Bank of America, N.A. v. Barnard et al

Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A. and Bank of America N.A.
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC, Spouse of Thomas Edward Barnard, Simmons First National Bank, Jane Doe, John Doe, Bank of New York Mellon, The, Thomas Edward Barnard and Keybank, N.A.
3Rd Party Defendant: Seterus, Inc., Baer Timberlake PC and Baer & Timberlake, P.C.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00431
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
0 Judge: John E Dowdell
1 Judge: Claire V Eagan
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Response in Opposition to Motion); Correction: changed text to reflect correct event (Reply to Response to Motion) (Re: #31 Response in Opposition to Motion, ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
September 20, 2018 31 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #18 MOTION to Remand OBJECTION TO REMOVAL AND MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT ) by Thomas Edward Barnard ; (With attachments) (Lindsey, Edward) Modified on 9/20/2018 to change text to reflect correct event (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
September 17, 2018 30 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - That the motion to voluntarily dismiss claims #17 is moot based on the notice of dismissal of claims stemming from Federal Fair Debt Collection Act #29 . ; finding as moot #17 Motion to Dismiss (Re: #29 Notice of Dismissal, #8 Amended Counterclaim, #17 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Stemming from Federal Fair Debt Collection Act ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
September 14, 2018 29 NOTICE of Dismissal (Re: #8 Amended Counterclaim, ) by Thomas Edward Barnard (Lindsey, Edward)
September 13, 2018 28 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to remand (Re: #18 MOTION to Remand OBJECTION TO REMOVAL AND MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT ) by Baer & Timberlake, P.C., Bank of America N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Seterus, Inc. ; (Bryan, John)
September 7, 2018 27 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the motion #26 is granted as requested. Plaintiff shall file his responsive to #13 motion to dismiss no later than 14 days after the Court has ruled on the motion to remand [ 18]. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ; granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #18 MOTION to Remand OBJECTION TO REMOVAL AND MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
September 6, 2018 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Thomas Edward Barnard (Lindsey, Edward)
September 4, 2018 25 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - that the motion #24 is granted as requested. Defendant Baer & Timberlake, P.C. shall file its answer or other responsive pleading no later than 14 days after the Court has ruled on the motion to remand #18 . ; granting #24 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, #18 MOTION to Remand OBJECTION TO REMOVAL AND MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT, #24 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
August 31, 2018 24 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: Third Party Complaint filed in State Court, ) by Baer & Timberlake, P.C. (Ray, Ryan)
August 31, 2018 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Baer & Timberlake, P.C. [Note: Attorney Ryan A Ray added to party Baer & Timberlake, P.C.(pty:3pd).] (Ray, Ryan)
August 29, 2018 22 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Baer Timberlake PC be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #20 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 29, 2018 21 First CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baer Timberlake PC (Parrott, Blake)
August 29, 2018 20 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Baer Timberlake PC [Note: Attorney Blake C Parrott added to party Baer Timberlake PC(pty:3pd).] (Parrott, Blake)
August 27, 2018 19 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Bank of America, N.A. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 23, 2018 18 MOTION to Remand OBJECTION TO REMOVAL AND MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT by Thomas Edward Barnard (Lindsey, Edward)
August 23, 2018 17 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Stemming from Federal Fair Debt Collection Act by Thomas Edward Barnard (Lindsey, Edward)
August 23, 2018 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Edward Glen Lindsey on behalf of Thomas Edward Barnard (Lindsey, Edward)
August 23, 2018 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian Jay Rayment on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Rayment, Brian)
August 23, 2018 14 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Bank of America, N.A. ; (With attachments) (Rayment, Brian)
August 23, 2018 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank of America, N.A. (Rayment, Brian)
August 23, 2018 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Bank of America, N.A., Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.) by Bank of America, N.A. (Rayment, Brian)
August 23, 2018 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian Jay Rayment on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Rayment, Brian)
August 22, 2018 10 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Directing party "Baer Timberlake PC" to file a separate Notice of Party Name Correction no later than 8/29/18. (Re: Third Party Complaint filed in State Court, #2 Notice of Removal, #8 Amended Counterclaim, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
August 22, 2018 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to a conflict, recusing Judge John E Dowdell. Judge Claire V Eagan reassigned to case., changing case number to 18-CV-431-CVE-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Dpty Clk)
August 21, 2018 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Bank of America, N.A., Seterus, Inc.,Baer Timberlake PC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 21, 2018 4 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Seterus, Inc. (Bryan, John)
August 21, 2018 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent International Business Machines Corporation, Corporate Parent Kyanite Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Pixel Acquisition Corp. for Seterus, Inc.) by Seterus, Inc. (Bryan, John)
August 21, 2018 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2015-2133 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1950156) by Seterus, Inc. (With attachments) (Bryan, John)
August 21, 2018 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Seterus, Inc. (Bryan, John)
August 3, 2018 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Bank of America, N.A. (submitted as dkt#8 ) by Thomas Edward Barnard (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 3, 2018 8 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Bank of America, N.A. (filed in State Court) (Re: 7 Counterclaim ) by Thomas Edward Barnard (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 8/21/2018 to edit docket text to show filed in State Court and correct file date (sc, Dpty Clk).
September 15, 2015 7 COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand (filed in State Court) against Bank of America, N.A. (submitted as dkt #6 ) by Thomas Edward Barnard (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 8/21/2018 to edit docket text to show filed in State Court (sc, Dpty Clk).
September 15, 2015 6 AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand (filed in State Court) (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Thomas Edward Barnard (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 8/21/2018 to edit text to show filed in State Court (sc, Dpty Clk).
June 8, 2015 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Bank of America, N.A. (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Barnard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spouse of Thomas Edward Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons First National Bank
Represented By: Christopher J Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, The
Represented By: Blake C Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Edward Barnard
Represented By: Edward Glen Lindsey
Represented By: Stephanie J Milburn
Represented By: Noah Fontanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keybank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Seterus, Inc.
Represented By: Steven James Terrill
Represented By: John Spencer Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Baer Timberlake PC
Represented By: Donald J Timberlake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Baer & Timberlake, P.C.
Represented By: Donald J Timberlake
Represented By: Blake C Parrott
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Donald J Timberlake
Represented By: Jim Timberlake
Represented By: Gary D Baer
Represented By: Brian Jay Rayment
Represented By: William H Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Donald J Timberlake
Represented By: Jim Timberlake
Represented By: Gary D Baer
Represented By: Brian Jay Rayment
Represented By: William H Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?