Anthony Boccardi, John Damron, Clifton Hammock, Luis Bigay, Nancy A Ransom, Virgil Jones, Tom Spafford, Steven Harlow, William Bittner, Fred Kelly, Scott A Tullock, Taurean Morsell, Antwon Smith, John Simon, Curtis L Lewis, Ross R Dicks, Jr, Bernadette Williams Brown, Steven Walker, Curtis Matthew, James Jackson, Barbara Crabtree, David Mattingly, Clarence Nathan, Charles M Jones, Jr, Brian Wagner, Michael C Paugh, Joseph Steele, John Madison, Bobby Borkowski, Luther Starling, Marcus Barkley, Helsie Vatthauer, John Solliday, Stacey Garcia, Timothy Bennett, Jason LeJeune, Anthony Johnson, Eddie Smith, III, Adrian Smith, Dan Crombie, Robert Garcia, Marcial Zambrano, Sandra Sullivan, Anthony Rice, Lance Calvert, Eileen Fisher, Jose Porto Iglesias, Robert Maclean, Richard Erdman, Michael Earl Bailey, Donna Clark, James Bourland, Thomas Bohne, III, Henry Cherry, Jose Angel Cintron, Al Rasheed Baskerville, Davonn Hawkins, Vernon Hawthorne, Anthony Conners, Robert Williams, Robert Lake, Raymond Glaze, David Tucker, Daniel Snyder, Robert James, Deaustin Nixon, Randall A Tarwater, Clinton Bready, Gregory Robinson, Patti Hodge, Eric Beavers, Peter Brown, Christian Clarke, Kazem Mousavi, Aaron Thornton, John McManess, Steven Denman, Shannon Carson, Christopher A Little, Elliott Mergler, Anthony De La Fuente, Wilbur Brown, Patrick Burke, II, Kyle Holder, Damon C Gaudet, John Canon, Frank A Smith, Michael Crowder, Gene Aldridge, Kamau Michael, Judith Pratt, Robert M Herron, Neiko Gates, Kenneth Steele, Christopher Dover, Ronald Singleton, Ruben Smith, Robert Atkinson, George Cross, David H Waldron, Edward St Jude, Margaret Shick, Kevin Behlmer, Clinton Selby, Michael Cotter, Daniel Bayless, Jacqueline Williams, John C Holder, Roy Bittner, Robert Roberts, Charles D Polk, Edward Judson, Gavin O'Connor-Keene, Victor Foreman, Mitchell Hall, Matthew Proffer, Kenneth Snyder, Arthur T Thomas, Maurice Brown, Jaquon Dick, Dennis Ducre, Mariah Jenkins, John Keller, Tony Carlos Kimble, Robert Murphy, Mushtag Zokari, Joseph Lasenberry, John Williams, Charles Schreckenbach, Robert Martin, Jonathan Endicott, Jason Gato, Garrett K Taft, Brian H Long, Keith Carter, Ritchie King, Charles V Rodgers, Anthony Barton, Jeremy Hill, Keiftro Mickle, Shawn P Camp, John Keith Thompson, Sr, Robert F Sartori, Sherman Higgs, Christopher Staton, Daniel Tesla, Homer Barrett, Tyson Lee Earley, Roger Allen Epstein, William Dawdy, James H Cofield, Jr, Quentin Lee Mays, Robert Quintin, Ronald Conway, Jason Hopkins, Leon Fells, Phillip McWhorther, Earl Eugene Boen, Jr, Brandon K Dunagan, Shawn Franks, Tiffany Havens-Guthrie, Lowell Fenton, Joseph Heidelberg, Richard Estridge, Roy Martin, Earl Sampson, David Piearcy, Billy Tyler, Terry Hiatt, Randy White, Randy Griffith, Juan Gomez-Rosa, David Newhouse, Andrew Hampton, Kendall Corner, Wesley Wells, Michael Lee Taylor, Ramon Fontes, Joshua Corse, Christopher Haggerty, Alice Byrd, Jonathan Lee, Wayne McCann, Darrell Lawler, Davey Davis, Andy Jesinger, Anthony Edwards, Dennis Borrow, Timothy Wayne Martin, Joe W Deason, William Walters, Nancy Amesbury, Richard Coleman, Sidney Allen, Warren Ward, Demetrius McQueen, David Lane, DeAunte Hale, Martavius Smith, Curt Stevens, Sr, Michael Lake, Brandon Logan, Kelvin Harris, Ivan Fletcher, II, Shawn Seigler, Michael Hemingway, Darren Farr, David Hairston, Ricky Reed, Kenneth R Royal, Juan Perez-Garcia, Denise Allen, James Daniels, Jamie Wayne Persons, Shona Harless, Steven Mason, Katie Harlow, Andrew Greene, Cameron Carignan, Clint Welch, Cassius Gibson, Douglas Meyer, Ervin Winn, Caleb Lavi, Jennifer Lynn, Charles Thomas, Rashed F Strong, Richard Dilling, Shawntale Strange, Kenneth Kimbley, Robert Thompson, Keith Mansfield, Dax James, Maurice Saddler, Deon Redd, Tony Dawkins, Bradley Johnson, Clyde Williams, Joe E Hill, James Teigland, Marcelino R Garza, Suzanna Maria Canchola, Noel Zaragoza, Pamela Lott, Laura Lemon, Alton Lemley, Jr, Jamaal Simpson, Gary Lenihan, Mark Simpkins, Scott C Rutherford, Amie Moegelin, Stephen Qualls, Catherine Tijerina, Steven Byrd, Douglas D Burnett, II, Larry Mumphrey Jr, Jami Boundinot, Ivan French, Ernest E Haefner, Georgina Ray, Kelly Davis, Germaine Williams, Lori LaRosa, Randal Light, Jimmy Finley, Jr, Christopher Marocco, David Podoll, Galen D Cronin, Robert Evans, Stanley Brown, Leslie D Williams, Arnold W Wilson, Toney Bynum, Joseph Rodriguez, Ryan Whitehead, Ronald Almy, Jr, Nathan Harvey, Reginald Williams, Darryl Jordan, Elton Longstreet, Shonee Jackson, Francisco Marquez, Christopher W Robertson, Jamie Salisbury, Stephanie Evans, Erik Galloway, Albert Wall, William Hull, Franklin Breeden, Anthony Turner, Julian Russell, Robert Pressey, Ladell Richmond, Richard Allen Robinson, III, Earl Johns, David Grissler, Sandra Booker, Sonya Owens, David Thompson, Richard Owens, Don Voetberg, James Tull, Bryan Wallace, Garry D Reagan, Cameron McDowell, Jessie Chesteen, Cohlonee S Bacon, Darvin Scott, Roger Clements, Melissa Hamilton, Vincent Howard, Charles Wilson, Charles Bellamy, John Leija, Terrance Washington, Bryna Content-Watkins, Paul R Cooper, Vernie Clifford Hudson, Jr, Troyan Bedford, Willis L Johnson, Sr, Richard Steen, Lawrence McKinney, Earl Turner, Thomas Ray Hergenreder, Andre Story, Ricky E Franklin, Dante R Goins, Sr, David E Henderson, Heather George, Shrandell Curry, Frederick A Altherr, Joshua Ewing, Robert Grisby, Michael T Holder, Dennis Scott, Michael Fields, Sheila Knight, Reginal Douglas, Edgard Alarcon, Jr, Jason Torres Burgos, Steven Hines, James Robinson, Jr, Alvis Mitchell, Jr, Paul Carroll, Dacota Dossett, John Bright, Allen F Brush, Jr, Reggie Rawls, Tristin Vigil, Salvador Ponce, Bud A Tackett, Willie Simmons, Joshua Malone, Enrico Paolo Javier, Matthew Barrette, William Brunelle, Angela Williams, Devin Cottrell, Sharon Sue Elkins, Kelvin Davis, Terrance Webb, Kevin W Johnson, Debbie Cherry, Ronald Stevens, Daniel Lee Gowen, Rene Vega, Juan Vidito, John Cook, Joel Lance Holbrook, Cheryl Chub, Bobby Sloan, Irmantas Petravicius, Michael K Akins, Ronald Dorman, David E Dennis, Mickey Landrum, Luther N Hines, Sean Price, Erick Reid, Jason Jenkins, John Henshaw, Phillip Hester, Dennis Vanmeter, Terry Bailey, Dawn Kelley, Sean Underwood, George Nelson Miller, Willis James Stephens, Donald B Custer, Joe Salcido, Christopher Hood, Joshua Clark, Fernando Johnson, Clifton Foster, Adrain Smith, Joe N Spearman, Terrance Hardy, Brian Kelly, Raymond Borja, Anthony Perry, Abelardo Durazo, Jr, Jackie P Davidson, Thomas JS Maserang, Darren Collins, Virgil Moran, Kenzie Townsend, Chairyl Rene Meadows, David Parrack, Christopher Jordan, Richard Cook, Eric S Peach, Willie J Rogers, Jr, Jimmy L Copeland, David Morton, Martha Moseley, Larry Stapp, Terry Felice, Curtis Anderson, Walid Omar, Scott Wollbrink, Ramiro Ramirez, Mark Soukup, LeBarron Coates, Soven M Wiley, Cynthia Redding, Garry G Pace, Darren A Davis, Roland C Chandler, Brando Brewer, Rodney Elwell, Maurice Morehead, Wade Israel and Jose Luis Cintron
Defendant: John Christner Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 4:2017cv00549
Filed: September 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 232 REPLY (Re: #231 Notice (Other) ) by All Plaintiffs (Leimbach, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 231 NOTICE Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority (Re: #223 Brief in Support of Motion, #222 MOTION to Reconsider ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
March 31, 2020 Filing 230 SUPPLEMENT Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings (Re: #220 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
March 19, 2020 Filing 229 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #222 MOTION to Reconsider ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
March 19, 2020 Filing 228 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #220 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
March 12, 2020 Filing 227 First JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE by All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Carolyn H Cottrell added to party All Plaintiffs(pty:pla), Attorney Carolyn H Cottrell added to party All Plaintiffs(pty:pla).] (Cottrell, Carolyn)
March 5, 2020 Filing 226 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion To Reconsider (Re: #222 MOTION to Reconsider ) by Thomas Huddleston ; (Leimbach, David)
March 5, 2020 Filing 225 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion To Stay Proceedings (Re: #220 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ) by Thomas Huddleston ; (Leimbach, David)
February 14, 2020 Filing 224 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Christopher Haggerty [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Christopher Haggerty(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Christopher Haggerty(pty:pla).] (Lim, Michelle)
February 13, 2020 Filing 223 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #222 MOTION to Reconsider ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (With attachments) (Cash, Angela)
February 13, 2020 Filing 222 MOTION to Reconsider (Re: #213 Opinion and Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion for Class Action Certification, ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Cash, Angela)
