Victory Energy Operations, LLC v. Amelin Resources, Inc.

Plaintiff: Victory Energy Operations, LLC
Defendant: Amelin Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00417
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
0 Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
1 Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2018 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #18 MOTION to Stay ) by Victory Energy Operations, LLC ; (Gaskins, Garry)
October 3, 2018 19 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Petitioner is directed to file its objection to Respondent's Motion to Stay [Doc. 18] on or before 10/10/2018; Respondent shall have until 10/15/2018 to file a reply, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 10/10/2018, Replies due by 10/15/2018) (Re: #18 MOTION to Stay ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
October 2, 2018 18 MOTION to Stay by Amelin Resources, Inc. (Carter, Lewis)
October 2, 2018 17 ANSWER (Re: #6 Amended Complaint ) by Amelin Resources, Inc. (Carter, Lewis)
September 26, 2018 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amelin Resources, Inc. (Carter, Lewis)
September 24, 2018 15 PRO HAC VICE FEES Paid for attorney(s) Andrea Longworth in the amount of $50.00 (Re: #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrea Longworth to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice ) by Amelin Resources, Inc. (jln, Dpty Clk)
September 20, 2018 14 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting motion for admission pro hac vice of attorney Andrea Longworth ; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 19, 2018 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrea Longworth to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Amelin Resources, Inc. (Carter, Lewis) Modified on 9/24/2018 to remove receipt information (jln, Dpty Clk).
September 19, 2018 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Amelin Resources, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 18, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/18/2018) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 18, 2018 10 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #7 Appearance - Attorney ) by Amelin Resources, Inc. (Carter, Lewis)
September 17, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline set 10/2/2018) ; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 17, 2018 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint ) by Amelin Resources, Inc. (Carter, Lewis)
September 17, 2018 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lewis Norman Carter on behalf of Amelin Resources, Inc. [Note: Attorney Lewis Norman Carter added to party Amelin Resources, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Carter, Lewis)
August 17, 2018 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amelin Resources, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Victory Energy Operations, LLC (With attachments) (Gaskins, Garry)
August 13, 2018 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Amelin Resources, Inc. (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 13, 2018 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Victory Energy Operations, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 13, 2018 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent SMC Victory Holdings, LLC for Victory Energy Operations, LLC) by Victory Energy Operations, LLC (Gaskins, Garry)
August 13, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against Amelin Resources, Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1947298) by Victory Energy Operations, LLC (With attachments) (Gaskins, Garry)
August 13, 2018 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Victory Energy Operations, LLC (Gaskins, Garry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victory Energy Operations, LLC v. Amelin Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Energy Operations, LLC
Represented By: Logan Lawrence James
Represented By: Garry Michael Gaskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelin Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Norman Carter
Represented By: Andrea Longworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?