Bruner v. Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tanechia Bruner
Defendant: Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00425
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
0 Judge: Jodi F Jayne
1 Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 3/15/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 3/29/2019, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/4/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Terence Kern, Jury Trial set for 7/15/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern) (srt, Dpty Clk)
September 17, 2018 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Tanechia Bruner (Smolen, Daniel)
September 11, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #12 Amended Complaint ) by Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc. (Dark, Jessica)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc. (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Tanechia Bruner (Smolen, Daniel)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Covenant Retirement Services, Corporate Parent Covenant Retirement Communities for Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc.) by Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc. (Dark, Jessica)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc. (Dark, Jessica)
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc. (Dark, Jessica)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Stevens Lafferrandre on behalf of Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc. (Lafferrandre, Robert)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Lauren Dark on behalf of Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc. (Dark, Jessica)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc. (Dark, Jessica)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/17/2018) (lmc, Chambers)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2018-3077 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1949326) by Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc. (With attachments) (Dark, Jessica)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc. (Dark, Jessica)
July 23, 2018 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc. by Tanechia Bruner (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruner v. Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covenant Place of Tulsa, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Stevens Lafferrandre
Represented By: Jessica Lauren Dark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanechia Bruner
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?