February 13, 2020 Filing 221 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #220 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (With attachments) (Cash, Angela)
February 13, 2020 Filing 220 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Cash, Angela)
February 13, 2020 Filing 219 SUPPLEMENT Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief Regarding Applicable Class Period Of Certified Classes (Re: #213 Opinion and Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion for Class Action Certification, ) by Thomas Huddleston (Leimbach, David)
February 13, 2020 Filing 218 SUPPLEMENT to Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Regarding Class Period (Re: #213 Opinion and Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion for Class Action Certification, #201 Response in Opposition to Motion, #162 MOTION for Class Action Certification ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (With attachments) (Cash, Angela)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Submit Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule [Doc. 216]. Parties shall submit a proposed pre-trial schedule by March 12, 2020 ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ; granting #216 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 12, 2020 Filing 216 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to Extend Time to Submit Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule (Re: #213 Opinion and Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion for Class Action Certification, ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (With attachments) (Cash, Angela)
February 11, 2020 Filing 215 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Shelton Murray [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Shelton Murray(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Shelton Murray(pty:pla).] (Lim, Michelle)
February 7, 2020 Filing 214 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action by Thomas Huddleston (Lim, Michelle)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): (Briefing deadline 2/13/2020); ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/20/2020); granting in part and denying in part #162 Motion for Class Action Certification (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 24, 2020 Filing 212 REPLY (Re: #211 Supplement, ) by Thomas Huddleston (Leimbach, David)
January 24, 2020 Filing 211 SUPPLEMENT Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority Supporting Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Re: #201 Response in Opposition to Motion, #162 MOTION for Class Action Certification ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , terminating attorney Megan E Ross (Re: #209 Notice (Other) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 209 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Megan E. Ross by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Eckhart, Christopher)
November 1, 2019 Filing 208 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Unredacted) of Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2019 before Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (Pages: 1-45). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: A party must file a Transcript Redaction Request within 21 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, this unredacted transcript may be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may view the transcript at the court public terminal at no charge or may purchase a copy from the court reporter. (Re: #207 Minutes of Motion Hearing, Striking/Terminating Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), Taking Motion(s) Under Advisement) (bpn, CrtRptr) Modified on 1/30/2020 to remove transcript access restriction (sac, Dpty Clk).
October 24, 2019 Filing 207 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Judge Gregory K Frizzell: Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2019 , striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s), taking motion(s) under advisement (Re: #162 MOTION for Class Action Certification ) (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 22, 2019 Filing 206 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority (Re: #201 Response in Opposition to Motion ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
September 3, 2019 Filing 205 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #162 MOTION for Class Action Certification ) by Thomas Huddleston ; (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #203 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #162 MOTION for Class Action Certification ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 203 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Re: 195 Minute Order,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),,, Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion,, ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Cash, Angela)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Counsel for Defendant is directed to provide a three-ring binder notebook for use by the Court containing a paper copy of the document, with tabbed exhibits, as filed at Doc. 201. Said paper copy shall be a complete and exact duplicate of the filing after it was filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. (Re: #201 Response in Opposition to Motion ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
July 31, 2019 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #162 MOTION for Class Action Certification ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Defendant leave to file a 45 page opposition brief and granting Plaintiff leave to file a 15 page reply brief ; granting #198 Motion for Leave to File Document(s) (Re: #162 MOTION for Class Action Certification ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
July 30, 2019 Filing 199 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James L Colvin, III on behalf of John Christner Trucking, LLC [Note: Attorney James L Colvin, III added to party John Christner Trucking, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James L Colvin, III added to party John Christner Trucking, LLC(pty:dft).] (Colvin, James)
July 30, 2019 Filing 198 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification in excess of 40 pages by John Christner Trucking, LLC (With attachments) (Cash, Angela)
July 15, 2019 Filing 197 NOTICE TO WITHDRAW DECLARATIONS OFFERED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (ECF 162-7 AND 162-10) (Re: #162 MOTION for Class Action Certification ) by Thomas Huddleston (Lim, Michelle)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; striking/withdrawing document(s); striking/withdrawing #158 Motion to Clarify; granting #176 Motion to Strike Document(s) (Re: #158 MOTION to Clarify and Determine Applicable Law ) (Documents Terminated: #158 MOTION to Clarify and Determine Applicable Law ) (pll, Dpty Clk)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Court grants Defendant's Motion at Doc. 191 ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 7/31/2019, Replies due by 9/4/2019); setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #191 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #162 MOTION for Class Action Certification ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
June 20, 2019 Filing 194 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #191 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) by Thomas Huddleston ; (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's Motion to Extend June 26, 2019 Deadline to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification [Doc. 191] by June 20, 2019 ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 6/20/2019); granting #192 Motion to Expedite Ruling (Re: #191 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (lah, Chambers) Modified on 6/20/2019 for entry to reflect a Minute Order (kjp, Dpty Clk).
June 18, 2019 Filing 192 MOTION to Expedite Ruling (Re: #191 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (With attachments) (Cash, Angela)
June 18, 2019 Filing 191 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #162 MOTION for Class Action Certification ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (With attachments) (Cash, Angela)
May 24, 2019 Filing 190 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Unredacted) of Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 5/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (Pages: 1-16). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: A party must file a Transcript Redaction Request within 21 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, this unredacted transcript may be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may view the transcript at the court public terminal at no charge or may purchase a copy from the court reporter. (Re: #189 Minutes of Motion Hearing, Striking/Terminating Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), Ruling on Motion for Protective Order) (bpn, CrtRptr) Modified on 8/22/2019 to remove transcript access restriction (sac, Dpty Clk).
