Parga et al v. Tulsa County et al
Plaintiff: Michael Parga, Richard Feltz, Tara O'Donley and Christopher Wood
Defendant: Tulsa County, Vic Regalado, Terry H Bitting, Tammy Bruce, Martha Rupp Carter, Stephen R Clark, Theresa Dreiling, Owen Evens, James W Keeley, Deborah Ludi Leitch, J Anthony Miller, Dawn Moody, Millie Otey, Kirsten Pace, April Seibert, Clifford Smith, Sarah Smith and William Musseman
Case Number: 4:2018cv00298
Filed: June 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne); granting in part and denying in part 224 Motion to Amend; finding as moot 225 Motion to Intervene (Re: 210 MOTION to Compel Compliance with a Subpoena and Opening Brief in Support of Motion, 235 MOTION for Protective Order ) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; denying 158 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot 159 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (RGG, Chambers)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne ; granting 89 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion for Protective Order ; granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion to Quash (sdc, Dpty Clk)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Defendant state judges' motion to dismiss plaintiffs O'Donley and Wood's claims (Dkt. # 76) is granted, and plaintiff O'Donley's and Wood's claims are dismissed with out prejudice. Michael Parga is terminated as a party plaintiff. Plaintiffs O'Donley and Wood are terminated as parties unless and until they enter an appearance through counsel. Richard Feltz remains as the only named plaintiff. The parties are directed to modify the case caption in future pleadings to comply with this Opinion and Order. ; terminating party Christopher Wood (on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Tara O'Donley and Michael Parga ; granting [7 6] Motion to Dismiss Party (Re: 87 Suggestion of Death, 76 MOTION to Dismiss Party Tara O'Donley and Christopher Wood and Brief in Support, 74 Minute Order,, Adding/Terminating Attorney(s),,,, Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s), 32 Amended Complaint, 75 Minute Order,,, Adding/Terminating Attorney(s),,,,,, Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s),, ) (RGG, Chambers)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Defendants' motion (Dkt. # 55) to stay proceedings until the end of the current legislative session or until Senate Bill 252 is signed into law, whichever occurs first, is granted, and this matter is stayed. The parties shall file a notice in this Court within three (3) days of the end of the Oklahoma legislative session, or the signing into law of Senate Bill 252, whichever occurs first. The Court will enter a scheduling order when the stay is lifted. ; staying case; granting 55 Motion to Stay (Re: 55 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ) (RGG, Chambers)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Plaintiffs' motion to alter or amend judgment or for relief from judgment (Dkt. # 42) is granted, the Opinion and Order (Dkt. # 40) and the Judgment of Dismissal (Dkt. # 41) are va cated, and this case is reopened. The amended complaint (Dkt. # 32), the motion for class certification (Dkt. # 3), and the motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 24) are reinstated. Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 24) is granted in part and denied in part as follows: Count One - The motion is granted as to defendants Tulsa County Special Judges Terry H. Bitting, Tammy Bruce, Owen Evens, James W. Keeley, J. Anthony Miller, Dawn Moody, Kirsten Pace, April Seibert, Sarah Smith, Martha Rupp Carter, Stephen R. Clark, Theresa Dreiling, Deborah Ludi Leitch, Millie Otey, and Clifford Smith for lack of Article III standing. The motion is denied as to defendant Tulsa County District Judge William Musseman. Count Two - The motio n is denied as to all defendants, subject to plaintiffs' limitation on the type of relief sought against defendant special judges only (i.e., declaratory relief only), as discussed herein. Count Three - The motion is granted as to all defendant s. ; reopening case; vacating/setting aside order(s); reinstating document(s); granting 42 Motion to Reconsider; granting 42 Motion to Alter Order/Judgment (Re: 40 Opinion and Order,,,, Ruling on Motion to Dismiss,, Ruling on Motion for Class Action Certification, 41 Judgment,, Dismissing/Terminating Case, 3 MOTION for Class Action Certification , 24 MOTION to Dismiss , 42 MOTION to Reconsider Order and Judgment Dismissing Case as Moot and Denying Class Certification Motion MOTION to Alter Order/Judgment , 32 Amended Complaint, ) (Documents Terminated: 41 Judgment,, Dismissing/Terminating Case, 40 Opinion and Order,,,, Ruling on Motion to Dismiss,, Ruling on Motion for Class Action Certification, ) (RGG, Chambers)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that moving defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 24) is declared moot. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification (Dkt. # 3) is declared moot. Plaintiffs' amended complaint (Dkt. # 32) is dismissed without prejudice as moot. ; finding as moot 24 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 3 Motion for Class Action Certification (Re: 32 Amended Complaint, ) (RGG, Chambers)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parga et al v. Tulsa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Parga
Represented By: Akeeb Dami Animashaun
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Represented By: Ruth Ellen Lando Hamilton
Represented By: Hayley Elizabeth Horowitz
Represented By: Alexander Karakatsanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Feltz
Represented By: Akeeb Dami Animashaun
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Represented By: Ruth Ellen Lando Hamilton
Represented By: Hayley Elizabeth Horowitz
Represented By: Alexander Karakatsanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara O'Donley
Represented By: Akeeb Dami Animashaun
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Represented By: Ruth Ellen Lando Hamilton
Represented By: Hayley Elizabeth Horowitz
Represented By: Alexander Karakatsanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wood
Represented By: Akeeb Dami Animashaun
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Represented By: Ruth Ellen Lando Hamilton
Represented By: Hayley Elizabeth Horowitz
Represented By: Alexander Karakatsanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vic Regalado
Represented By: Douglas Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry H Bitting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Rupp Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen R Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Dreiling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen Evens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W Keeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Ludi Leitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Anthony Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Moody
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millie Otey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Musseman
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?