Simmons v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jami Simmons
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00488
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
0 Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
1 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/23/2018) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (Goodnight, Jason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (Goodnight, Jason)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell setting deadline to file Answer or otherwise plead by 11/2/2018 ; granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jason Goodnight added to party Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Goodnight, Jason)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jami Simmons (With attachments) (Wandres, Victor)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1962260) by Jami Simmons (Wandres, Victor)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jami Simmons (Wandres, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jami Simmons
Represented By: Victor R Wandres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?