May 6, 2019 Filing 189 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy: Motion Hearing held on 5/6/2019 ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); denying #178 Motion for Protective Order (Re: #178 MOTION for Protective Order ) (Court Reporter: Conf Rm) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; denying #187 Motion for Leave to File Document(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKFJ, Judge)
May 6, 2019 Filing 187 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (ECF No. 176) (Re: #176 MOTION to Strike Document(s) or in the Alternative, Extend Briefing ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
May 3, 2019 Filing 186 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #176 MOTION to Strike Document(s) or in the Alternative, Extend Briefing ) by Thomas Huddleston ; (Leimbach, David)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy A Telephone hearing is scheduled for 5/6/19 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel, David Leimbach, is to arrange the conference call and contact the Courtroom Deputy at 918-699-4821 and all counsel with a call-in number ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy); granting #179 Motion for Hearing (Re: #178 MOTION for Protective Order ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
May 2, 2019 Filing 184 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #178 MOTION for Protective Order ) by Thomas Huddleston ; (Leimbach, David)
May 2, 2019 Filing 183 RESPONSE in Support of Motion (Re: #179 MOTION for Hearing ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (Eckhart, Christopher)
May 2, 2019 Filing 182 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #178 MOTION for Protective Order ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
May 1, 2019 Filing 181 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Strike or Sua Sponte Deny JCT's "Motion for Clarification," or in the Alternative, to Extend and Suspend Briefing on the Same (Re: #176 MOTION to Strike Document(s) or in the Alternative, Extend Briefing ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
April 26, 2019 ***Motion(s) Referred to Magistrate Judge McCarthy (Re: #179 MOTION to Expedite Ruling ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell staying briefing schedule as to Motion #158 and ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 5/1/2019, Replies due by 5/3/2019); granting in part #177 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #176 MOTION to Strike Document(s) or in the Alternative, Extend Briefing ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 26, 2019 Filing 179 MOTION for Hearing (Expedited) (Re: #178 MOTION for Protective Order ) by Thomas Huddleston (Leimbach, David) Modified on 5/1/2019 to change event (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
April 26, 2019 Filing 178 MOTION for Protective Order by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
April 26, 2019 Filing 177 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #176 MOTION to Strike Document(s) or in the Alternative, Extend Briefing ) by Thomas Huddleston (Leimbach, David)
April 26, 2019 Filing 176 MOTION to Strike Document(s) or in the Alternative, Extend Briefing (Re: #159 Brief in Support of Motion, #158 MOTION to Clarify and Determine Applicable Law ) by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating attorney Cheryl Anne Jackson ; granting #171 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 25, 2019 Filing 174 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rachel Lawrence Mor by on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Rachel Lawrence Mor added to party All Plaintiffs(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel Lawrence Mor added to party All Plaintiffs(pty:pla).] (Mor, Rachel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 173 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael J Blaschke by on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blaschke, Michael)
April 24, 2019 Filing 172 SEALED UNREDACTED VERSION of Dkt #[162, 163-1, 163-14, 163-22] per Local Rule 5.3(b) (Leimbach, David)
April 24, 2019 Filing 171 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Cheryl A. Jackson by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Jackson, Cheryl)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #167 Sealed Motion (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to provide forthwith three-ring binder notebooks for use by the Court containing a paper copy of each document, with tabbed exhibits, as filed at Doc. 163 and Doc. 164. Each paper copy shall be a complete and exact duplicate of the document after it was filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. (Re: #164 Declaration, #163 Declaration ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
April 23, 2019 Filing 168 ***Remark: Received conventional filing of dkt #165 (DVD) (Re: #165 Notice (Other) ) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
April 22, 2019 Filing 167 SEALED MOTION (Lim, Michelle) Modified on 4/23/2019 to change event (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
April 22, 2019 Filing 166 CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #164 Declaration, #163 Declaration ) by Thomas Huddleston (Leimbach, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE of Conventional Filing (Re: #164 Declaration ) by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 164 DECLARATION of Michelle S. Lim in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Re: #162 MOTION for Class Action Certification ) by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 163 DECLARATION of David C. Leimbach in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Re: #162 MOTION for Class Action Certification ) by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 162 MOTION for Class Action Certification by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell in light of the Notice filed by Plaintiff [Doc. 160], the Motion to Extend Time to Continue Class Certification Deadline [Doc. 153] is now moot ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ; finding as moot #153 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #160 Notice (Other), ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 22, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Notice - Other); Correction: changed event (Motion to Withdraw Document(s)) (Re: #160 MOTION to Withdraw Document(s) ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
April 21, 2019 Filing 160 MOTION to Withdraw (Re: #153 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Re Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification ) by Thomas Huddleston (Lim, Michelle) Modified on 4/22/2019 to change event (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
April 19, 2019 Filing 159 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #158 MOTION to Clarify and Determine Applicable Law ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
April 19, 2019 Filing 158 MOTION to Clarify and Determine Applicable Law by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Eckhart, Christopher) Modified on 7/1/2019 - STRICKEN per #196 (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
April 19, 2019 Filing 157 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #153 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Re Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification ) by Thomas Huddleston ; (Leimbach, David)
April 19, 2019 Filing 156 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #153 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Re Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; denying #137 Motion to Certify; denying 139 Motion to Stay (pll, Dpty Clk)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell re: motion for class certification ; granting #152 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (pll, Dpty Clk)
April 19, 2019 Filing 153 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Re Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
April 18, 2019 Filing 152 Second MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Defendant's Opposition by Thomas Huddleston (Cottrell, Carolyn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #150 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 11, 2019 Filing 150 Joint MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Defendant's Opposition by Thomas Huddleston (Cottrell, Carolyn)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 4/12/2019); granting #148 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 4, 2019 Filing 148 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Thomas Huddleston (Cottrell, Carolyn)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Amending Class Certification Schedule ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 4/5/2019, Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2019 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #146 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 28, 2019 Filing 146 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Thomas Huddleston (Cottrell, Carolyn)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating attorney Mira P Karageorge ; granting #144 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 144 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Mira P. Karageorge as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff by Thomas Huddleston (Lim, Michelle)
January 11, 2019 Filing 143 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: 139 MOTION to Stay (submitted as part of #137 ), #137 MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (Eckhart, Christopher)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Amending Class Certification Scheduling Order ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 3/1/2019, Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #140 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 141 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: 139 MOTION to Stay (submitted as part of #137 ), #137 MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal ) by All Plaintiffs ; [Note: Attorney David Christopher Leimbach added to party All Plaintiffs(pty:pla), Attorney David Christopher Leimbach added to party All Plaintiffs(pty:pla).] (Leimbach, David)
December 28, 2018 Filing 140 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Thomas Huddleston (Leimbach, David)
December 11, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this is a two-part motion of which only one part was efiled; Correction: efiled Motion to Stay - see 139 (Re: #137 MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 139 MOTION to Stay (submitted as part of #137 ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 138 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #137 MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal and Stay Proceedings ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (Eckhart, Christopher)
