Horyainova v. Walsh et al
Appellee: Karen Carden Walsh and Office of the United States Trustee
Appellant: Olena Horyainova
Case Number: 4:2018cv00514
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 First APPELLANT'S BRIEF (Re: #2 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court ) by Olena Horyainova (Stamper, James)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Transmittal of Notice of Appeal (With attachments) (jln, Dpty Clk)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , setting/resetting bankruptcy appeal briefing deadline(s): ( Appellants Brief due by 11/28/2018, Appellees Brief due by 1/2/2019, Appellants Reply Brief due by 1/23/2019) (jln, Dpty Clk)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 RECORD ON APPEAL from Bankruptcy Court (Re: #2 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court ) (With attachments) (jln, Dpty Clk) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/29/2018 to add Certificate of Transmittal page to the end of the document) (jln, Dpty Clk).
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEAL from Bankruptcy Court by Olena Horyainova (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Olena Horyainova (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horyainova v. Walsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Karen Carden Walsh
Represented By: Karen Carden Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Office of the United States Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Olena Horyainova
Represented By: James Wynn Stamper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?