Christiansen Aviation, Inc. v. AVCO Corporation
Plaintiff: Christiansen Aviation, Inc.
Defendant: AVCO Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv00378
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
2 Judge: James H Payne
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Defendant's Motion to Stay [Merits] Discovery until ruling on the motion to dismiss is granted, though limited discovery may proceed as to jurisdictional issues as necessary ; granting #12 Motion to Stay (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKFJ, Judge)
September 12, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue ) by AVCO Corporation ; (With attachments) (Main, Edward)
September 12, 2018 Filing 20 First RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order to Stay Discovery (Re: #12 MOTION to Stay ) by Christiansen Aviation, Inc. ; (Rogers, Jamie)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. Defendant's have filed a Motion to Dismiss/Change Venue [Doc. # 10] which should first be resolved. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 7, 2018 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk at the direction of Judge James H Payne, randomly reassigning this case, reassigning case to Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Judge James H Payne no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 18-CV-378-GKF-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Judge James H Payne : granting plaintiff's motion and also extending the reply deadline ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Replies due by 9/12/2018); granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
August 29, 2018 Filing 16 First RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or for Change of Venue (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue ) by Christiansen Aviation, Inc. ; (Rogers, Jamie)
August 28, 2018 Filing 15 First RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause (Re: 13 Order,, Directing Party to Show Cause, ) by Christiansen Aviation, Inc. (Rogers, Jamie)
August 28, 2018 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss or for Change of Venue (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue ) by Christiansen Aviation, Inc. (Rogers, Jamie)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge James H Payne : ordering Plaintiff to show cause by September 7, 2018, why the Motion to Dismiss (#10) should not be granted for failure to respond. Failure to respond to this Order may result in dismissal of this action, directing plaintiff to show cause( Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/7/2018) (pll, Dpty Clk)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Motion for Protective Order); Correction: changed event (Motion to Stay) (Re: #12 MOTION to Stay ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
August 23, 2018 ***Motion(s) Referred to Judge Payne (Re: #12 MOTION to Stay ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay to Stay Discovery and Brief in Support by AVCO Corporation (Main, Edward) Modified on 8/24/2018 to change event (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
August 10, 2018 Filing 11 First JOINT STATUS REPORT by Christiansen Aviation, Inc. (Rogers, Jamie)
July 30, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Change Venue by AVCO Corporation (With attachments) (Main, Edward)
July 25, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/10/2018) (pll, Dpty Clk)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8 First CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christiansen Aviation, Inc. (Rogers, Jamie)
July 23, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Textron Inc. for AVCO Corporation) by AVCO Corporation (Main, Edward)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Christiansen Aviation, Inc. and AVCO Corporation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Edward J Main on behalf of AVCO Corporation (Secrest, James) Modified on 7/23/2018 to change name of attorney appearing (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Keith Secrest, II on behalf of AVCO Corporation (Secrest, James)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by AVCO Corporation (Secrest, James)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2018-01730 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1939791) by AVCO Corporation (With attachments) (Secrest, James)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by AVCO Corporation (Secrest, James)
June 20, 2018 Amended PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against AVCO Corporation by Christiansen Aviation, Inc. (jln, Dpty Clk) Modified on 7/20/2018 to add "Amended" to the dkt text (jln, Dpty Clk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christiansen Aviation, Inc. v. AVCO Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO Corporation
Represented By: Edward John Main
Represented By: James Keith Secrest, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christiansen Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: George Eldon Gibbs
Represented By: Jamie Alison Rogers
Represented By: Zachary Tyler Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?