December 10, 2018 Filing 137 MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Eckhart, Christopher) Modified on 12/11/2018; this is a two-part motion of which only one part was efiled - see 139 for Motion to Stay (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Amending Class Certification Scheduling Order ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Discovery due by 2/5/2019, Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2019 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #135 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 5, 2018 Filing 135 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Thomas Huddleston (Leimbach, David)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting in part and denying in part #74 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (crp, Dpty Clk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 133 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy: Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2018 ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #127 Motion to Compel (Re: #127 MOTION to Compel Deposition ) (Court Reporter: Conf Rm) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
November 16, 2018 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Compel Deposition (Re: #127 MOTION to Compel Deposition ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (With attachments) (Cash, Angela)
November 14, 2018 Filing 131 RESPONSE (Re: #129 Notice (Other) ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Eckhart, Christopher)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy A Telephone Hearing is scheduled for 11/19/18 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel, David Leimbach, is to arrange the conference call and contact the Courtroom Deputy at 918-699-4821 and all counsel with a call-in number ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy); granting 128 Motion for Hearing (Re: #127 MOTION to Compel Deposition ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
November 8, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (Re: #78 Response in Opposition to Motion ) by Thomas Huddleston (Leimbach, David)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this is a two-part motion of which only one part was efiled; Correction: efiled Motion for Hearing - see 128 (Re: #127 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Request Expedited Telephonic Hearing ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
November 6, 2018 ***Motion(s) Referred to Magistrate McCarthy (Re: 128 MOTION for Hearing (for expedited telephonic hearing) (submitted as part of #127 ) ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
November 6, 2018 Filing 128 MOTION for Hearing (for expedited telephonic hearing) (submitted as part of #127 ) (Re: #127 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Request Expedited Telephonic Hearing ) by Thomas Huddleston (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
November 6, 2018 Filing 127 MOTION to Compel Deposition by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Leimbach, David) Modified on 11/7/2018; this is a two-part motion of which only one part was filed - see 128 for Motion for Hearing (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Amending Class Certification Scheduling Order ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Discovery due by 12/7/2018, Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2019 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #125 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 5, 2018 Filing 125 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) To Extend Time (Re: #118 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s), ) by All Plaintiffs (Cottrell, Carolyn)
September 27, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Kenneth Steele, David Thompson [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Kenneth Steele(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party David Thompson(pty:pla).] (Lim, Michelle)
September 20, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Cohlonee S Bacon, Robert F Sartori [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Cohlonee S Bacon(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Robert F Sartori(pty:pla).] (Lim, Michelle)
September 17, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Donald B Custer, Stephanie Evans, John Keller [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Donald B Custer(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Stephanie Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party John Keller(pty:pla).] (Lim, Michelle)
September 17, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Marcus Johnson [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Marcus Johnson(pty:pla).] (Lim, Michelle)
September 12, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Michael Earl Bailey [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Michael Earl Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Michael Earl Bailey(pty:pla).] (Lim, Michelle)
September 11, 2018 Filing 119 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Billy Tyler [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Billy Tyler(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Billy Tyler(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Amending Class Certification Scheduling Order ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Discovery due by 11/12/2018, Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2019 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #110 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 11, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Arthur T Thomas, William E Williams [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Arthur T Thomas(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party William E Williams(pty:pla).] (Lim, Michelle)
September 10, 2018 Filing 116 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #110 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to Continue Class Certification Deadlines ) by Thomas Huddleston ; (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
September 7, 2018 Filing 115 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #110 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to Continue Class Certification Deadlines ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Yuri Di Biaggio [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Yuri Di Biaggio(pty:pla).] (Lim, Michelle)
September 6, 2018 Filing 113 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Joshua Clark, Jimmy Finley Jr., Pamela Lott, Fred Maxwell [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Joshua Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Jimmy Finley Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Pamela Lott(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Fred Maxwell(pty:pla).] (Lim, Michelle)
September 4, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Richard Allen Robinson III, Robert Atkinson, Eugene Barnett, John Canon, Keith Carter, Jose Luis Cintron, Richard Coleman, Richard Dilling, Sharon Sue Elkins, Thomas Ray Hergenreder, Charles M Jones Jr, Dawn Kelley, Ronald Singleton, John Solliday, David Strange, Sandra Sullivan, Albert Wall, Reginald Williams [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Richard Allen Robinson III, Robert Atkinson, Eugene Barnett, John Canon, Keith Carter, Jose Luis Cintron, Richard Coleman, Richard Dilling, Sharon Sue Elkins, Thomas Ray Hergenreder, Charles M Jones Jr, Dawn Kelley, Ronald Singleton, John Solliday, David Strange, Sandra Sullivan, Albert Wall, Reginald Williams.] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell setting expedited Response and Reply deadlines to Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Continue Class Certification Deadlines [Doc. #110], setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 9/7/2018, Replies due by 9/10/2018) (Re: #110 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to Continue Class Certification Deadlines ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 31, 2018 Filing 110 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to Continue Class Certification Deadlines by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
August 30, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong attorney logged in for appearance; Correction: changed text to reflect correct attorney appearance (Re: #109 Appearance - Attorney ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
August 29, 2018 Filing 109 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ori Edelstein on behalf of Thomas Huddleston (Lim, Michelle) Modified on 8/30/2018 to correct attorney name making appearance (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting admission pro hac vice for Ori Edelstein ; granting #107 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 29, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: first name of attorney Edelstein was entered as Eli rather than Ori; Correction: changed text (Re: #107 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eli Edelstein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1952876) ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
August 28, 2018 Filing 107 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ori Edelstein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1952876) by All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Michael J Blaschke added to party All Plaintiffs(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Blaschke, Michael) Modified on 8/29/2018 to correct text for first name of attorney Edelstein (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
August 20, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Shawn P Camp, Branden Green, Robert Murphy, Dennis Scott, Charles Curry Whisenhunt [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Shawn P Camp(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Branden Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Robert Murphy (pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Dennis Scott(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Charles Curry Whisenhunt(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
August 13, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Steven Byrd, Larry Mumphrey Jr, Joe Salcido [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Steven Byrd(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Larry Mumphrey Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Joe Salcido(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
August 8, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Tyson Lee Earley, Roger Allen Epstein, Robert Evans, Terry Felice, Shawn Franks, Steven Harlow, Robert M Herron, Sheila Knight, John Madison, Anthony Perry, Scott C Rutherford, Maurice Saddler, Aaron Thornton, James Tull [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Tyson Lee Earley(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Roger Allen Epstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Robert Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Terry Felice(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Shawn Franks(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Steven Harlow(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Robert M Herron(pty:pla),Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Sheila Knight(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party John Madison(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Anthony Perry(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Scott C Rutherford(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Maurice Saddler(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Aaron Thornton(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party James Tull (pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy (Hearing set for 8/8/18 at 10:00 a.m. is stricken) ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); striking/withdrawing document(s); granting #102 Motion to Withdraw Documents(s); granting #102 Motion to Strike Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #95 MOTION to Compel Depositions MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) (Documents Terminated: #95 MOTION to Compel Depositions MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
