Sappington v. Rogers County Board of County Commissioners et al

Plaintiff: Nathan Sappington
Defendant: Scott Walton and Rogers County Board of County Commissioners
Case Number: 4:2018cv00423
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Rogers
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2018 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jenny Sanbrano on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Jenny Sanbrano added to party Nathan Sappington(pty:pla).] (Sanbrano, Jenny)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in entering the scheduling order. If necessary, a scheduling order will be entered after ruling on the pending motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 14). (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief In Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief In Support by Rogers County Board of County Commissioners, Scott Walton (McDonald, Ryan)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Plaintiff has filed an Amended Complaint (Dkt. # 12). Therefore, defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 6) is moot. ; finding as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Re: #12 Amended Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
September 12, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Rogers County Board of County Commissioners, Scott Walton (Re: #10 Amended Complaint, State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Nathan Sappington (Smolen, Daniel)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , Having reviewed the docket entry and/or PDF for Dkt #10, the Court has determined that pleading is incorrectly titled and captioned for a court other than the Northern District of Oklahoma. Attorney for plaintiff is hereby directed to re-file plaintiff's Amended Complaint, properly captioned and titled for this court forthwith. (Re: #10 Amended Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Rogers County Board of County Commissioners, Scott Walton (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Nathan Sappington (Smolen, Daniel) Modified on 9/12/2018 to change text to reflect correct "against" parties (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the motion to reset response/reply deadline(s) #8 regarding the motion to dismiss #6 is granted as requested ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 9/12/2018, Replies due by 9/26/2018); granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief In Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief In Support ) by Nathan Sappington (Smolen, Daniel)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in entering the scheduling order. If necessary, a scheduling order will be entered after ruling on the pending motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 6). (Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief In Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief In Support by Rogers County Board of County Commissioners, Scott Walton (McDonald, Ryan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan Alan McDonald on behalf of Rogers County Board of County Commissioners, Scott Walton (McDonald, Ryan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Adrian LeBlanc on behalf of Rogers County Board of County Commissioners, Scott Walton (LeBlanc, Thomas)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Rogers County Board of County Commissioners, Scott Walton (McDonald, Ryan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Rogers County, case number CJ-2018-309 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1949140) by Rogers County Board of County Commissioners, Scott Walton (With attachments) (McDonald, Ryan) Modified on 8/20/2018 to delete "with jury demand" (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Rogers County Board of County Commissioners, Scott Walton (McDonald, Ryan)
July 27, 2018 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Nathan Sappington (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sappington v. Rogers County Board of County Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walton
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Represented By: Ryan Alan McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Represented By: Ryan Alan McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Sappington
Represented By: Lauren Grace Lambright
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Represented By: Jenny Sanbrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?