Steadfast Insurance Company v. Eagle Road Oil LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steadfast Insurance Company
Defendant: Petro Warrior, LLC, Enervest Operating, LLC, Cummings Oil Company, Eagle Road Oil LLC, Territory Resources, LLC, Petroquest Energy, LLC and Trinity Operating (USG) LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00457
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Territory Resources, LLC (Woolery, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Justin Todd Woolery on behalf of Territory Resources, LLC [Note: Attorney Justin Todd Woolery added to party Territory Resources, LLC(pty:dft).] (Woolery, Justin)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell extending deadline to Answer or otherwise plead to November 27, 2018 ; granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Cummings Oil Company (Blakley, Kenneth)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kenneth H Blakley on behalf of Cummings Oil Company [Note: Attorney Kenneth H Blakley added to party Cummings Oil Company(pty:dft).] (Blakley, Kenneth)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cummings Oil Company (Stone, Jacqueline)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jacqueline Gayle Stone on behalf of Cummings Oil Company [Note: Attorney Jacqueline Gayle Stone added to party Cummings Oil Company(pty:dft).] (Stone, Jacqueline)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (jln, Dpty Clk)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting admission pro hac vice for attorneys Curt D. Marshall and Scott Poynter ; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Curt D. Marshall and Scott Poynter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1964956) by Steadfast Insurance Company (With attachments) (Bruehl, Curtis)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc. for Steadfast Insurance Company) by Steadfast Insurance Company (Bruehl, Curtis)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Curt Douglas Marshall and Scott Emory Poynter to file by 9/27/2018 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (eaw, Dpty Clk)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Steadfast Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1954614) by Steadfast Insurance Company (Bruehl, Curtis)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Steadfast Insurance Company (Bruehl, Curtis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steadfast Insurance Company v. Eagle Road Oil LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Warrior, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enervest Operating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummings Oil Company
Represented By: Kenneth H Blakley
Represented By: Jacqueline Gayle Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Road Oil LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Territory Resources, LLC
Represented By: Justin Todd Woolery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petroquest Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Operating (USG) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Curt Douglas Marshall
Represented By: Scott Emory Poynter
Represented By: Curtis Muskrat Bruehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?