August 7, 2018 Filing 102 MOTION to Withdraw Document(s) , MOTION to Strike Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #95 MOTION to Compel Depositions MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) by Thomas Huddleston (Leimbach, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Nancy Amesbury, Dennis Ducre, Jason Hopkins, Noel Zaragoza [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Nancy Amesbury(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Dennis Ducre(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Jason Hopkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Noel Zaragoza(pty:pla)] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
August 3, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by John Bennett, Luis Bigay, Patti Hodge, Lori LaRosa, David Lane, Shawn Seigler [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party John Bennett(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Luis Bigay (pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Patti Hodge(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Lori LaRosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party David Lane (pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Shawn Seigler(pty:pla), (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
July 31, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Robert J Alexander, Charles Bellamy, Jose Angel Cintron, Paul R Cooper, Michael Cotter, Devin Cottrell, Kelvin Davis, Dacota Dossett, Richard Erdman, Ernest E Haefner, Katie Harlow, Michael Hemingway, Michael T Holder, Christopher Hood, Fernando Johnson, Darryl Jordan, Joseph Lasenberry, Dylan McKinstry, William V Morris, David Newhouse, Reggie Rawls, Christopher W Robertson, Christopher Rush, Randolph Scott, Stacy Lee Shepherd, Willie Simmons, Christopher Staton, Rashed F Strong, James Teigland, Samuel Thorton [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Robert J Alexander, Charles Bellamy, Jose Angel Cintron, Paul R Cooper, Michael Cotter, Devin Cottrell, Kelvin Davis, Dacota Dossett, Richard Erdman, Ernest E Haefner, Katie Harlow, Michael Hemingway, Michael T Holder, Christopher Hood, Fernando Johnson, Darryl Jordan, Joseph Lasenberry, Dylan McKinstry, William V Morris, David Newhouse, Reggie Rawls, Christopher W Robertson, Christopher Rush, Randolph Scott, Stacy Lee Shepherd, Willie Simmons, Christopher Staton, Rashed F Strong, James Teigland, Samuel Thorton] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy (A Telephone hearing is scheduled for 8/8/18 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel, David Leimbach, is to arrange the conference call and contact the Courtroom Deputy at 918-699-4821 and all counsel with a call-in number), setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy) (Re: #95 MOTION to Compel Depositions MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
July 25, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Donna Clark [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Donna Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Donna Clark(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell the Court grants Plaintiff's request to extend the Class Certification Discovery Cutoff deadline to September 11, 2018; all other scheduling deadlines set in Doc. 82 remain ; granting #95 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #82 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s), ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
July 23, 2018 Filing 95 MOTION to Compel Depositions, MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Leimbach, David) Modified on 8/8/2018- WITHDRAWN per 103 (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
July 19, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join Collective Action by Tony Dawkins [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Tony Dawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Tony Dawkins(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
July 18, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Kevin Behlmer, Timothy Bennett, David Grissler, Jeremy Hill, Jose Porto Iglesias, Kenneth R Royal, Bud A Tackett, Arnold W Wilson [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Kevin Behlmer, Timothy Bennett, David Grissler, Jeremy Hill, Jose Porto Iglesias, Kenneth R Royal, Bud A Tackett, Arnold W Wilson] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
July 16, 2018 Filing 92 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Eric Beavers, Daniel De La Garza, Joe W. Deason, Steven Denman, Brandon K. Dunagan, Raymond Glaze, Andrew Greene, Davonn Hawkins, David E. Henderson, Bradley Johnson, Donald R. Law Jr., Quentin Lee Mays, Robert Pressey, Garry D. Reagan, Scott A. Tullock, Lloyd A. Walker, Charles Wilson, Ervin Winn, Adam Zimmerman [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Eric Beavers, Daniel De La Garza, Joe W. Deason, Steven Denman, Brandon K. Dunagan, Raymond Glaze, Andrew Greene, Davonn Hawkins, David E. Henderson, Bradley Johnson, Donald R. Law Jr., Quentin Lee Mays, Robert Pressey, Garry D. Reagan, Scott A. Tullock, Lloyd A. Walker, Charles Wilson, Ervin Winn, Adam Zimmerman] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
July 12, 2018 Filing 91 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Aaron Collier, Jimmy L. Copeland, Barbara Crabtree, Anthony De La Fuente, Joshua Ewing, Stacey Garcia, Louis Gentry, Cassius Gibson, Fred Kelly, Brian H. Long, Elton Longstreet, Christopher Marocco, Francisco Marquez, Keiftro Mickle, Stefen Oakes, Jamie Wayne Persons, Georgina Ray, Michael Lee Taylor, Tristin Vigil, Randy White [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to partyAaron Collier, Jimmy L. Copeland, Barbara Crabtree, Anthony De La Fuente, Joshua Ewing, Stacey Garcia, Louis Gentry, Cassius Gibson, Fred Kelly, Brian H. Long, Elton Longstreet, Christopher Marocco, Francisco Marquez, Keiftro Mickle, Stefen Oakes, Jamie Wayne Persons, Georgina Ray, Michael Lee Taylor, Tristin Vigil, Randy White] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
July 10, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Patrick Burke II, Lance Calvert, Roger Clements, Morris F Culp Jr., Jackie P. Davidson, Darren A. Davis, Ross R. Dicks Jr., Reginal Douglas, Richard Estridge, Jeremiah T. Ferguson, Clifton Foster, Marcelino R. Garza, Daniel Lee Gowen, Randy Griffith, Marnell Guevara Santiago, Anthony Johnson, Christopher Johnson, Kevin W. Johnson, Vanetta Johnson, Willis L. Johnson Sr., Brian Kelly, Michael Lake, Darrell Lawler, Alton Lemley Jr., Christopher A. Little, Robert Maclean, Timothy Wayne Martin, Thomas J.S. Maserang, Chairyl Rene Meadows, Martha Moseley, Kazem Mousavi, Walid Omar, Jorge Ortiz, Sonya Owens, Charles D. Polk, Nancy A. Ransom, Ricky Reed, James Robins Jr., Julian Russell, John Simon, Jamaal Simpson, Willis James Stephens, Curt Stevens Sr., Daniel Tesla, Jason Torres Burgos, Craig R. Trotter, Clint Welch, Soven M. Wiley, Leslie D. Williams, Bernadette Williams Brown [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Patrick Burke II, Lance Calvert, Roger Clements, Morris F Culp Jr., Jackie P. Davidson, Darren A. Davis, Ross R. Dicks Jr., Reginal Douglas, Richard Estridge, Jeremiah T. Ferguson, Clifton Foster, Marcelino R. Garza, Daniel Lee Gowen, Randy Griffith, Marnell Guevara Santiago, Anthony Johnson, Christopher Johnson, Kevin W. Johnson, Vanetta Johnson, Willis L. Johnson Sr., Brian Kelly, Michael Lake, Darrell Lawler, Alton Lemley Jr., Christopher A. Little, Robert Maclean, Timothy Wayne Martin, Thomas J.S. Maserang, Chairyl Rene Meadows, Martha Moseley, Kazem Mousavi, Walid Omar, Jorge Ortiz, Sonya Owens, Charles D. Polk, Nancy A. Ransom, Ricky Reed, James Robins Jr., Julian Russell, John Simon, Jamaal Simpson, Willis James Stephens, Curt Stevens Sr., Daniel Tesla, Jason Torres Burgos, Craig R. Trotter, Clint Welch, Soven M. Wiley, Leslie D. Williams, Bernadette Williams Brown.] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
July 10, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE Of Appearance by Michael K Akins, Edgard Alarcon, Jr, Raymond Alcala, Gene Aldridge, Harry Aldridge, Sidney Allen, Denise Allen, Ronald Almy, Jr, Curtis Anderson, Corrye Andrews, Terry Bailey, Adam Baker, John Baker, Marcus Barkley, Homer Barrett, Matthew Barrette, Anthony Barton, Al Rasheed Baskerville, Daniel Bayless, Matthew Beck, Robert Becker, Troyan Bedford, Willie Bell, William Bittner, Bradely Boardman, Anthony Boccardi, Earl Eugene Boen, Jr, Thomas Bohne, III, Sandra Booker, Raymond Borja, Bobby Borkowski, Dennis Borrow, Jami Boundinot, James Bourland, George Brannon, Clinton Bready, Franklin Breeden, Brando Brewer, John Bright, Maurice Brown, Peter Brown, Stanley Brown, Wilbur Brown, William Brunelle, Allen F Brush, Jr, Richard Budin, Toney Bynum, Alice Byrd, Thomas Caffrey, Suzanna Maria Canchola, Ellen Cannon, Cameron Carignan, Paul Carroll, Shannon Carson, Ronald Catoe, Patrick Ceiga, Roland C Chandler, Debbie Cherry, Henry Cherry, Jessie Chesteen, Cheryl Chub, Randy Clark, Christian Clarke, LeBarron Coates, Darren Collins, Anthony Conners, Bryna Content-Watkins, Ronald Conway, John Cook, Richard Cook, Ron Cooper, Ryan Cooper, Kendall Corner, Joshua Corse, Aaron Covington, Richard A Cox, Jason Cree, Dan Crombie, Galen D Cronin, George Cross, Michael Crowder, Sergio M Cuevas Soto, Shrandell Curry, John Damron, James Daniels, Davey Davis, Kelly Davis, William Dawdy, David E Dennis, Jaquon Dick, Ronald Dorman, Christopher Dover, Abelardo Durazo, Jr, Anthony Edwards, James D Ellis, Rodney Elwell, Jonathan Endicott, Darren Farr, Leon Fells, Lowell Fenton, Michael Fields, Eileen Fisher, Ivan Fletcher, II, Ramon Fontes, Jeff Ford, Victor Foreman, Victor Francois, James Franklin, Ricky E Franklin, Ivan French, Erik Galloway, Robert Garcia, Gary Garrett, Neiko Gates, Jason Gato, Damon C Gaudet, Heather George, Arman Ghevondyan, Marcus Gillespie, Dante R Goins, Sr, Charles Goldman, Juan Gomez-Rosa, John D Graves, Jr, Robert Grisby, David Hairston, DeAunte Hale, Mitchell Hall, Melissa Hamilton, Clifton Hammock, Andrew Hampton, Terrance Hardy, Shona Harless, Kelvin Harris, Todd Harroun, Nathan Harvey, Tiffany Havens-Guthrie, Vernon Hawthorne, Joseph Heidelberg, Phillip Hester, Terry Hiatt, Joe E Hill, Luther N Hines, Steven Hines, Joel Lance Holbrook, John C Holder, Kyle Holder, Vincent Howard, Vernie Clifford Hudson, Jr, William Hull, Cleaven Hunter, Wade Israel, James Jackson, Shonee Jackson, Dax James, Robert James, Enrico Paolo Javier, Jason Jenkins, Jonathan R Jenkins, Mariah Jenkins, Andy Jesinger, Earl Johns, Dale Johnson, Virgil Jones, Christopher Jordan, Edward Judson, Tony Carlos Kimble, Kenneth Kimbley, Ritchie King, Robert Lake, Mickey Landrum, Caleb Lavi, Jason LeJeune, Jonathan Lee, John Leija, Gary Lenihan, Curtis L Lewis, Robert Lewis, Randal Light, Brandon Logan, Jennifer Lynn, Jason W MacDonald, Joshua Malone, Keith Mansfield, Robert Martin, Roy Martin, Steven Mason, Curtis Matthew, David Mattingly, Anthony Matuzak, Wayne McCann, Duane McConnell, Cameron McDowell, Lawrence McKinney, John McManess, Demetrius McQueen, Phillip McWhorther, Douglas Meyer, Kamau Michael, George Nelson Miller, Amie Moegelin, Robert Moore, Virgil Moran, Maurice Morehead, Taurean Morsell, David Morton, James Murphy, Jeremy Musser, Clarence Nathan, Eric Nation, Jacob Nielger, Deaustin Nixon, Gavin O'Connor-Keene, Richard Owens, Garry G Pace, Michael C Paugh, Eric S Peach, Juan Perez-Garcia, Irmantas Petravicius, John Pettigrew, David Piearcy, David Podoll, Salvador Ponce, Judith Pratt, Sean Price, Matthew Proffer, Robert Quintin, Ramiro Ramirez, Deon Redd, Cynthia Redding, Erick Reid, Anthony Rice, Ladell Richmond, Robert Roberts, Gregory Robinson, Charles V Rodgers, Joseph Rodriguez, Willie J Rogers, Jr, Leroy Rushing, Jamie Salisbury, Earl Sampson, Timothy Schaefer, Charles Schreckenbach, Darvin Scott, June Shastid, Joseph Sherman, Margaret Shick, Mark Simpkins, Bobby Sloan, Adrain Smith, Antwon Smith, Eddie Smith, III, Frank A Smith, Ira Smith, Martavius Smith, Ruben Smith, Adrian Smith, Daniel Snyder, Kenneth Snyder, Mark Soukup, Tom Spafford, Edward St Jude, Larry Stapp, Luther Starling, Joseph Steele, Richard Steen, Ronald Stevens, Andre Story, Shawntale Strange, Garrett K Taft, Anthony Tennant, Charles Thomas, Jerry Thomas, John Keith Thompson, Sr, Robert Thompson, Catherine Tijerina, Kenzie Townsend, David Tucker, Anthony Turner, Earl Turner, Billy Tyler, Sean Underwood, John Vanaken, Dennis Vanmeter, Norman Vann, Helsie Vatthauer, Rene Vega, Deniss Veyette, Juan Vidito, Don Voetberg, Brian Wagner, David H Waldron, Steven Walker, Bryan Wallace, William Walters, Warren Ward, Terrance Washington, Terrance Webb, Wesley Wells, Ryan Whitehead, Curtis Wiggins, Robert A Wilkowski, Angela Williams, Clyde Williams, Germaine Williams, Jacqueline Williams, John Williams, Robert Williams, Marcial Zambrano, Mushtag Zokari [Note: Attorney David Christopher Leimbach added to party Michael K Akins, Edgard Alarcon, Jr, Raymond Alcala, Gene Aldridge, Harry Aldridge, Sidney Allen, Denise Allen, Ronald Almy, Jr, Curtis Anderson, Corrye Andrews, Terry Bailey, Adam Baker, John Baker, Marcus Barkley, Homer Barrett, Matthew Barrette, Anthony Barton, Al Rasheed Baskerville, Daniel Bayless, Matthew Beck, Robert Becker, Troyan Bedford, Willie Bell, William Bittner, Bradely Boardman, Anthony Boccardi, Earl Eugene Boen, Jr, Thomas Bohne, III, Sandra Booker, Raymond Borja, Bobby Borkowski, Dennis Borrow, Jami Boundinot, James Bourland, George Brannon, Clinton Bready, Franklin Breeden, Brando Brewer, John Bright, Maurice Brown, Peter Brown, Stanley Brown, Wilbur Brown, William Brunelle, Allen F Brush, Jr, Richard Budin, Toney Bynum, Alice Byrd, Thomas Caffrey, Suzanna Maria Canchola, Ellen Cannon, Cameron Carignan, Paul Carroll, Shannon Carson, Ronald Catoe, Patrick Ceiga, Roland C Chandler, Debbie Cherry, Henry Cherry, Jessie Chesteen, Cheryl Chub, Randy Clark, Christian Clarke, LeBarron Coates, Darren Collins, Anthony Conners, Bryna Content-Watkins, Ronald Conway, John Cook, Richard Cook, Ron Cooper, Ryan Cooper, Kendall Corner, Joshua Corse, Aaron Covington, Richard A Cox, Jason Cree, Dan Crombie, Galen D Cronin, George Cross, Michael Crowder, Sergio M Cuevas Soto, Shrandell Curry, John Damron, James Daniels, Davey Davis, Kelly Davis, William Dawdy, David E Dennis, Jaquon Dick, Ronald Dorman, Christopher Dover, Abelardo Durazo, Jr, Anthony Edwards, James D Ellis, Rodney Elwell, Jonathan Endicott, Darren Farr, Leon Fells, Lowell Fenton, Michael Fields, Eileen Fisher, Ivan Fletcher, II, Ramon Fontes, Jeff Ford, Victor Foreman, Victor Francois, James Franklin, Ricky E Franklin, Ivan French, Erik Galloway, Robert Garcia, Gary Garrett, Neiko Gates, Jason Gato, Damon C Gaudet, Heather George, Arman Ghevondyan, Marcus Gillespie, Dante R Goins, Sr, Charles Goldman, Juan Gomez-Rosa, John D Graves, Jr, Robert Grisby, David Hairston, DeAunte Hale, Mitchell Hall, Melissa Hamilton, Clifton Hammock, Andrew Hampton, Terrance Hardy, Shona Harless, Kelvin Harris, Todd Harroun, Nathan Harvey, Tiffany Havens-Guthrie, Vernon Hawthorne, Joseph Heidelberg, Phillip Hester, Terry Hiatt, Joe E Hill, Luther N Hines, Steven Hines, Joel Lance Holbrook, John C Holder, Kyle Holder, Vincent Howard, Vernie Clifford Hudson, Jr, William Hull, Cleaven Hunter, Wade Israel, James Jackson, Shonee Jackson, Dax James, Robert James, Enrico Paolo Javier, Jason Jenkins, Jonathan R Jenkins, Mariah Jenkins, Andy Jesinger, Earl Johns, Dale Johnson, Virgil Jones, Christopher Jordan, Edward Judson, Tony Carlos Kimble, Kenneth Kimbley, Ritchie King, Robert Lake, Mickey Landrum, Caleb Lavi, Jason LeJeune, Jonathan Lee, John Leija, Gary Lenihan, Curtis L Lewis, Robert Lewis, Randal Light, Brandon Logan, Jennifer Lynn, Jason W MacDonald, Joshua Malone, Keith Mansfield, Robert Martin, Roy Martin, Steven Mason, Curtis Matthew, David Mattingly, Anthony Matuzak, Wayne McCann, Duane McConnell, Cameron McDowell, Lawrence McKinney, John McManess, Demetrius McQueen, Phillip McWhorther, Douglas Meyer, Kamau Michael, George Nelson Miller, Amie Moegelin, Robert Moore, Virgil Moran, Maurice Morehead, Taurean Morsell, David Morton, James Murphy, Jeremy Musser, Clarence Nathan, Eric Nation, Jacob Nielger, Deaustin Nixon, Gavin O'Connor-Keene, Richard Owens, Garry G Pace, Michael C Paugh, Eric S Peach, Juan Perez-Garcia, Irmantas Petravicius, John Pettigrew, David Piearcy, David Podoll, Salvador Ponce, Judith Pratt, Sean Price, Matthew Proffer, Robert Quintin, Ramiro Ramirez, Deon Redd, Cynthia Redding, Erick Reid, Anthony Rice, Ladell Richmond, Robert Roberts, Gregory Robinson, Charles V Rodgers, Joseph Rodriguez, Willie J Rogers, Jr, Leroy Rushing, Jamie Salisbury, Earl Sampson, Timothy Schaefer, Charles Schreckenbach, Darvin Scott, June Shastid, Joseph Sherman, Margaret Shick, Mark Simpkins, Bobby Sloan, Adrain Smith, Antwon Smith, Eddie Smith, III, Frank A Smith, Ira Smith, Martavius Smith, Ruben Smith, Adrian Smith, Daniel Snyder, Kenneth Snyder, Mark Soukup, Tom Spafford, Edward St Jude, Larry Stapp, Luther Starling, Joseph Steele, Richard Steen, Ronald Stevens, Andre Story, Shawntale Strange, Garrett K Taft, Anthony Tennant, Charles Thomas, Jerry Thomas, John Keith Thompson, Sr, Robert Thompson, Catherine Tijerina, Kenzie Townsend, David Tucker, Anthony Turner, Earl Turner, Billy Tyler, Sean Underwood, John Vanaken, Dennis Vanmeter, Norman Vann, Helsie Vatthauer, Rene Vega, Deniss Veyette, Juan Vidito, Don Voetberg, Brian Wagner, David H Waldron, Steven Walker, Bryan Wallace, William Walters, Warren Ward, Terrance Washington, Terrance Webb, Wesley Wells, Ryan Whitehead, Curtis Wiggins, Robert A Wilkowski, Angela Williams, Clyde Williams, Germaine Williams, Jacqueline Williams, John Williams, Robert Williams, Marcial Zambrano, Mushtag Zokari)(With attachments) (Leimbach, David Christopher)
July 6, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Clinton Selby [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Clinton Selby(pty:pla)] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
July 5, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Frederick A. Altherr, James H. Cofield, Jr., Sherman Higgs, Laura Lemon, Elliott Mergler, Alvis Mitchell, Jr., David Parrack, Christopher Pelletier, Stephen Qualls, Joe N. Spearman, Randall A. Tarwater, Arash Tehranchi, Scott Wollbrink [Note: Attorney Michelle S Lim added to party Frederick A. Altherr, James H. Cofield, Jr., Sherman Higgs, Laura Lemon, Elliott Mergler, Alvis Mitchell, Jr., David Parrack, Christopher Pelletier, Stephen Qualls, Joe N. Spearman, Randall A. Tarwater, Arash Tehranchi, Scott Wollbrink] (With attachments) (Lim, Michelle)
July 3, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Alice Byrd, Robert Moore, Joseph Steele (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
July 3, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Harry Aldridge, Marcus Barkley, Earl Eugene Boen, Jr., Allen F. Brush, Jr., Richard Budin, LeBarron Coates, Bryna Content-Watkins, Richard Cook, John Damron, Kelly Davis, David E. Dennis, Abelardo Durazo, Jr., Jonathan Endicott, Darren Farr, Ivan Fletcher II, Victor Foreman, James Franklin, Ricky E. Franklin, Ivan French, Damon C. Gaudet, Arman Ghevondyan, DeAunte Hale, Mitchell Hall, Kyle Holder, Vincent Howard, Jonathan R. Jenkins, Dale Johnson, Tony Carlos Kimble, Mickey Landrum, Curtis L. Lewis, Jason W. MacDonald, Clarence Nathan, Gavin O'Connor-Keene, Michael C. Paugh, John Pettigrew, Ramiro Ramirez, Deon Redd, Cynthia Redding, Anthony Rice, Willie J. Rogers, Jr., Bobby Sloan, Ira Smith, Frank A. Smith, Eddie Smith III, Richard Steen, Andre Story, Garrett K. Taft, Catherine Tijerina, David Tucker, Brian Wagner, Ryan Whitehead, Marcial Zambrano (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
June 29, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Roy Bittner, Douglas D Burnett, II, John Henshaw, Thomas Huddleston, Robert Lewis, Salvador Ponce, Sergio M. Cuevas Soto, John Bright, David Podoll, Kenneth Snyder, Earl Sampson, Ronald Dorman, Jeremy Musser, Brando Brewer, John Vanaken, Jami Boundinot, Anthony Boccardi, Daniel Snyder, Anthony Turner, Kenneth Kimbley, Shrandell Curry, Gary Lenihan, Helsie Vatthauer, Luther Starling, Sean Price, Matthew Barrette, June Shastid, Roy Martin, Terry Bailey, Eileen Fisher, Adrian Smith, Curtis Wiggins, Rodney Elwell, Martin Robert, Raymond Borja, Tom Spafford, Curtis Anderson, Judith Pratt, Bryan Wallace, Joel L. Holbrook, Bradely Boardman, Robert James, Edward St Jude, Timothy Schaefer, Todd Harroun, Marcus Gillespie, Sidney Allen, Anthony Tennant, Denise Allen, Neiko Gates, Don Voetberg, Maurice Brown, Charles Thomas, Erik Galloway, Phillip McWhorther, Germaine Williams, Steven Hines, Shawntale Strange, Joseph Rodriguez, Christian Clarke, Steven Walker, Anthony Conners, Wade Israel, Ramon Fontes, Ladell Richmond, Troyan Bedford, John McManess, Demetrius McQueen, Warren Ward, Toney Bynum, Juan Perez-Garcia, Kamau Michael, Robert Thompson, Jaquon Dick, Kendall Corner, Jason Cree, Tiffany Havens-Guthrie, Shonee Jackson, Darvin Scott, Dennis Borrow, Cameron McDowell, Deaustin Nixon, Davey Davis, Virgil Jones, Juan Vidito, George Brannon, Franklin Breeden, Andrew Hampton, Terrance Washington, James Murphy, Wilbur Brown, Edward Judson, Cleaven Hunter, Joseph Heidelberg, Jacqueline Williams, Leroy Rushing, Adam Baker, James Bourland, Virgil Moran, Henry and Debbie Cherry, Robert Becker, Bobby Borkowski, Terry Hiatt, Billy Tyler, Martavius Smith, Rene Vega, Deniss Veyette, Jennifer Lynn, Matthew Proffer, Robert Williams, Clifton Hammock, Caleb Lavi, Terrance Webb, Gregory Robinson, Antwon Smith, Edgard Alarcon Jr, Curtis Matthew, Joshua Malone, Randy Clark, Sandra Booker, Thomas Caffrey, Nathan Harvey, Joshua Corse, Aaron Covington, Brandon Logan, Douglas Meyer, Kelvin Harris, Jason LeJeune, William Dawdy, Earl Turner, Lowell Fenton, Cheryl Chub, Clyde Williams, Earl Johns, Peter Brown, Robert Garcia, Robert Quintin, Duane McConnell, Raymond Alcala, Heather George, Dan Crombie, Jacob Nielger, Leon Fells, John Cook, Roland C. Chandler, Robert Grisby, Sean Underwood, William Bittner, Enrico Paolo Javier, Thomas Bohne III, Mariah Jenkins, Jerry Thomas, Keith Mansfield, Margaret Shick, Mushtag Zokari, Ryan Cooper, Darren Collins, Ellen Cannon, Michael Crowder, John Baker, David Mattingly, Ronald Conway, Shona Harless, Vernie Clifford Hudson Jr., Amie Moegelin, Ron Cooper, Ronald Almy Jr., Charles Goldman, Homer Barrett, Mark Soukup, Irmantas Petravicius, Anthony Barton, James Daniels, Jessie Chesteen, Robert Roberts, Jamie Salisbury, Victor Francois, Eric Nation, Paul Carroll, David Piearcy, Gene Aldridge, Wesley Wells, Ritchie King, Phillip Hester, Norman Vann, Jason Gato, William Walters, Suzanna Maria Canchola, Matthew Beck, William Brunelle, Lawrence McKinney, Patrick Ceiga, Angela Williams, Richard Owens, George Cross, Robert Lake, Ronald Catoe, Ronald Stevens, Dax James, Kenzie Townsend, Shannon Carson, Larry Stapp, Cameron Carignan, Maurice Morehead, James D. Ellis, John Williams, Terrance Hardy, John D. Graves Jr., David Hairston, Dante R. Goins Sr., George Nelson Miller, Dennis Vanmeter, David H. Waldron, Christopher Dover, Adrain Smith, Corrye Andrews, Luther N. Hines, Mark Simpkins, Ruben Smith, William Hull, Melissa Hamilton, James Jackson, John Keith Thompson Sr., Jonathan Lee, Eric S Peach, Erick Reid, Christopher Jordan, Charles V. Rodgers, Joe E. Hill, Garry G. Pace, Robert A. Wilkowski, Michael Fields, Juan Gomez-Rosa, Andy Jesinger, Clinton Bready, Stanley Brown, Joseph Sherman, John Leija, Jeff Ford, Jason Jenkins, Charles Schreckenbach, Anthony Matuzak, Randal Light, Richard A. Cox, John C. Holder, Wayne McCann, Willie Bell, Vernon Hawthorne, Al Rasheed Baskerville, Galen D. Cronin, David Morton, Steven Mason, Daniel Bayless, Taurean Morsell, Gay Garrett (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
May 21, 2018 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #74 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (Eckhart, Christopher)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Amending Class Certification Scheduling Order ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Discovery due by 8/21/2018, Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2019 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #81 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 15, 2018 Filing 81 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #50 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s), ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Cash, Angela)
May 8, 2018 Filing 80 DECLARATION of David C. Leimbach (Re: #76 Opinion and Order, Ruling on Motion for Collective Action Certification ) by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
May 8, 2018 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #78 Response in Opposition to Motion ) by Thomas Huddleston (Leimbach, David)
May 7, 2018 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #74 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) by Thomas Huddleston ; (Leimbach, David)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell striking hearing set on May 17, 2018, striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Miscellaneous deadline: 5/8/2018) ; granting in part and denying in part #58 Motion for Collective Action Certification (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 16, 2018 Filing 75 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #74 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (Eckhart, Christopher)
April 16, 2018 Filing 74 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Eckhart, Christopher)
April 10, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: filers were selected that were not named as filers in the pleading; Correction: removed filers selected but not named in pleading (Re: #73 Reply to Response to Motion, ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
April 9, 2018 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #58 MOTION for Collective Action Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) ) by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Leimbach, David) Modified on 4/10/2018; attached pdf names only one filer - removed filers not named in document (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Granting in Part Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Ten Pages [Doc. #71]; Plaintiffs may file a reply brief of fifteen pages ; granting in part #71 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 6, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Roy Bittner, Douglas D Burnett, II, John Henshaw, Thomas Huddleston, Robert Lewis (Leimbach, David)
March 29, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join Collective Action by Roy Bittner, Douglas D Burnett, II, Thomas Huddleston, Robert Lewis, John Henshaw [Note: Attorney David Christopher Leimbach added to party John Henshaw(pty:pla).] (Leimbach, David)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Counsel for Defendant John Christner Trucking, LLC is directed to provide a three-ring binder notebook for use by the Court, containing a paper copy of the document, with tabbed exhibits, as filed at Doc. # 68. Said paper copy shall be a complete and exact duplicate of the filing after filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
March 26, 2018 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #58 MOTION for Collective Action Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (With attachments) (Eckhart, Christopher)
March 26, 2018 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Unredacted) of Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 3/14/2018 before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (Pages: 1-16). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: A party must file a Transcript Redaction Request within 21 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, this unredacted transcript may be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may view the transcript at the court public terminal at no charge or may purchase a copy from the court reporter. (Re: #65 Minutes of Motion Hearing,, Striking/Terminating Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), Ruling on Motion to Quash, Ruling on Motion to Stay, Ruling on Motion for Protective Order) (bpn, CrtRptr) Modified on 6/25/2018 to remove transcript access restriction (sac, Dpty Clk).
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell resetting Motion hearing on 5/17/2018 to 1:30 pm (Time Change Only), setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (Re: #58 MOTION for Collective Action Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b), #55 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,,, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s), ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 14, 2018 Filing 65 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy: Motion Hearing held on 3/14/2018 ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #60 Motion to Quash; granting #60 Motion to Stay; granting #60 Motion for Protective Order (Re: #60 MOTION to Quash DEFENDANTS NOTICES OF DEPOSITIONS MOTION to Stay DEPOSITIONS MOTION for Protective Order ) (Court Reporter: Conf Rm) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
March 9, 2018 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #60 MOTION to Quash DEFENDANTS NOTICES OF DEPOSITIONS MOTION to Stay DEPOSITIONS MOTION for Protective Order ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC ; (With attachments) (Cash, Angela)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): A Telephone hearing is scheduled for 3/14/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel, David Leimbach, is to arrange the conference call and contact the Courtroom Deputy at 918-699-4821 and all counsel with a call-in number ( Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy) (Re: #60 MOTION to Quash DEFENDANTS NOTICES OF DEPOSITIONS MOTION to Stay DEPOSITIONS MOTION for Protective Order ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
March 8, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this entry was made in error; Correction: terminated pending motions made in error (Re: 61 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Stay (both motions submitted as part of #60 ) ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
March 7, 2018 ***Motion(s) Referred to Magistrate McCarthy (Re: 61 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Stay (both motions submitted as part of #60 ) ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
March 7, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION to Stay (both motions submitted as part of #60 ) by Roy Bittner, Douglas D Burnett, II, Thomas Huddleston, Robert Lewis (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 3/8/2018 - ENTERED IN ERROR (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
March 7, 2018 ***Motion(s) Referred to Magistrate Judge McCarthy (Re: #60 MOTION to Quash DEFENDANTS NOTICES OF DEPOSITIONS MOTION to Stay DEPOSITIONS MOTION for Protective Order ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 7, 2018 *** MOTION to Stay DEPOSITIONS Referred to Magistrate Judge McCarthy (Re: #60 MOTION to Quash DEFENDANTS NOTICES OF DEPOSITIONS MOTION to Stay DEPOSITIONS MOTION for Protective Order ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 7, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION to Quash DEFENDANTS NOTICES OF DEPOSITIONS, MOTION to Stay DEPOSITIONS, MOTION for Protective Order by Roy Bittner, Douglas D Burnett, II, Thomas Huddleston, Robert Lewis (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to provide a three-ring binder notebook for use by the Court, containing a paper copy of the document, with tabbed exhibits, as filed at Doc. # 58. Said paper copy shall be a complete and exact duplicate of the filing after filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
February 23, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION for Collective Action Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Leimbach, David)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting #56 Motion for Protective Order (tjc, Dpty Clk)
January 30, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for Protective Order by John Christner Trucking, LLC (With attachments) (Cash, Angela)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): Conditional Certification ( Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #54 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #50 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s), ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 5, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event (Motion for Miscellaneous Relief); Correction: corrected event (Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s)) (Re: #54 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) (srt, Dpty Clk)
January 4, 2018 Filing 54 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #50 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s), ) by Thomas Huddleston (Cottrell, Carolyn) Modified on 1/5/2018 to correct event (srt, Dpty Clk).
January 2, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join Collective Action by Thomas Huddleston (Lim, Michelle)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Re Attorney Michelle S. Lim) ; granting #51 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 27, 2017 Filing 51 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michelle S. Lim to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1850366) by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Mor, Rachel)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULING ORDER), setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): Motion: ( Miscellaneous Hearing set for 4/5/2018 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2018 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): Class Certification ( Discovery due by 6/22/2018) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 9, 2017 Filing 49 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell: Scheduling Conference held on 11/9/2017 , striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (Court Reporter: none) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell allowing David Leimbach and Carolyn Cottrell to appear telephonically at Scheduling Conference on 11/9/2017. Contact courtroom deputy (918-699-4708) with your contact information ; granting #43 Motion for Leave to Appear; granting #46 Motion for Leave to Appear (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 8, 2017 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically, #45 Appearance - Attorney ) by Roy Bittner, Thomas Huddleston, Robert Lewis (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 8, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Roy Bittner, Thomas Huddleston, Robert Lewis (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 8, 2017 Filing 45 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Carolyn H Cottrell on behalf of Thomas Huddleston (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 7, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join Collective Action by Thomas Huddleston (Leimbach, David)
November 7, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically At Scheduling Conference Scheduled for November 9, 2017 by Thomas Huddleston (Leimbach, David) Modified on 11/8/2017 to delete text (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
November 7, 2017 Filing 42 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Christopher Leimbach on behalf of Thomas Huddleston (Leimbach, David)
November 6, 2017 Filing 41 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel Lawrence Mor on behalf of Thomas Huddleston [Note: Attorney Rachel Lawrence Mor added to party Thomas Huddleston(pty:pla).] (Mor, Rachel)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Re Attorney Alaina Cathrine Hawley) ; granting #39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 2, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alaina Cathrine Hawley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1843030) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (With attachments) (Latham, Bobby)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Re: Carolyn H. Cottrell, David C. Leimbach, Mira P. Karageorge and Robert S. Boulter ) ; granting #34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #35 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #36 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #37 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 27, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert S. Boulter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1840872) by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Blaschke, Michael)
October 27, 2017 Filing 36 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mira P. Karageorge to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1840551) by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Blaschke, Michael)
October 27, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION for Attorney(s) David C. Leimbach to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1840544) by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Blaschke, Michael)
October 27, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carolyn H. Cottrell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1840535) by Thomas Huddleston (With attachments) (Blaschke, Michael)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell setting Scheduling Conference for November 9, 2017. If any party requests a court reporter be present for the conference, please notify the Courtroom Deputy by 11/3/2017, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2017 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 20, 2017 Filing 32 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Thomas Huddleston (Blaschke, Michael)
October 20, 2017 Filing 31 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael J Blaschke on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Michael J Blaschke added to party Thomas Huddleston(pty:pla).] (Blaschke, Michael)
October 19, 2017 Filing 30 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #1 Complaint, ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Latham, Bobby)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; adding attorney Angela S Cash,Christopher J Eckhart for John Christner Trucking, LLC ; granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 19, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher J. Eckhart to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1837068) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Latham, Bobby)
October 19, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney(s) Angela S. Cash to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1837066) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Latham, Bobby)
October 13, 2017 Filing 26 MAIL to Robert S Boulter Returned - remailed on 10/13/17 to Law Offices of Robert S Boulter, 1101 FIFTH AVE STE 235, SAN RAFAEL, CA 94901 - new address obtained from dkt# 11. (Re: 17 Minute Order,,,, Directing Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement,,, 19 Minute Order, Changing Case Number ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline: 10/19/2017) ; granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 11, 2017 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #1 Complaint, ) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Latham, Bobby)
October 5, 2017 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent JCT Holding, LLC for John Christner Trucking, LLC) by John Christner Trucking, LLC (Latham, Bobby)
October 5, 2017 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cheryl Anne Jackson on behalf of John Christner Trucking, LLC [Note: Attorney Cheryl Anne Jackson added to party John Christner Trucking, LLC(pty:dft).] (Jackson, Cheryl)
October 5, 2017 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bobby Leon Latham, Jr on behalf of John Christner Trucking, LLC [Note: Attorney Bobby Leon Latham, Jr added to party John Christner Trucking, LLC(pty:dft).] (Latham, Bobby)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/20/2017) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 28, 2017 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 17-cv-00549-GKF-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
September 28, 2017 Filing 18 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to David Christopher Leimbach, Mira P Karageorge, Carolyn H Cottrell, Robert S Boulter, Alaina Cathrine Hawley and Megan E Ross (jln, Dpty Clk)
September 28, 2017 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing John Christner Trucking, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
September 28, 2017 Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from California Eastern 1:17-cv-925-LJO-SAB
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER RE Defendant's #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/27/2017. CASE TRANSFERRED to Northern District of Oklahoma. (Flores, E) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Alaina Cathrine Hawley on behalf of John Christner Trucking, LLC. Attorney Hawley, Alaina Cathrine added. (Hawley, Alaina) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The hearing on the pending motion to dismiss #5 is VACATED and the matter submitted for decision on the papers pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/5/217. (Kusamura, W) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 12 REPLY by John Christner Trucking, LLC re #10 Opposition to Motion, #5 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Brandon Rains.pdf, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Brian Ford.pdf)(Ross, Megan) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
August 24, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE Of Filing of Consent to Join Collective Action by Thomas Huddleston. (Karageorge, Mira) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Thomas Huddleston to #5 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Huddleston)(Leimbach, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Mira P. Karageorge on behalf of Thomas Huddleston. Attorney Karageorge, Mira P. added. (Karageorge, Mira) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
August 9, 2017 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Decline: Please disregard filing as wrong document was attached in error. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 7 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Christner Trucking, LLC. (Ross, Megan) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 6 ***DISREGARD - See Doc 8*** DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Christner Trucking, LLC. (Ross, Megan) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by John Christner Trucking, LLC. Attorney Ross, Megan E. added. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Shannon Crowley with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Eric Shriver with Exhibit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #4 Proposed Order)(Ross, Megan) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
July 25, 2017 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: John Christner Trucking, LLC served on 7/18/2017, answer due 8/8/2017. (Cottrell, Carolyn) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2017 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Jessen, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *John Christner Trucking, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Carolyn H. Cottrell* *Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky Wotkyns, LLP* *2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400* *Emeryville, CA 94608*. (Jessen, A)[Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Christner Trucking, LLC by Thomas Huddleston. Attorney Cottrell, Carolyn H. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7154708) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cottrell, Carolyn)[Transferred from California Eastern on 9/28/2017.] Modified on 9/28/2017 to edit dkt text to add jury demand(jln, Dpty Clk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huddleston v. John Christner Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Huddleston
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Represented By: Carolyn H Cottrell
Represented By: Mira P Karageorge
Represented By: Robert S Boulter
Represented By: Rachel Lawrence Mor
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Represented By: Michael J Blaschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Cooper
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Murphy
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Tennant
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Wilkowski
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lewis
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Scott
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Barnett
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Zimmerman
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Graves, Jr
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Goldman
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Vann
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Caffrey
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Ford
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah T Ferguson
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Rush
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelton Murray
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Nation
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Curry Whisenhunt
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Cannon
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pettigrew
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Covington
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arash Tehranchi
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio M Cuevas Soto
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradely Boardman
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Baker
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Alcala
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Represented By: Rachel Lawrence Mor
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Represented By: Carolyn H Cottrell
Represented By: Michael J Blaschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Nielger
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Franklin
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corrye Andrews
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arman Ghevondyan
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Francois
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Gentry
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bennett
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Johnson
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deniss Veyette
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Clark
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Aldridge
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane McConnell
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Beck
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branden Green
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Johnson
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Cooper
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E Williams
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Schaefer
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R Law, Jr
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Thorton
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sherman
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Musser
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Johnson
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Bell
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan R Jenkins
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Thomas
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Gillespie
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Matuzak
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefen Oakes
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moore
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Ellis
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William V Morris
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Budin
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Smith
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Strange
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Shastid
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd A Walker
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Maxwell
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Baker
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Catoe
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Becker
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel De La Garza
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Cree
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A Cox
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleaven Hunter
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris F Culp, Jr
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marnell Guevara Santiago
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Harroun
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuri Di Biaggio
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Ortiz
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Brannon
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Alexander
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Garrett
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan McKinstry
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Lee Shepherd
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Wiggins
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig R Trotter
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Collier
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vanaken
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ceiga
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanetta Johnson
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Rushing
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Pelletier
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason W MacDonald
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Boccardi
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Damron
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Hammock
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Bigay
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy A Ransom
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Jones
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Spafford
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Harlow
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bittner
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Kelly
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A Tullock
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taurean Morsell
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwon Smith
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Simon
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis L Lewis
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross R Dicks, Jr
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Williams Brown
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Walker
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Matthew
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jackson
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Crabtree
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mattingly
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Nathan
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles M Jones, Jr
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Wagner
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C Paugh
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Steele
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Madison
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Borkowski
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Starling
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Barkley
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helsie Vatthauer
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Solliday
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Garcia
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Bennett
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason LeJeune
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Johnson
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Smith, III
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Smith
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Crombie
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Garcia
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcial Zambrano
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Sullivan
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rice
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Calvert
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Fisher
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Porto Iglesias
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Maclean
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Erdman
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Earl Bailey
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Clark
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bourland
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bohne, III
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Cherry
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Angel Cintron
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Rasheed Baskerville
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davonn Hawkins
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Hawthorne
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Conners
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Williams
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lake
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Glaze
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tucker
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Snyder
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert James
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deaustin Nixon
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall A Tarwater
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Bready
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Robinson
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti Hodge
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Beavers
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Brown
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Clarke
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kazem Mousavi
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Thornton
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McManess
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Denman
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Carson
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher A Little
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott Mergler
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony De La Fuente
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbur Brown
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Burke, II
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Holder
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon C Gaudet
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Canon
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank A Smith
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Crowder
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Aldridge
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamau Michael
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Pratt
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M Herron
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neiko Gates
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Steele
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dover
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Singleton
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Smith
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Atkinson
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Cross
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David H Waldron
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward St Jude
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Shick
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Behlmer
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Selby
Represented By: Robert S Boulter
Represented By: Mira P Karageorge
Represented By: Rachel Lawrence Mor
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Represented By: Carolyn H Cottrell
Represented By: Michael J Blaschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cotter
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bayless
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Williams
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Holder
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Bittner
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Roberts
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles D Polk
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Judson
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin O'Connor-Keene
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Foreman
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Hall
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Proffer
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Snyder
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur T Thomas
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Brown
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaquon Dick
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Ducre
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariah Jenkins
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Keller
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Carlos Kimble
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Murphy
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mushtag Zokari
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lasenberry
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Williams
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Schreckenbach
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Martin
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Endicott
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Gato
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett K Taft
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian H Long
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Carter
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ritchie King
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles V Rodgers
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Barton
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hill
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keiftro Mickle
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn P Camp
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Keith Thompson, Sr
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert F Sartori
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherman Higgs
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Staton
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Tesla
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homer Barrett
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson Lee Earley
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Allen Epstein
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dawdy
Represented By: David Christopher Leimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H Cofield, Jr
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin Lee Mays
Represented By: Michelle S Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]